IN RE GEORGIA SENATE BILL 202
Plaintiff: The New Georgia Project, Black Voters Matter Fund, Rise, Inc., Fannie Marie Jackson Gibbs, Jauan Durbin, Elbert Solomon, Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc., Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Common Cause, Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe, The Urban League of Greater Atlanta, Inc., United States of America, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Women Watch Afrika, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., The Arc of the United States, Georgia Adapt, Southern Christian Leadership Conference, Georgia Advocacy Office, Exousia Lighthouse International C.M., Inc., Faith in Action Network, First Congregational Church, United Church of Christ Incorporated, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Steven J Paik, Thuy Hang Tran, Thao Tran, Deepum Patel, Nora Aquino, Anjali Enjeti-Sydow, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Inc., Greater Works Ministries Network, Inc., Metropolitan Atlanta Baptist Ministers Union, Inc., Mijente, Inc., Samuel Dewitt Proctor Conference, Inc., Sankofa United Church of Christ Limited, The Concerned Black Clergy of Metropolitan Atlanta, Inc., The Justice Initiative, Inc. and The United States of America
Defendant: Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, David Worley, Matthew Mashburn, Anh Le, The Republican National Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Georgia Republican Party, Inc., Margaret Bentley, Glenda Henley, Betty Bryant, Vera McIntosh, Charles Dave, Roy McClain, Zurich Deshazior, Don DiStefano, Karen Murray, Alex Wan, Mark Wingate, Kathleen Ruth, Vernetta Keith Nuriddin, Aaron Johnson, Keith Gammage, Gregory W. Edwards, Alice O'Lenick, Wandy Taylor, Stephen W. Day, George Awuku, Pat Gartland, Jessica M. Brooks, Sara Tindall Ghazal, Teresa K. Crawford, Jennifer Mosbacher, Steven Bruning, Tori Silas, Brian Kemp, Fulton County Registration and Elections Board, Richard L. Barron, DeKalb County Board of Registrations and Elections, Anthony Lewis, Susan Motter, Dele L. Smith, Samuel E. Tillman, Baoky N. Vu, Gwinnett County Board of Registrations and Elections, Cobb County Board of Elections and Registration, Phil Daniell, Fred Aiken, Daryl O. Wilson, Jr., Janine Eveler, Hall County Board of Elections and Registration, Tom Smiley, David Kennedy, Ken Cochran, Craig Lutz, Gala Sheats, Lori Wurtz, Clayton County Board of Elections and Registration, Darlene Johnson, Diane Givens, Carol Wesley, Dorothy F. Hall, Patricia Pullar, Shauna Dozier, Richmond County Board of Elections, Tim McFalls, Sherry T. Barnes, Marcia Brown, Terence Dicks, Bob Finnegan, Lynn Bailey, Bibb County Board of Elections, Mike Kaplan, Herbert Spangler, Rinda Wilson, Henry Ficklin, Cassandra Powell, Jeanetta R. Watson, Bibb County Board of Registrars, Veronica Seals, Chatham County Board of Elections, Thomas J. Mahoney, Malinda Hodge, Marianne Heimes, Antan Lang, Chatham County Board of Registrars, Colin Mcrae, Wanda Andrews, William L. Norse, Jon Pannell, Randolph Slay, Clarke County Board of Election and Voter Registration, Willa Jean Fambrough, Hunaid Qadir, Ann Till, Rocky Raffle, Adam Shirley, Charlotte Sosebee, Columbia County Board of Elections, Ann Cushman, Wanda Duffie, Larry Wiggins, Columbia County Board of Registrars, Nancy L. Gay, Georgia State Election Board, Kelvin Williams, Erica Hamilton, Forsyth County Board of Voter Registrations and Elections, Barbara Luth, Matthew Blender, Joel Natt, Carla Radzikinas, Randy Ingram, Mandi B Smith, Santiago Marquez, The Georgia State Election Board, The State of Georgia, Edward Lindsey, Janice Johnston, Joel Hazard, Karen Evans-Daniel, Darius Maynard, Katherine Durso, Debra Geiger, Stephen F. Bruning, Nancy Jester, Karli Swift, Twyla Hart, Cathy Woolard, Teresa Crawford, Anthony Rodriguez, Zach Manifold, Issac McAdams, Travis Doss, Jr., Ben Johnson, James Newland, Alfred Jester, James A. O'Brien and Janice W. Johnston
Petitioner: District of Columbia, Public Interest Legal Foundation, Senator Max Burns, Senator Mike Dugan, Senator Steve Gooch, Senator Butch Miller, Senator Jeff Mullis, Senator Randy Robertson, Senator Brian Strickland, Representative Shaw Blackmon, Representative Barry Fleming, Representative Jan Jones, Representative Chuck Martin, Representative Alan Powell, Representative David Ralston, Representative Bonnie Rich, Lieutenant Governor Geoff Duncan and William Ligon
Intervenor Defendant: National Republican Congressional Committee and Republican National Committee
Amicus Curiae: Amicus Curiae, American Center for Law and Justice, Foundation for Government Accountability, Greater Georgia Action, Inc., Members of Congress, State of Ohio and Honest Elections Project
Not Classified By Court: Clerk of the Superio Debra DeBerry
Case Number: 1:2021mi55555
Filed: December 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2023 Filing 376 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Pursuant to Local Rule 5.4 by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Adapt, Georgia Advocacy Office, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Southern Christian Leadership Conference.(Faransso, Tania)
January 17, 2023 Filing 375 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by DeKalb County Board of Registrations and Elections RESPONSES TO AME PLAINTIFFS FIRST INTERROGATORIES (Momo, Shelley)
January 17, 2023 Filing 374 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Expert Reports of Kevin J. Kennedy, Dr. Stephen Pettigrew, Dr. Andres Tijerina, Dr. Lorraine C. Minnite, Dr. Bridgett King, Dr. Lisa A. Schur, and Dr. Carol Anderson by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Adapt, Georgia Advocacy Office, Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Southern Christian Leadership Conference, The Arc of the United States, Women Watch Afrika.(Sieff, Adam)
January 17, 2023 Filing 373 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Common Cause, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc., Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe Plaintiffs' Rule 5.4 Certificate of Service Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01284-JPB, 1:21-cv-01333-JPB, 1:21-cv-01728-JPB(Hayes, Vilia)
January 17, 2023 Filing 372 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Expert Disclosures by The United States of America.(Ryan, Elizabeth)
January 14, 2023 Filing 371 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Expert Reports of Dr. Orville Vernon Burton and Dr. Christopher J. Clark by Black Voters Matter Fund, Rise, Inc., The New Georgia Project.(Sparks, Adam)
January 13, 2023 Filing 370 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #368 Certificate of Service, Amended Certificate of Service by Common Cause, Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc., Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe.(Belichick, Joseph)
January 13, 2023 Filing 369 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiffs' Expert Reports of Dr. Derek Chang and Dr. Taeku Lee by Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta.(Lauridsen, R.)
