Jane Doe 1 v. Pace Academy, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 1
Defendant: Amelia Tuttle, Pace Academy Board of Trustees, Frederick G. Assaf, Sara Eden, Michael Gannon, Pace Academy, Inc., Greg C. Kelly, John Does 1-20, Allison Riley, Grady Stevens and Kevin Johnson
Case Number: 1:2020cv04454
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2020 Case has been electronically remanded to State Court of Fulton County. (rjs)
December 18, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (rjs)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Plaintiff's #7 Motion to Remand is GRANTED. It is ORDERED that this case is remanded to the State Court of Fulton County, Georgia. It is further ORDERED that Defendants' #3 Motion to Compel Binding Arbitration, Motion to Stay, and Motion to Dismiss, as well as Plaintiff's #8 Motion to Defer Ruling, are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 12/18/2020. (rjs)
December 17, 2020 Submission of #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court and #8 MOTION to Defer Ruling re: #3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, MOTION to Stay, MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Ripeness or Alternatively, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Said Motions Pending Adjudication of Motion to Remand to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (aaq)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (adg) (ADI)
November 29, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Defer Ruling re: #3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to StayMOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Ripeness or Alternatively, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Said Motions Pending Adjudication of Motion to Remand by Jane Doe 1. (Hodges, Lawanda)
November 29, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Jane Doe 1. (Hodges, Lawanda)
November 17, 2020 Submission of #3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, MOTION to Stay, MOTION to Dismiss, to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (jpa)
November 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Pace Academy, Inc. Notice of Related Cases (Scott, Gailya)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 11/3/20. (jpa)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/20. (eop)
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Compel Binding Arbitration; MOTION to Stay and MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Frederick G. Assaf, Sara Eden, Michael Gannon, John Does 1-20, Kevin Johnson, Greg C. Kelly, Pace Academy Board of Trustees, Pace Academy, Inc., Allison Riley, Grady Stevens and Amelia Tuttle. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit -A, #3 Exhibit -B, #4 Exhibit -C)(eop)
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Frederick G. Assaf, Sara Eden, Michael Gannon, John Does 1-20, Kevin Johnson, Greg C. Kelly, Pace Academy Board of Trustees, Pace Academy, Inc., Allison Riley, Grady Stevens and Amelia Tuttle. Discovery ends on 3/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Jury Demand)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Sara Eden, Allison Riley, Amelia Tuttle, Frederick G. Assaf, Michael Gannon, John Does 1-20, Kevin Johnson, Pace Academy Board of Trustees, Pace Academy, Inc., Grady Stevens and Greg C. Kelly. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-10326326) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -1, #2 Exhibit -2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jane Doe 1 v. Pace Academy, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amelia Tuttle
Represented By: Brynda Rodriguez Insley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pace Academy Board of Trustees
Represented By: Matthew G. Moffett
Represented By: Cody Michael McCollum
Represented By: Gailya McElroy Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick G. Assaf
Represented By: Matthew G. Moffett
Represented By: Cody Michael McCollum
Represented By: Gailya McElroy Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Eden
Represented By: Matthew G. Moffett
Represented By: Cody Michael McCollum
Represented By: Gailya McElroy Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Gannon
Represented By: Matthew G. Moffett
Represented By: Cody Michael McCollum
Represented By: Gailya McElroy Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pace Academy, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew G. Moffett
Represented By: Cody Michael McCollum
Represented By: Gailya McElroy Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg C. Kelly
Represented By: Matthew G. Moffett
Represented By: Cody Michael McCollum
Represented By: Gailya McElroy Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-20
Represented By: Matthew G. Moffett
Represented By: Cody Michael McCollum
Represented By: Gailya McElroy Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison Riley
Represented By: Matthew G. Moffett
Represented By: Cody Michael McCollum
Represented By: Gailya McElroy Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grady Stevens
Represented By: Matthew G. Moffett
Represented By: Cody Michael McCollum
Represented By: Gailya McElroy Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Johnson
Represented By: Matthew G. Moffett
Represented By: Cody Michael McCollum
Represented By: Gailya McElroy Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 1
Represented By: Lawanda N. Hodges
Represented By: Tricia P. Hoffler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?