January 13, 2023 Filing 368 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Expert Report of Dr. James C. Cobb by Common Cause, Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc., Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe.(Belichick, Joseph)
January 11, 2023 Filing 367 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Hall County Defendants' Responses to Plaintiffs' Interrogatories by Ken Cochran, Hall County Board of Elections and Registration, David Kennedy, Craig Lutz, Gala Sheats, Tom Smiley.(Bloodworth, Kristin)
January 11, 2023 Filing 366 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #345 Certificate of Service, Fulton County Defendants' responses to AME Plaintiffs' First Interrogatories by Fulton County Registration and Elections Board.(Plott, Mathew)
January 11, 2023 Filing 365 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Jeanetta R. Watson, Bibb County Board of Elections, Karen Evans-Daniel, Joel Hazard, Mike Kaplan, Veronica Seals, Herbert Spangler Macon-Bibb County Defendants Responses to AME Plaintiffs First Interrogatories to Macon-Bibb County Defendants Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01284-JPB(Martin, Grace)
January 11, 2023 Filing 364 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Response to Interrogatories by Sherry T. Barnes, Marcia Brown, Terence Dicks, Issac McAdams, Tim McFalls, Richmond County Board of Elections.(Mack, Rachel)
January 11, 2023 Filing 363 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Clarke County Board of Election and Voter Registration, Willa Jean Fambrough, Hunaid Qadir, Rocky Raffle, Adam Shirley, Charlotte Sosebee, Ann Till.(Banter, James)
January 11, 2023 Filing 362 APPLICATION for Admission of Emily L. Wang Pro Hac Vice.by Nora Aquino, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Anjali Enjeti-Sydow, Steven J Paik, Deepum Patel, Thao Tran, Thuy Hang Tran, Nora Aquino, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Anjali Enjeti-Sydow, Steven J Paik, Deepum Patel, Thao Tran, Thuy Hang Tran. Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01333-JPB(Yoon, Meredyth) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 11, 2023 Filing 361 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Columbia County Board of Elections.(Bell, Jordan)
January 11, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #359 APPLICATION for Admission of Danielle Kim Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number GANDC-12301130).. Attorney Danielle Eun Kim added appearing on behalf of Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, The Arc of the United States, Women Watch Afrika (kkh)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting Danielle Kim's (359) / (176) Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice in case 1:21-cv-01284-JPB & 1:21-mi-55555-JPB. So ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 1/11/2023. Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01284-JPBIf the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jkl)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting Alexandra Hiatt's #357 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. So ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 1/10/23. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jkl)
January 10, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #357 APPLICATION for Admission of Alexandra Hiatt Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Alexandra Hiatt added appearing on behalf of Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Adapt, Georgia Advocacy Office, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Southern Christian Leadership Conference (cdg)
January 10, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #358 APPLICATION for Admission of Susan Pelletier Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Susan Pelletier added appearing on behalf of Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Adapt, Georgia Advocacy Office, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Southern Christian Leadership Conference (cdg)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting Susan Pelletier's #358 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. So ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 1/10/23. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jkl)
January 9, 2023 Filing 360 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 4/3/23 - 4/7/23, 5/22/23 - 5/26/23, 10/5/23 - 10/19/23 and 11/9/23 - 11/10/23, by Bryan P. Tyson. (Tyson, Bryan)
January 6, 2023 Filing 359 APPLICATION for Admission of Danielle Kim Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number GANDC-12301130).by Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, The Arc of the United States, Women Watch Afrika, Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, The Arc of the United States, Women Watch Afrika. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01284-JPB(Winichakul, Pichaya) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 3, 2023 Filing 358 APPLICATION for Admission of Susan Pelletier Pro Hac Vice.by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Adapt, Georgia Advocacy Office, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Southern Christian Leadership Conference. (Garabadu, Rahul) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 3, 2023 Filing 357 APPLICATION for Admission of Alexandra Hiatt Pro Hac Vice.by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Adapt, Georgia Advocacy Office, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Southern Christian Leadership Conference. (Garabadu, Rahul) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 3, 2023 Filing 356 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Pursuant to Local Rule 5.4 by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Adapt, Georgia Advocacy Office, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Southern Christian Leadership Conference.(Faransso, Tania)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting Matletha N. Bennette's (175) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice in case 1:21-cv-01284-JPB / (355) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice in case 1:21-mi-55555-JPB. So ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 12/28/22. Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01284-JPBIf the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jkl)
December 27, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #355 APPLICATION for Admission of Matletha N. Bennette Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number GANDC-12279991). Attorney Matletha N. Bennette added appearing on behalf of Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, The Arc of the United States, Women Watch Afrika (pdt)
December 22, 2022 Filing 355 APPLICATION for Admission of Matletha N. Bennette Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number GANDC-12279991).by Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, The Arc of the United States, Women Watch Afrika, Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, The Arc of the United States, Women Watch Afrika. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01284-JPB(Winichakul, Pichaya) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 22, 2022 Filing 354 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Adapt, Georgia Advocacy Office, Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Southern Christian Leadership Conference, The Arc of the United States, Women Watch Afrika First Supplemental Initial Disclosures (Sieff, Adam)
December 21, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #350 APPLICATION for Admission of Edward Howard Trent Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12269452). Attorney Edward H Trent added appearing on behalf of Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice W. Johnston, Brian Kemp, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger (cdg)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting Edward Howard Trent's #350 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. So ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 12/21/22. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jkl)
December 20, 2022 Filing 353 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): February 7, 2023, February 16-24, 2023, April 3-10, 2023, May 18-20, 2023, by Adam Martin Sparks. (Sparks, Adam)
December 20, 2022 RETURN of #347 APPLICATION for Admission of Emily L. Wang Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number GANDC-12263100). to attorney for correction re: Please list another court to which you are admitted and resubmit your application. (cdg)
December 19, 2022 Filing 352 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Nora Aquino, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Anjali Enjeti-Sydow, Steven J Paik, Deepum Patel, Thao Tran, Thuy Hang Tran Certificate of Service re AAAJ Production of Docs (Vol. 2) (Lauridsen, R.)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER GRANTING (348) (99) Motion to Dismiss Sankofa United Church of Christ Limited (a Georgia nonprofit corporation), Mijente, Inc. (a nonprofit corporation) and Samuel Dewitt Proctor Conference, Inc. (a nonprofit corporation) with prejudice in case 1:21-cv-01728-JPB. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 12/19/2022. Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01728-JPB(adg) Modified on 12/19/2022 (adg).
December 19, 2022 Filing 350 APPLICATION for Admission of Edward Howard Trent Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12269452).by Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice W. Johnston, Brian Kemp, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger. (Tyson, Bryan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 16, 2022 Filing 349 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Adapt, Georgia Advocacy Office, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Southern Christian Leadership Conference.(Faransso, Tania)
December 15, 2022 Filing 348 Consent MOTION to Dismiss Joint stipulation and consent motion for voluntary dismissal by Mijente, Inc., Samuel Dewitt Proctor Conference, Inc., Sankofa United Church of Christ Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kastorf, Kurt)
December 15, 2022 Filing 347 APPLICATION for Admission of Emily L. Wang Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number GANDC-12263100).by Nora Aquino, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Anjali Enjeti-Sydow, Steven J Paik, Deepum Patel, Thao Tran, Thuy Hang Tran, Nora Aquino, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Anjali Enjeti-Sydow, Steven J Paik, Deepum Patel, Thao Tran, Thuy Hang Tran. Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01333-JPB(Yoon, Meredyth) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 13, 2022 Filing 346 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of subpoena for documents to Javier Pico-Prats by The United States of America.(O'Connor, Maura Eileen)
December 13, 2022 RETURN of #343 APPLICATION for Admission of Alexandra Hiatt Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number GANDC-12244722). to attorney for correction re: Please put appearing on behalf of on the first page of your application. (cdg)
December 13, 2022 RETURN of #344 APPLICATION for Admission of Susan Pelletier Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number GANDC-12244755). to attorney for correction re: Please place appearing on behalf of on the first page of the application. (cdg)
December 12, 2022 Filing 345 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of AME Plaintiffs' Interrogatories to County Defendants by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Adapt, Georgia Advocacy Office, Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Southern Christian Leadership Conference, The Arc of the United States, Women Watch Afrika.(Rosborough, Davin)
December 7, 2022 Filing 344 APPLICATION for Admission of Susan Pelletier Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number GANDC-12244755). with Brief In Support by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Adapt, Georgia Advocacy Office, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Southern Christian Leadership Conference. Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01284-JPB(Garabadu, Rahul) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 7, 2022 Filing 343 APPLICATION for Admission of Alexandra Hiatt Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number GANDC-12244722). with Brief In Support by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Adapt, Georgia Advocacy Office, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Southern Christian Leadership Conference. Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01284-JPB(Garabadu, Rahul) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 5, 2022 Filing 342 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for State Defendants Responses and Objections to United States' First Interrogatories by Gregory W. Edwards, Georgia State Election Board, Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice W. Johnston, Brian Kemp, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Matthew Mashburn(in his official capacity as a member of the Georgia State Election Board), Brad Raffensperger.(Schaerr, Gene) Modified on 12/14/2022 to remove all caps text (adg).
December 2, 2022 Filing 341 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Subpoena for Documents to Milton Kidd by The United States of America.(O'Connor, Maura Eileen)
December 1, 2022 Filing 340 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee.(Carver, William) Text modified on 12/2/2022 (adg).
November 29, 2022 Filing 339 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): December 30, 2022 - January 5, 2023, February 15-20, 2023, March 22-24, 2023, by Joyce Gist Lewis. (Lewis, Joyce)
November 29, 2022 Filing 338 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Supplemental Discovery by Ken Cochran, Hall County Board of Elections and Registration, David Kennedy, Craig Lutz, Gala Sheats, Tom Smiley, Lori Wurtz.(Bloodworth, Kristin)
November 29, 2022 Filing 337 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fulton County Registration and Elections Board.(Lowman, David)
November 28, 2022 Filing 336 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Notice of Deposition Under Rule 30(b)(6) by Nora Aquino, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Anjali Enjeti-Sydow, Steven J Paik, Deepum Patel, Thao Tran, Thuy Hang Tran.(Lauridsen, R.)
November 28, 2022 Filing 335 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Subpoenas to Testify at a Deposition to Tonnie Adams and Todd Edwards by The United States of America.(Jhaveri, Sejal)
November 28, 2022 Filing 334 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Black Voters Matter Fund, Jauan Durbin, Fannie Marie Jackson Gibbs, Rise, Inc., Elbert Solomon, The New Georgia Project (Sparks, Adam)
November 28, 2022 Filing 333 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Henry Ficklin, Jeanetta R. Watson, Bibb County Board of Elections, Karen Evans-Daniel, Joel Hazard, Mike Kaplan, Darius Maynard, Veronica Seals, Herbert Spangler for Defendants' Supplemental Productions Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01284-JPB(Martin, Grace)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting (170) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice in case 1:21-cv-01284-JPB and (329) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice in case 1:21-mi-55555-JPB for Dayton Campbell-Harris. So ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 11/28/22. Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01284-JPBIf the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jkl)
November 23, 2022 Filing 332 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Adapt, Georgia Advocacy Office, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Southern Christian Leadership Conference.(Faransso, Tania)
November 23, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #329 APPLICATION for Admission of Dayton Campbell-Harris Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number GANDC-12213096). Attorney Dayton Campbell-Harris added appearing on behalf of Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Adapt, Georgia Advocacy Office, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Southern Christian Leadership Conference (pdt)
November 22, 2022 Filing 331 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for State Defendants' seventh consolidated production (CDR00465683 - CDR00472897) by Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice W. Johnston, Brian Kemp, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger.(Tyson, Bryan)
November 21, 2022 Filing 330 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Plaintiffs' production (CBC-000000001 - CBC-000000372) by Exousia Lighthouse International C.M., Inc., Faith in Action Network, First Congregational Church, United Church of Christ Incorporated, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Inc., Greater Works Ministries Network, Inc., Metropolitan Atlanta Baptist Ministers Union, Inc., Mijente, Inc., Samuel Dewitt Proctor Conference, Inc., Sankofa United Church of Christ Limited, The Concerned Black Clergy of Metropolitan Atlanta, Inc., The Justice Initiative, Inc..(Unger, Jess)
November 21, 2022 Filing 329 APPLICATION for Admission of Dayton Campbell-Harris Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number GANDC-12213096).by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Adapt, Georgia Advocacy Office, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Southern Christian Leadership Conference. Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01284-JPB(Garabadu, Rahul) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 21, 2022 Filing 328 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Productions on behalf of the African Methodist Episcopal Church (AME-00003206 - AME-00004161), Georgia ADAPT (ADAPT-00000073 - ADAPT-00000119), Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc. (DELTA-00000745 - DELTA-00001168) and the Georgia Advocacy Office (GAO-00000635 - GAO-00000798) by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Adapt, Georgia Advocacy Office, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Southern Christian Leadership Conference.(Aden, Leah)
November 21, 2022 Filing 327 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for State Defendants' sixth consolidated production (CDR00458891 - CDR00465682) by Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice W. Johnston, Brian Kemp, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger.(Tyson, Bryan)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting Sabrina S. Khan's #319 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. So ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 11/21/22. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jkl)
November 21, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #319 APPLICATION for Admission of Sabrina S. Khan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number GANDC-12198060). Attorney Sabrina S. Khan added appearing on behalf of Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, The Arc of the United States, Women Watch Afrika (pdt)
November 18, 2022 Filing 326 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production by Gregory W. Edwards.(Tyson, Bryan)
November 18, 2022 Filing 325 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for State Defendants' fifth consolidated production (CDR00155509 - CDR00458890) and Second Interim Privilege Log by Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice W. Johnston, Brian Kemp, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger.(Tyson, Bryan)
November 17, 2022 Filing 324 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR STATE DEFENDANTS' RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO NGP PLAINTIFFS SECOND SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO STATE DEFENDANTS by Gregory W. Edwards, Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice W. Johnston, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Matthew Mashburn(in his official capacity as a member of the Georgia State Election Board), Brad Raffensperger.(Schaerr, Gene)
November 17, 2022 Filing 323 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF STATE DEFENDANTS RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO CONSOLIDATED PLAINTIFFS THIRD SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS by Gregory W. Edwards, Georgia State Election Board, Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice W. Johnston, Brian Kemp, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Matthew Mashburn(in his official capacity as a member of the Georgia State Election Board), Brad Raffensperger, The State of Georgia.(Schaerr, Gene)
November 17, 2022 Filing 322 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Response to Georgia NAACP Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for Production by Cobb County Board of Elections and Registration, Janine Eveler.(White, Daniel)
November 17, 2022 Submission of #286 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas Subpoenas, to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (jkl)
November 16, 2022 Filing 321 REPLY BRIEF re #303 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by The United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Jhaveri, Sejal)
November 15, 2022 Filing 320 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Subpoena for Testimony to Hayley McCloud by The United States of America.(O'Connor, Maura Eileen)
November 15, 2022 Filing 319 APPLICATION for Admission of Sabrina S. Khan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number GANDC-12198060).by Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Women Watch Afrika, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, The Arc of the United States. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01284-JPB(Winichakul, Pichaya) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 14, 2022 Filing 318 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Deposition under Rule 30(b)(6) by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Adapt, Georgia Advocacy Office, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Southern Christian Leadership Conference.(Garabadu, Rahul)
November 14, 2022 Filing 317 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #291 Certificate of Service GWINNETT COUNTY DEFENDANTS RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO GEORGIA NAACP PLAINTIFFS SECOND SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION TO GWINNETT COUNTY DEFENDANTS by Gwinnett County Board of Registrations and Elections.(Wilson, Melanie)
November 14, 2022 Filing 316 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #289 Certificate of Service Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Request for Production of Documents by Keith Gammage.(Bowman, Brad)
November 14, 2022 Filing 315 Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Brad M. Bowman replacing attorney Steven E. Rosenberg. Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01229-JPB(Bowman, Brad)
November 14, 2022 Filing 314 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by DeKalb County Board of Registrations and Elections Response to Georgia NAACP Plaintiff's Second Set of Requests for Production Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB et al.(Vander Els, Irene)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Because the Concerned Black Clergy of Metropolitan Atlanta will continue to be represented by counsel, the #313 Motion to Withdraw is GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate Miriam Nemeth and Mahroh Jahangiri as counsel of record in this case. So ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 11/9/2022. (jkl)
November 8, 2022 Filing 313 MOTION to Withdraw Miriam R. Nemeth as Attorneyby Exousia Lighthouse International C.M., Inc., Faith in Action Network, First Congregational Church, United Church of Christ Incorporated, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Inc., Greater Works Ministries Network, Inc., Metropolitan Atlanta Baptist Ministers Union, Inc., Mijente, Inc., New Birth Missionary Baptist Church, Inc., Samuel Dewitt Proctor Conference, Inc., Sankofa United Church of Christ Limited, The Concerned Black Clergy of Metropolitan Atlanta, Inc., The Justice Initiative, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01728-JPB(Nemeth, Miriam)
November 7, 2022 Submission of #303 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents , to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (jkl)
November 4, 2022 Filing 312 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by The United States of America for the United States' Responses to Defendants' First Set of Discovery Requests (Richardson, Jasmyn)
November 2, 2022 Filing 311 Non-Party Lawmakers' REPLY BRIEF re #286 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas and RESPONSE in Opposition to Plaintiffs' #303 Motion to Compel Production of Documents (Khoury, K.) Modified on 11/9/2022 to link to related motion (adg).
November 2, 2022 Filing 310 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Interrogatories to State Defendants by The United States of America.(Ryan, Elizabeth)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting Zainab Omar Ramahi's #309 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. So ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 10/31/22. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jkl)
October 28, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #309 APPLICATION for Admission of Zainab Omar Ramahi Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number GANDC-12158048). Attorney Zainab Omar Ramahi added appearing on behalf of Nora Aquino, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Anjali Enjeti-Sydow, Steven J Paik, Deepum Patel, Thao Tran, Thuy Hang Tran (pdt)
October 26, 2022 Filing 309 APPLICATION for Admission of Zainab Omar Ramahi Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number GANDC-12158048).by Nora Aquino, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Anjali Enjeti-Sydow, Steven J Paik, Deepum Patel, Thao Tran, Thuy Hang Tran, Nora Aquino, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Anjali Enjeti-Sydow, Steven J Paik, Deepum Patel, Thao Tran, Thuy Hang Tran. Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01333-JPB(Yoon, Meredyth) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
October 25, 2022 Filing 308 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by The United States of America for the United States' Responses to Defendants' First Set of Discovery Requests (Richardson, Jasmyn)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER GRANTING #305 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. THE CLERK IS DIRECTED to seal Exhibit A of Consolidated Plaintiffs Brief in Opposition to Non-Party Lawmakers' Motion to Quash. The document shall remain under seal until further order of this Court. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 10/20/2022. (adg)
October 20, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Amicus Curiae re #306 Order on Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. (adg)
October 19, 2022 Filing 307 RESPONSE in Opposition re #286 (Non-Party Lawmakers' MOTION to Quash Subpoenas filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Contained in #303 Motion to Compel) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(adg) Text modified on 10/20/2022 (adg).
October 19, 2022 Filing 305 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #304 Notice of Filing, by The United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jhaveri, Sejal)
October 19, 2022 Filing 304 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Exhibit A to Consolidated Plaintiffs' Brief in Support of Motion to Compel and in Opposition to Motion to Quash by The United States of America re #303 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents (Jhaveri, Sejal) Modified on 10/20/2022 (adg).
October 19, 2022 Filing 303 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents with Brief In Support by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Brief In support of Motion to Compel and in Opposition to Motion to Quash, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Jhaveri, Sejal) Modified on 10/20/2022 to correct filer information (adg).
October 18, 2022 Filing 302 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Adapt, Georgia Advocacy Office, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Southern Christian Leadership Conference.(Faransso, Tania)
October 18, 2022 Filing 301 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Black Voters Matter Fund, Jauan Durbin, Fannie Marie Jackson Gibbs, Rise, Inc., Elbert Solomon, The New Georgia Project.(Sparks, Adam)
October 18, 2022 Filing 300 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Black Voters Matter Fund, Jauan Durbin, Fannie Marie Jackson Gibbs, Rise, Inc., Elbert Solomon, The New Georgia Project.(Sparks, Adam)
October 18, 2022 Filing 299 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE regarding Document Productions by Black Voters Matter Fund, Jauan Durbin, Fannie Marie Jackson Gibbs, Rise, Inc., Elbert Solomon, The New Georgia Project.(Sparks, Adam)
October 17, 2022 Filing 298 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by The United States of America for the United States' Second Subpoena for Documents and Records to Lynn Bailey (Richardson, Jasmyn)
October 17, 2022 Filing 297 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Supplemental Response to Request for Production by Sherry T. Barnes, Marcia Brown, Terence Dicks, Travis Doss, Jr, Issac McAdams, Tim McFalls, Richmond County Board of Elections.(Mack, Rachel)
October 17, 2022 Filing 296 ---DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR--- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Black Voters Matter Fund, Jauan Durbin, Fannie Marie Jackson Gibbs, Rise, Inc., Elbert Solomon, The New Georgia Project.(Sparks, Adam) Modified on 10/18/2022 at request of counsel (lwb).
October 17, 2022 Filing 295 ---DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR--- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Black Voters Matter Fund, Jauan Durbin, Fannie Marie Jackson Gibbs, Rise, Inc., Elbert Solomon, The New Georgia Project.(Sparks, Adam) Modified on 10/18/2022 at request of counsel (lwb).
October 17, 2022 Filing 294 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Consolidated Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for for Production of Documents to State Defendants filed by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB et al.(Hayes, Vilia) Modified on 10/20/2022 to remove all caps text (adg).
October 17, 2022 Filing 293 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Second Set of Requests for Production to Cobb County Defendants by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP.(Thomas, Ethan)
October 17, 2022 Filing 292 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Second Set of Requests for Production to Fulton County Defendants by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP.(Thomas, Ethan)
October 17, 2022 Filing 291 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Second Set of Requests for Production to Gwinnett County Defendants by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP.(Thomas, Ethan)
October 17, 2022 Filing 290 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Second Set of Requests for Production to DeKalb County Defendants by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP.(Thomas, Ethan)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Because Plaintiffs will continue to be represented, the #278 Motion to Withdraw is GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate Gilda Rae Daniels, Sabrina Khan, Megan Porter, Britton Davis, Esperanza Segarra and Jorge Vasquez as counsels of record in this case. SO ORDERED by Judge J. P. Boulee on 10/17/22. (jkl)
October 14, 2022 Filing 289 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Request for Production of Documents by The United States of America.(Ryan, Elizabeth)
October 14, 2022 Submission of #278 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (jkl)
October 11, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #284 APPLICATION for Admission of Ethan Michael Thomas Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number GANDC-12112832). Attorney Ethan Michael Thomas added appearing on behalf of Common Cause, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc., Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe (pdt)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vic for Joseph Stephen Belichick and Ethan Michael Thomas re (107), (108), (283), (284) in case 1:21-mi-55555-JPB. So ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 10/11/22. Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01259-JPB. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jkl)
October 10, 2022 Filing 288 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Response to Plaintiffs Interrogatories by Fulton County Registration and Elections Board.(Lowman, David) Modified on 10/17/2022 to remove all caps text (adg).
October 7, 2022 Filing 287 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Fulton County Registration and Elections Board Fulton County Dfts Responses to Plts' 1st Set of Rpds Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB et al.(Lowman, David)
October 7, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #283 APPLICATION for Admission of Joseph Stephen Belichick Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number GANDC-12110865). Attorney Joseph S. Belichick added appearing on behalf of Common Cause, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc., Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe (pdt)
October 5, 2022 Filing 286 Non-Party Lawmakers' MOTION to Quash Subpoenas with Brief In Support by Max Burns, Mike Dugan, Steve Gooch, Butch Miller, Jeff Mullis, Randy Robertson, and Brian Strickland, Shaw Blackmon, Barry Fleming, Jan Jones, Chuck Martin, Alan Powell, David Ralston, and Bonnie Rich, Governor Geoff Duncan and William Ligon. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support and Exh A-C)(Khoury, K.) Modified on 10/7/2022 to remove duplicate text and add filers (adg).
October 5, 2022 Filing 285 NOTICE of Appearance by Caitlin Felt May on behalf of Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Adapt, Georgia Advocacy Office, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Southern Christian Leadership Conference Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB et al.(May, Caitlin)
October 5, 2022 Filing 284 APPLICATION for Admission of Ethan Michael Thomas Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number GANDC-12112832).by Common Cause, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc., Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - court admissions)Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01259-JPB(Sells, Bryan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
October 4, 2022 Filing 283 APPLICATION for Admission of Joseph Stephen Belichick Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number GANDC-12110865).by Common Cause, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc., Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - court admissions)Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01259-JPB(Sells, Bryan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
October 4, 2022 Filing 282 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for State Defendants' fourth consolidated production (CDR00106595 - CDR00155508) by Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice Johnston, Brian Kemp, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger.(Tyson, Bryan)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Because Plaintiffs will continue to be represented, Phi Nguyen's #281 Motion for Leave of Court to Withdraw Appearance is GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate Phi Nguyen as counsel of record in this case. SO ORDERED by Judge J. P. Boulee on 10/4/22. (jkl)
October 3, 2022 Filing 281 MOTION to Withdraw Phi Nguyen as Attorneyby Nora Aquino, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Anjali Enjeti-Sydow, Steven J Paik, Deepum Patel, Thao Tran, Thuy Hang Tran. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Appendix Notice letters to clients for PN withdrawal)Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01333-JPB(Nguyen, Phi)
October 3, 2022 Filing 280 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Supplemental Responses to Plaintiffs' First Requests for Production by Alfred Jester, Ben Johnson, Roy McClain, James Newland, James A. O'Brien.(Broder, Karl)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting Thomas McCarthy's #273 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice and granting Molly Melcher's #276 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. So ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 10/3/22. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jkl)
October 3, 2022 Documentary exhibits #246 #247 from the Motion Hearing held on July 18, 2022, were destroyed as directed in #248 Exhibit Return Notification, #249 Exhibit Return Notification, (mec)
September 30, 2022 Filing 279 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Jeanetta R. Watson, Bibb County Board of Elections, Karen Evans-Daniel, Joel Hazard, Mike Kaplan, Veronica Seals, Herbert Spangler Bibb County Defendants Supplemental Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for Production Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01284-JPB(Martin, Grace)
September 30, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #276 APPLICATION for Admission of Molly Melcher Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number GANDC-12091046). Attorney Molly Melcher added appearing on behalf of Common Cause, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc., Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe (pdt)
September 30, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #273 APPLICATION for Admission of Thomas McCarthy Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12086593). Attorney Thomas McCarthy added appearing on behalf of Georgia Republican Party, Inc., Georgia Republican Party, Inc., Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee (pdt)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting Catherine Harding McCord's #264 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. So ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 9/28/22. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jkl)
September 26, 2022 Filing 278 MOTION to Withdraw Britton Davis , Gilda Rae Daniels , Sabrina Khan, Megan Porter, Esperanza Segarra, and Jorge Vasquez as Attorney by The Concerned Black Clergy of Metropolitan Atlanta, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01728-JPB (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01728-JPB(Unger, Jess) Modified on 9/30/2022 to correct docket text to accurately reflect e-filed document (adg).
September 26, 2022 Filing 277 Consolidated Plaintiffs' Rule 5.4 Service of Discovery by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Adapt, Georgia Advocacy Office, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Southern Christian Leadership Conference (Faransso, Tania) Modified on 9/30/2022 to correct docket text (adg).
September 26, 2022 Filing 276 APPLICATION for Admission of Molly Melcher Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number GANDC-12091046).by Common Cause, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc., Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Melcher court admissions)Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01259-JPB(Sells, Bryan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 26, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #264 APPLICATION for Admission of Catherine Harding McCord Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number GANDC-12079269). Attorney Catherine Harding McCord added appearing on behalf of plaintiffs. (cdg)
September 23, 2022 Filing 275 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Subpoenas for documents to Tonnie Adams, Todd Edwards, and Debra Presswood by The United States of America.(Jhaveri, Sejal)
September 23, 2022 Filing 274 NOTICE of Appearance by Cory Isaacson on behalf of Georgia Adapt, Georgia Advocacy Office, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Southern Christian Leadership Conference Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB et al.(Isaacson, Cory)
September 22, 2022 Filing 273 APPLICATION for Admission of Thomas McCarthy Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12086593).by Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (Carver, William) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 22, 2022 Filing 272 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY by Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee.(Carver, William)
September 22, 2022 Filing 271 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF Discovery by Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee.(Carver, William)
September 21, 2022 Filing 270 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Production of documents by The United States of America.(Ryan, Elizabeth)
September 21, 2022 Filing 269 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Plaintiffs' Subpoena for Deposition to Athens-Clarke County Board of Elections & Voter Registration by Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, The Arc of the United States, Women Watch Afrika.(Hamilton, Brittni)
September 21, 2022 Filing 268 NOTICE by Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, The Arc of the United States, Women Watch Afrika of Intent to Serve Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hamilton, Brittni)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER re #265 Joint Discovery Statement. The Court orders the following briefing schedule related to a Motion to Quash to be filed by the Lawmakers and a Motion to Compel Production of Documents to be filed by the Consolidated Plaintiffs: Lawmakers' Motion to Quash will be filed on 10/5/2022; Plaintiffs' Opposition to the Motion to Quash and Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents on 10/19/2022; Lawmaker's reply brief on 11/2/2022; and Plaintiffs' reply brief on 11/16/2022. The first brief for each side shall be 35 pages, the Lawmakers' reply brief shall be 20 pages, and the Plaintiffs' reply brief shall be 15 pages. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 9/21/2022. (adg)
September 20, 2022 Filing 266 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Subpoenas for documents and testimony to Lynn Bailey by The United States of America.(O'Connor, Maura Eileen)
September 20, 2022 Filing 265 NOTICE by The United States of America of Consolidated/Joint Discovery Statement and Request for Briefing Schedule (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Richardson, Jasmyn)
September 20, 2022 Filing 264 APPLICATION for Admission of Catherine Harding McCord Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number GANDC-12079269).by Common Cause, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc., Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe. Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01259-JPB(Sells, Bryan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 20, 2022 Filing 263 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for State Defendants' Responses and Objections to AME Plaintiffs' First Interrogatories and Requests for Admissions by Georgia State Election Board, Janice Johnston, Brian Kemp, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Matthew Mashburn(in his official capacity as a member of the Georgia State Election Board), Brad Raffensperger.(Schaerr, Gene) Modified on 9/26/2022 to remove all caps text (adg).
September 19, 2022 Filing 262 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for State Defendants' Third Consolidated Production (CDR00030666 - CDR00106594) by Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice Johnston, Brian Kemp, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger.(Tyson, Bryan)
September 19, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #260 APPLICATION for Admission of Jennifer Nwachukwu Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number GANDC-12072235). Attorney Jennifer Nwachukwu added appearing on behalf of Common Cause, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc., Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe (pdt)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting Jennifer Nwachukw's #260 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice and Armen Nercessian's #261 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. So ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 9/19/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jkl)
September 19, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #261 APPLICATION for Admission of Armen Nercessian Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number GANDC-12073191). Attorney Armen Nercess Nercessian added appearing on behalf of Common Cause, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc., Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe (pdt)
September 16, 2022 Filing 261 APPLICATION for Admission of Armen Nercessian Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number GANDC-12073191).by Common Cause, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc., Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Nercessian court admissions)Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01259-JPB(Sells, Bryan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 16, 2022 Filing 260 APPLICATION for Admission of Jennifer Nwachukwu Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number GANDC-12072235).by Common Cause, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc., Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe. Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01259-JPB(Sells, Bryan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 259 SCHEDULING ORDER After reviewing the Joint Motion to Adjust the February 1, 2022 Scheduling Order, filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs, State Defendants, and Defendant-Intervenors, the Court orders the following adjustments to the schedule in this case. Experts reports will no longer be due in September or October 2022 in this case. (SEE ORDER FOR DEADLINES). Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 9/14/2022. (adg)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Because Defendants will continue to be represented by counsel, Loree Anne Paradise's #258 Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel is GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate Ms. Paradise as counsel of record for Defendants. So ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 9/14/22. (jkl)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Docket entry order granting #15 Motion to Substitute Party. Anthony Rodriguez, Board Member of the Gwinnett County Board of Registrations and Elections, in his official capacity, will be substituted as a defendant in place of Santiago Marquez, Board Member of Gwinnett County Board of Registrations and Elections, in his official capacity. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 9/14/2022.
September 13, 2022 Filing 258 MOTION to Withdraw Loree Anne Paradise as Attorneyby Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice Johnston, Brian Kemp, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, The Georgia State Election Board, The State of Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Paradise, Loree Anne)
September 13, 2022 Filing 257 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee.(Carver, William)
September 12, 2022 Filing 256 Joint MOTION to Amend (84 in 1:21-mi-55555-JPB) Order with Brief In Support by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB et al.(Russ, John)
September 12, 2022 Filing 255 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by The United States of America for Responses to Defendants' First Set of Discovery Requests (Richardson, Jasmyn)
September 9, 2022 Filing 254 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE State Defendants' Second Consolidated Production (CDR00018452 - CDR00030665) by Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice Johnston, Brian Kemp, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger.(Tyson, Bryan)
September 9, 2022 Filing 253 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for State Defendants served their Responses and Objections to the CBC and AAAJ Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for Production of Documents by Gregory W. Edwards, Georgia State Election Board, Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice Johnston, Brian Kemp, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Matthew Mashburn(in his official capacity as a member of the Georgia State Election Board), Brad Raffensperger, The Georgia State Election Board, The State of Georgia.(Schaerr, Gene) Modified on 9/19/2022 to remove all caps text (adg).
September 6, 2022 Filing 252 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex Khoury on behalf of non-party subpoena recipients (Khoury, K.) Text modified on 9/8/2022 (adg).
September 2, 2022 Filing 251 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Amended Responses to Interrogatories by The United States of America.(Jhaveri, Sejal)
September 2, 2022 Filing 250 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bibb County Board of Elections, Bibb County Board of Registrars, Karen Evans-Daniel, Joel Hazard, Mike Kaplan, Darius Maynard, Veronica Seals, Herbert Spangler.(Noland, William)
August 29, 2022 Filing 249 NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD for Republican National Committee, The State of Georgia regarding RECLAMATION AND DISPOSITION OF UNCLAIMED Documentary EXHIBITS pursuant to Local Rule 79.1D. Re: #247 Exhibits. (tas)
August 29, 2022 Filing 248 NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD for Plaintiffs Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, The Arc of the United States, The New Georgia Project regarding RECLAMATION AND DISPOSITION OF UNCLAIMED Documentary EXHIBITS pursuant to Local Rule 79.1D. Re: #246 Exhibits. (tas)
August 29, 2022 Filing 247 Defendant's EXHIBITS (Documentary) admitted and retained at the #227 Motion Hearing, have been received from Courtroom Deputy and placed in the custody of the Records Clerks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 39, #39 Exhibit 40, #40 Exhibit 41, #41 Exhibit 45, #42 Exhibit 46 Pages 1-30, #43 Exhibit 46 Pages 31-60, #44 Exhibit 47, #45 Exhibit 48, #46 Exhibit 49)(tas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/30/2022: #47 Exhibit defendant's exhibit 4) (bla).
August 29, 2022 Filing 246 Plaintiff's EXHIBITS (Documentary) admitted and retained at the #227 Motion Hearing, have been received from Courtroom Deputy and placed in the custody of the Records Clerks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35 Pages 1-29, #36 Exhibit 35 Pages 30-59, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44)(tas)
August 25, 2022 Filing 245 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for State Defendants' First Consolidated Production (CDR00000001 - CDR00018450) by Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice Johnston, Brian Kemp, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn(in his official capacity as a member of the Georgia State Election Board), Brad Raffensperger.(Tyson, Bryan)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting Spencer W. Klein's (125) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice in case 1:21-cv-01229-JPB / (244) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice in case 1:21-mi-55555-JPB. So ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 08/25/22. Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01229-JPBIf the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jkl)
August 24, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: (125 in 1:21-cv-01229-JPB) APPLICATION for Admission of Spencer W. Klein Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12010869).. Attorney Spencer Klein added appearing on behalf of The New Georgia Project Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01229-JPB(kkh)
August 19, 2022 Filing 244 APPLICATION for Admission of Spencer W. Klein Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number GANDC-12010869).. Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01229-JPB(Sparks, Adam) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 19, 2022 Filing 243 NOTICE of Appearance Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01229-JPB(Sparks, Adam)
August 19, 2022 Filing 242 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Admission to State Defendants by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Adapt, Georgia Advocacy Office, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Southern Christian Leadership Conference.(Aden, Leah)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER AND OPINION DENYING #171 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and DENYING #185 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 8/18/2022. (jkl)
August 16, 2022 Filing 240 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by The United States of America for Subpoenas for Depositions to Members of the Georgia General Assembly and Georgia Lieutenant Governor (Richardson, Jasmyn)
August 12, 2022 Filing 239 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Anjali Enjeti-Sydow, Steven J Paik, Deepum Patel, Thao Tran, Thuy Hang Tran, Nora Aquino, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta (re Plaintiffs' Supplemental Initial Disclosures) Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01333-JPB(Lauridsen, R.)
August 12, 2022 Filing 238 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Nora Aquino, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Anjali Enjeti-Sydow, Steven J Paik, Deepum Patel, Thao Tran, Thuy Hang Tran (Plaintiffs' Production Volume 1 in Response to State Defendants First Set of Req. for Prod. of 3/9/22 and Intervenor-Defendants First Requests for Production of Documents of 4/15/22) Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01333-JPB(Lauridsen, R.)
August 10, 2022 Filing 236 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): September 7-8, 2022, September 26-28, 2022 and October 20-21, 2022, by Daniel Walter White. (White, Daniel)
August 9, 2022 Filing 235 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by The United States of America for the United States' Responses to Defendants' First Set of Discovery Requests (Richardson, Jasmyn)
August 9, 2022 Filing 234 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/18/2022, before Judge Boulee. Court Reporter/Transcriber PENNY COUDRIET. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/30/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/9/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of filing) (ppc)
August 8, 2022 Filing 233 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of discovery by Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee.(Carver, William)
August 5, 2022 Filing 232 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta (re CBC and AAAJ Plaintiffs' First Sets of Req. for Prod. of Docs. to State Defendants, and Defendants-Intervenors) Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01333-JPB(Lauridsen, R.)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER in case 1:21-mi-55555-JPB granting #229 Motion for Protective Order Regarding DDS Data. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Stipulated Protective Order [Doc 229-1] is approved and incorporated by reference as if fully set forth herein. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 8/5/2022. Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB et al.(ane)
August 5, 2022 Filing 230 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of the Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to the State Defendants by Common Cause, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc., Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe.(Sells, Bryan)
August 5, 2022 Filing 229 Consent MOTION for Protective Order Regarding DDS Data by The United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-02575-JPB(Ryan, Elizabeth)
August 2, 2022 Filing 228 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for State Defendants' production bates labeled SOS0004034 - SOS0004700 in response to Consolidated Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents by Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice Johnston, Brian Kemp, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger.(Tyson, Bryan)
July 27, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #225 APPLICATION for Admission of Brittni Hamilton Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number GANDC-11948835).. Attorney Brittni Hamilton added appearing on behalf of Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Women Watch Afrika (cdg)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER {by Docket Entry Only}: The #225 Application for Admission of Brittni Hamilton Pro Hac Vice is hereby GRANTED. Ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 7/27/22. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ceo)
July 25, 2022 Filing 226 STATUS REPORT by The United States of America. (O'Connor, Maura Eileen)
July 25, 2022 Filing 225 APPLICATION for Admission of Brittni Hamilton Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number GANDC-11948835).by Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Women Watch Afrika. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01284-JPB(Winichakul, Pichaya) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 19, 2022 Filing 224 Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Defendants and Intervenor-Defendants entered by Honest Elections Project. Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB et al.(anc)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER granting #201 Motion for Leave to File.. The Clerk is DIRECTED to docket Honest Elections Project's Amicus Curiae Brief. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 7/19/2022. Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB et al.(anc)
July 19, 2022 Submission of #201 Motion for Leave to File an Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Defendants and Intervenor-Defendants, to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (ceo)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER {by Docket Entry Only}: The Court has reviewed the Joint Status Report #222 . Per the parties' request, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file a Second Joint Status Report no later than July 25, 2022. Ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 7/19/22. (ceo)
July 18, 2022 Filing 227 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. P. Boulee: Motion Hearing held on 7/18/2022 re #171 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #185 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiffs Exhibits 1-38 admitted. Defendants Exhibits 1-37 and 46-49 admitted. Defendants Exhibits 39, 40, 41 admitted. Plaintiffs Exhibits 40-44 admitted. Defendants Exhibit 45 admitted. Witnesses sworn and testified. Hearing concluded. See transcript for additional details. Exhibits retained to be forwarded to the Clerks Office. (Court Reporter Penny Coudriet)(adg)
July 18, 2022 Filing 222 STATUS REPORT by The United States of America. Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-02575-JPB(Ryan, Elizabeth)
July 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER granting #220 Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 7/17/22. (ceo)
July 17, 2022 NOTICE OF VIDEO PROCEEDING re: #185 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. FOR REMOTE ATTENDANCE AND VIEWING. Motion Hearing set for 7/18/2022 at 09:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1908 before Judge J. P. Boulee. Connection Instructions: Join ZoomGov Meeting https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1619813465 Meeting ID: 161 981 3465 Passcode: 790803 or dial +1 669 254 5252 US (San Jose) Meeting ID: 161 981 3465 Passcode: 790803. You must follow the instructions of the Court for remote proceedings available #here. The procedure for filing documentary exhibits admitted during the proceeding is available #here. Photographing, recording, or broadcasting of any judicial proceedings, including proceedings held by video teleconferencing or telephone conferencing, is strictly and absolutely prohibited. (ceo)
July 15, 2022 Filing 220 Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom by Exousia Lighthouse International C.M., Inc., Faith in Action Network, First Congregational Church, United Church of Christ Incorporated, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Inc., Greater Works Ministries Network, Inc., Metropolitan Atlanta Baptist Ministers Union, Inc., Mijente, Inc., Samuel Dewitt Proctor Conference, Inc., Sankofa United Church of Christ Limited, The Concerned Black Clergy of Metropolitan Atlanta, Inc., The Justice Initiative, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB et al.(Unger, Jess)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER granting #155 Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom on July 18, 2022 in case 1:21-cv-01284-JPB; granting #218 Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom on July 18, 2022 in case 1:21-mi-55555-JPB. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 7/15/2022. Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01284-JPB(anc)
July 14, 2022 Filing 218 Second Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Adapt, Georgia Advocacy Office, Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Southern Christian Leadership Conference, The Arc of the United States, Women Watch Afrika. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01284-JPB(Faransso, Tania)
July 13, 2022 Filing 217 RESPONSE in Support re #185 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Black Voters Matter Fund, Jauan Durbin, Fannie Marie Jackson Gibbs, Rise, Inc., Elbert Solomon, The New Georgia Project. (Nkwonta, Uzoma)
July 13, 2022 Filing 216 REPLY to Response to #171 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Adapt, Georgia Advocacy Office, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Southern Christian Leadership Conference. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sophia Lin Lakin in Support Thereto, #2 Exhibit 1 - Benning Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 - Brower Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 - Flack Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 - Response to Declarations)Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01259-JPB, 1:21-cv-01284-JPB(Adegbile, Debo) Modified on 7/14/2022to update text (anc).
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER granting #213 Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom on July 18, 2022. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 7/13/2022. (anc)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER granting #211 Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom on July 18, 2022. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 7/13/2022. (anc)
July 13, 2022 Filing 213 Second Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom by Black Voters Matter Fund, Jauan Durbin, Fannie Marie Jackson Gibbs, Rise, Inc., Elbert Solomon, The New Georgia Project. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sparks, Adam)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER {by Docket Entry Only}: The Certificate of Consent to Withdraw of Spencer McCandless as Counsel of Record #212 is APPROVED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to remove Mr. McCandless as counsel of record for Plaintiffs. Ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 7/13/22. (ceo)
July 12, 2022 Filing 212 Certificate of Consent to Withdraw Spencer McCandless as Attorneyby Black Voters Matter Fund, Jauan Durbin, Fannie Marie Jackson Gibbs, Rise, Inc., Elbert Solomon, The New Georgia Project. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McCandless, Spencer) Text modified on 7/13/2022 (adg).
July 12, 2022 Filing 211 Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom by Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaufman, Alex)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER granting #209 Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom on July 18, 2022. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 7/12/2022. (anc)
July 12, 2022 Filing 209 Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom by Black Voters Matter Fund, Jauan Durbin, Fannie Marie Jackson Gibbs, Rise, Inc., Elbert Solomon, The New Georgia Project. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sparks, Adam)
July 12, 2022 Filing 208 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. P. Boulee: Discovery Hearing held on 7/12/2022. The parties are ordered to provide a status report regarding the dispute no later than July 18, 2022. (Court Reporter Penny Coudriet)(anc)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER granting #206 Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom on Monday, July 18, 2022. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 7/12/2022. (anc)
July 12, 2022 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: #185 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. THIS IS A TIME CHANGE ONLY. Motion Hearing set for 7/18/2022 at 09:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1908 before Judge J. P. Boulee. (ceo)
July 11, 2022 Filing 206 Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom by Gregory W. Edwards, Georgia State Election Board, Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice Johnston, Brian Kemp, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, The Georgia State Election Board, The State of Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaerr, Gene)
July 8, 2022 RETURN of #202 APPLICATION for Admission of Emily A. Hasselberg Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number GANDC-11901953). to attorney for correction re: application filed in member case. (gas)
July 8, 2022 NOTICE OF VIDEO PROCEEDING : Discovery Dispute Hearing set for 7/12/2022 at 09:00 AM via Zoom before Judge J. P. Boulee. Connection Instructions: Join ZoomGov Meeting https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1602402211 Meeting ID: 160 240 2211 Passcode: 132119 or dial +1 669 254 5252 US (San Jose) Meeting ID: 160 240 2211 Passcode: 132119. You must follow the instructions of the Court for remote proceedings available #here. The procedure for filing documentary exhibits admitted during the proceeding is available #here. Photographing, recording, or broadcasting of any judicial proceedings, including proceedings held by video teleconferencing or telephone conferencing, is strictly and absolutely prohibited. (ceo)
July 7, 2022 Filing 205 NOTICE by The United States of America of Consolidated/Joint Discovery Statement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpt from Pls' RFPs, #2 Exhibit B - Excerpt from Ds' RFP Responses, #3 Exhibit C - State Matching Criteria)Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-02575-JPB(Ryan, Elizabeth)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER granting (203) Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom on July 18, 2022 in case 1:21-mi-55555-JPB. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 7/1/2022. Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01284-JPB(anc)
July 1, 2022 Filing 203 Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Adapt, Georgia Advocacy Office, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Southern Christian Leadership Conference. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lakin, Sophia)
July 1, 2022 Filing 202 APPLICATION for Admission of Emily A. Hasselberg Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number GANDC-11901953). with Brief In Support by Nora Aquino, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Anjali Enjeti-Sydow, Steven J Paik, Deepum Patel, Thao Tran, Thuy Hang Tran, Nora Aquino, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Anjali Enjeti-Sydow, Steven J Paik, Deepum Patel, Thao Tran, Thuy Hang Tran. Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01333-JPB(Yoon, Meredyth) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Honest Elections Project filed a Motion for Leave to File an Amicus Curiae Brief on June 30, 2022. In the motion, it indicated that neither State Defendants nor Intervenor Defendants objected to the filing of the brief. It also indicated that the following Plaintiffs groups did not object to the filing: (1) the Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church Plaintiffs, (2) the Georgia State Conference of the NAACP Plaintiffs, (3) and the New Georgia Project Plaintiffs. If any of the remaining parties in this case object to the filing of the brief, the objection shall be filed no later than noon on July 6, 2022. Entered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 07/01/2022. (rvb)
June 30, 2022 Filing 201 MOTION for Leave to File an Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Defendants and Intervenor-Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Brief Honest Elections Project's Amicus Curiae Brief in support of Defendants and Intervenor-Defendants)(Hunter, Gary) Modified on 7/1/2022 - Changed event to motion and modified docket text. (bgt).
June 29, 2022 Filing 200 NOTICE by National Republican Congressional Committee, Republican National Committee re #194 Response in Opposition to Motion, of Supplemental Authority (Norris, Cameron)
June 29, 2022 Filing 199 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fulton County Registration and Elections Board.(Lowman, David)
June 27, 2022 Filing 198 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Subpoena for documents to the Elections Supervisor for Appling County by The United States of America.(Jhaveri, Sejal)
June 24, 2022 Filing 197 RESPONSE in Opposition re (112 in 1:21-cv-01229-JPB, 185 in 1:21-mi-55555-JPB) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , (140 in 1:21-cv-01284-JPB, 171 in 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 85 in 1:21-cv-01259-JPB) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Gregory W. Edwards, Georgia State Election Board, Sara Tindall Ghazal, Brian Kemp, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, The Georgia State Election Board, The State of Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Declaration of C. Ryan Germany, #3 Exhibit SB 202 (excerpts), #4 Exhibit Declaration of Lynn Bailey, #5 Exhibit Expert Report of Dr. Daron Shaw)Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01229-JPB, 1:21-cv-01259-JPB, 1:21-cv-01284-JPB(Schaerr, Gene)
June 24, 2022 Filing 196 RESPONSE in Opposition re (112 in 1:21-cv-01229-JPB, 185 in 1:21-mi-55555-JPB) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Charles Dave, Zurich Deshazior, Don DiStefano, Alfred Jester, Ben Johnson, Roy McClain, Karen Murray, James Newland, James A. O'Brien. Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01229-JPB(Broder, Karl)
June 24, 2022 Filing 195 County Defendants Consolidated Brief in Response re re (171 in 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 140 in 1:21-cv-01284-JPB, 85 in 1:21-cv-01259-JPB) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by AME AND Georgia NAACP filed by DeKalb County Board of Registrations and Elections. Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01259-JPB, 1:21-cv-01284-JPB(Vander Els, Irene) Text modified on 6/24/2022 (adg).
June 24, 2022 Filing 194 RESPONSE in Opposition re (112 in 1:21-cv-01229-JPB, 185 in 1:21-mi-55555-JPB) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , (171 in 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 140 in 1:21-cv-01284-JPB, 85 in 1:21-cv-01259-JPB) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB et al.(Norris, Cameron)
June 24, 2022 Submission of #187 Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom, to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (adg)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER {by Docket Entry Only}: Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Page Limit #192 is GRANTED. Defendants may file a 35-page brief in opposition to the pending motions for preliminary injunction. Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #193 is GRANTED. Responses to the pending preliminary injunction motions are due by June 24, 2022, and replies are due by July 13, 2022. Ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 6/22/22. (ceo)
June 21, 2022 Submission of #193 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Preliminary Injunctions, #192 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages, #180 MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/24/22 to File Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction re: #171 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (ceo)
June 20, 2022 Filing 193 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Preliminary Injunctions by Georgia State Election Board, Brian Kemp, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, David Worley, Gregory W. Edwards, Georgia State Election Board, Sara Tindall Ghazal, Brian Kemp, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, The Georgia State Election Board, The State of Georgia, Gregory W. Edwards, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, David Worley, Sara Tindall Ghazal, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01229-JPB, 1:21-cv-01259-JPB, 1:21-cv-01284-JPB(Tyson, Bryan)
June 20, 2022 Filing 192 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Gregory W. Edwards, Georgia State Election Board, Sara Tindall Ghazal, Brian Kemp, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, The Georgia State Election Board, The State of Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tyson, Bryan)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER granting #89 , #146 , #190 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ilya Feldsherov terminated. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 6/17/2022. Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01259-JPB, 1:21-cv-01284-JPB(anc)
June 15, 2022 Filing 190 MOTION to Withdraw Ilya Feldsherov as Attorney by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Adapt, Georgia Advocacy Office, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Southern Christian Leadership Conference. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01259-JPB, 1:21-cv-01284-JPB(Faransso, Tania) Modified on 6/16/2022 to update motion type (anc). .
June 13, 2022 Filing 189 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): June 24, 2022 - July 11, 2022, by Jess Unger. Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB et al.(Unger, Jess)
June 8, 2022 Filing 188 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Fulton County Dfts Responses to Plts' 1st Set of Rpds by Fulton County Registration and Elections Board.(Lowman, David)
June 7, 2022 Filing 187 Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom by Georgia Republican Party, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order)Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01229-JPB(Kaufman, Alex)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER {by Docket Entry Only}: In light of attorney scheduling conflicts with the hearing currently scheduled for July 7, 2022, the hearing has been rescheduled for July 18, 2022, beginning at 9:30AM. This hearing will pertain to both pending motions for preliminary injunction #171 and #185 and will last one day (equal time per side). The parties should note that the Court currently has a week-long criminal trial scheduled to begin on July 19, 2022. The following briefing schedule applies to both pending preliminary injunction motions: response briefs are due June 22 and reply briefs are due July 11. Ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 6/7/22. (ceo)
June 3, 2022 Filing 186 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by The United States of America Subpoena for Documents to Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP (Richardson, Jasmyn)
June 3, 2022 Filing 185 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Brief In Support by Black Voters Matter Fund, Jauan Durbin, Fannie Marie Jackson Gibbs, Rise, Inc., Elbert Solomon, The New Georgia Project, Black Voters Matter Fund, Jauan Durbin, Fannie Marie Jackson Gibbs, Rise, Inc., Elbert Solomon, The New Georgia Project. (Attachments: #1 Brief ISO PI Motion, #2 Affidavit PI Attorney Decl., #3 Ex. 1 - Mary-Pat Hector Decl., #4 Ex. 2 - Jauan Durbin Decl., #5 Ex. 3 - Billy Honor Decl., #6 Ex. 4 - Ebony Brown Decl., #7 Ex. 5 - Christopher Johnson Decl., #8 Ex. 6 - Esohe Galbreath Decl., #9 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01229-JPB(Nkwonta, Uzoma) Modified on 6/6/2022 to edit text (ane).
June 3, 2022 Filing 184 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): July 5-July 8, 2022, August 15-August 17, 2022, by Daniel Walter White. Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01229-JPB, 1:21-cv-01259-JPB, 1:21-cv-01284-JPB, 1:21-cv-01333-JPB(White, Daniel)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER {by Docket Entry Only}: It is hereby ORDERED that State Defendants' response to the pending Motion for Preliminary Injunction dated May 25, 2022 #171 , is due by June 21, 2022, and any reply brief in support of the motion is due by noon on July 5, 2022. The Court will hold a hearing on the motion on July 7, 2022, beginning at 9:30 AM. A hearing notice and additional details will follow. Ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 6/3/22. (ceo)
June 1, 2022 Filing 183 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiffs' Responses to State Defendants' Discovery Requests by Common Cause, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc., Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe.(Houk, Julie)
June 1, 2022 Filing 182 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendant-Intervenors' Discovery Requests by Common Cause, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc., Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe.(Houk, Julie)
June 1, 2022 Filing 181 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Black Voters Matter Fund, Jauan Durbin, Fannie Marie Jackson Gibbs, Rise, Inc., Elbert Solomon, The New Georgia Project.(Sparks, Adam)
June 1, 2022 Filing 180 MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/24/22 to File Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction re: #171 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Georgia State Election Board, Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice Johnston, Brian Kemp, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaerr, Gene)
June 1, 2022 Filing 179 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Adapt, Georgia Advocacy Office, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Southern Christian Leadership Conference.(Aden, Leah)
May 31, 2022 Filing 178 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Nora Aquino, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Anjali Enjeti-Sydow, Steven J Paik, Deepum Patel, Thao Tran, Thuy Hang Tran (re Plaintiffs Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Steven J. Paik, Deepum Patel, Nora Aquino, Thuy Hang Tran, Thao Tran, and Anjali Enjeti-Sydows Responses and Objections to Intervenor-Defendants' First Requests for Production of Documents, Interrogatories, and Requests for Admission to Plaintiffs (Verified)) Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB et al.(Lauridsen, R.)
May 31, 2022 Filing 177 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR UNITED STATES FIRST SET OF RESPONSES TO INTERVENOR-DEFENDANTS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES, REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION, AND REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS by The United States of America.(Rich, James)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 176 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY FOR COUNTY DEFENDANT ENTITIES AND INDIVIDUALS re #163 Motion for Order. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 5/31/2022. (adg)
May 31, 2022 Submission of #163 Consent MOTION for Order Regarding the Production of Electronically Stored Information by County Defendants, to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (ceo)
May 27, 2022 Filing 175 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of State Defendants Responses & Objections to AAAJ Plaintiffs' First Interrogatories by Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice Johnston, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Matthew Mashburn(in his official capacity as a member of the Georgia State Election Board), Brad Raffensperger.(Schaerr, Gene)
May 27, 2022 Filing 174 NOTICE of Appearance by James Eric Rich on behalf of The United States of America (Rich, James)
May 26, 2022 Filing 173 NOTICE by Exousia Lighthouse International C.M., Inc., Faith in Action Network, First Congregational Church, United Church of Christ Incorporated, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Inc., Greater Works Ministries Network, Inc., Metropolitan Atlanta Baptist Ministers Union, Inc., Mijente, Inc., Samuel Dewitt Proctor Conference, Inc., Sankofa United Church of Christ Limited, The Concerned Black Clergy of Metropolitan Atlanta, Inc., The Justice Initiative, Inc. re #171 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction CBC Plaintiffs' Notice of Joinder in Georgia NAACP Plaintiffs' and AME Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Kastorf, Kurt)
May 26, 2022 Filing 172 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Forsyth County Defendants' Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories by Forsyth County Board of Voter Registrations and Elections, Mandi B Smith.(Jaugstetter, Patrick)
May 25, 2022 Filing 171 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Brief In Support by Common Cause, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Adapt, Georgia Advocacy Office, Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc., Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Southern Christian Leadership Conference, The Arc of the United States, The Urban League of Greater Atlanta, Inc., Women Watch Afrika. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Declaration of Sophia Lin Lakin, #3 Exhibit 1 - Bray Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 - Briggins Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 - Brower Declaration, #6 Exhibit 4 - Clarke Declaration, #7 Exhibit 5 - Cobham Declaration, #8 Exhibit 6 - Enriquez Declaration, #9 Exhibit 7 - Gaymon Delcaration, #10 Exhibit 8 - Jackson Declaration, #11 Exhibit 9 - Khabani Declaration, #12 Exhibit 10 - Kilanko Declaration, #13 Exhibit 11 - Kinard Declaration, #14 Exhibit 12 - Mayes Declaration, #15 Exhibit 13 - Paul Declaration, #16 Exhibit 14 - Ramirez Declaration, #17 Exhibit 15 - Robinson Declaration, #18 Exhibit 16 - Scott Declaration, #19 Exhibit 17 - Sutton Declaration, #20 Exhibit 18 - Tharpe Declaration, #21 Exhibit 19 - Pettigrew Declaration, #22 Exhibit 20 - Excerpts of Responses and Objections, #23 Exhibit 21 - Excerpts of Response, #24 Exhibit 22 - Excerpts of Kidd Deposition, #25 Declaration of Julie M. Houk, #26 Exhibit 1 - Dennis Declaration, #27 Exhibit 2 - Griggs Declaration, #28 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01259-JPB, 1:21-cv-01284-JPB(Aden, Leah)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER {by Docket Entry Only}: Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages #170 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs may file a thirty-five page brief in support of their Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 5/20/22. Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01284-JPB(ceo)
May 19, 2022 Filing 170 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Adapt, Georgia Advocacy Office, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Southern Christian Leadership Conference. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01284-JPB(Faransso, Tania)
May 18, 2022 Filing 169 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of State Defendants Responses & Objections to NGP Plaintiffs' First Interrogatories by Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice Johnston, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Matthew Mashburn(in his official capacity as a member of the Georgia State Election Board), Brad Raffensperger.(Schaerr, Gene)
May 17, 2022 Filing 168 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Brooks County Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' First Interrogatories by Charles Dave, Zurich Deshazior, Don DiStefano, Karen Murray.(White, Daniel)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 167 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY FOR COUNTY DEFENDANT ENTITIES AND INDIVIDUALS Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 5/16/22. (ceo)
May 13, 2022 Filing 166 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Response to Plaintiffs' 1st Interrogatories by Alfred Jester, Ben Johnson, Roy McClain, James Newland, James A. O'Brien.(Broder, Karl)
May 13, 2022 Filing 165 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Cobb County Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' First Request for Production by Jessica M. Brooks, Steven Bruning, Cobb County Board of Elections and Registration, Janine Eveler, Pat Gartland(in their official capacities as Members of the COBB County Board of Elections and Registration), Jennifer Mosbacher(member of the Cobb County Board of Elections and Registration in their official capacities), Tori Silas.(White, Daniel)
May 13, 2022 Filing 164 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Brooks County Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' First Request for Production by Charles Dave, Zurich Deshazior, Don DiStefano, Karen Murray.(White, Daniel)
May 13, 2022 Filing 163 Consent MOTION for Order Regarding the Production of Electronically Stored Information by County Defendants by Common Cause, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc., Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: ESI agreement)(Sells, Bryan)
May 13, 2022 Filing 162 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery, by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Adapt, Georgia Advocacy Office, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Southern Christian Leadership Conference.(Faransso, Tania)
May 12, 2022 Filing 161 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Adapt, Georgia Advocacy Office, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Southern Christian Leadership Conference.(Aden, Leah)
May 12, 2022 Filing 160 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): May 23-27, 2022, July 5-8, 2022, September 2-6, 2022, September 16-19, 2022, September 30, 2022, by Joyce Gist Lewis. (Lewis, Joyce) (adg).
May 10, 2022 Filing 159 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Adapt, Georgia Advocacy Office, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Southern Christian Leadership Conference.(Aden, Leah)
May 10, 2022 Filing 158 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Black Voters Matter Fund, Jauan Durbin, Fannie Marie Jackson Gibbs, Rise, Inc., Elbert Solomon, The New Georgia Project.(Sparks, Adam)
May 6, 2022 Filing 157 NOTICE of Appearance by James F. Banter on behalf of Clarke County Board of Election and Voter Registration, Willa Jean Fambrough, Hunaid Qadir, Rocky Raffle, Adam Shirley, Charlotte Sosebee, Ann Till Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01284-JPB(Banter, James)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER {by Docket Entry Only}: Baxter D. Drennon's #156 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice is hereby GRANTED. Ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 5/5/22. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ceo)
May 5, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #156 APPLICATION for Admission of Baxter D. Drennon Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11772380). Attorney Baxter D. Drennon added appearing on behalf of Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee (cdg)
May 2, 2022 Filing 156 APPLICATION for Admission of Baxter D. Drennon Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11772380).by Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (Kaufman, Alex) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
May 2, 2022 Filing 155 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Erik Heard on behalf of Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Women Watch Afrika Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01284-JPB(Heard, Bradley)
May 2, 2022 Filing 154 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 5/9/22 - 5/17/22; 6/13/22 - 6/24/22; 6/27/22 - 7/1/22, by Bryan P. Tyson. (Tyson, Bryan)
April 29, 2022 Filing 153 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of State Defendants' Responses & Objections to Plaintiffs' First Interrogatories by Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice Johnston, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Matthew Mashburn(in his official capacity as a member of the Georgia State Election Board), Brad Raffensperger.(Schaerr, Gene)
April 27, 2022 Filing 152 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): June 27, 2022 - July 1, 2022, by Bryan P. Tyson. (Tyson, Bryan)
April 27, 2022 Filing 151 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for State Defendants' production bates labeled SOS0004033 in response to Consolidated Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents by Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice Johnston, Brian Kemp, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger.(Tyson, Bryan)
April 26, 2022 Filing 150 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Re Plaintiffs Rule 5.4 Notice Of Service Of Discovery by Nora Aquino, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Anjali Enjeti-Sydow, Steven J Paik, Deepum Patel, Thao Tran, Thuy Hang Tran.(Lauridsen, R.)
April 26, 2022 Filing 149 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Re Plaintiffs Rule 5.4 Notice Of Service Of Discovery by Nora Aquino, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Anjali Enjeti-Sydow, Steven J Paik, Deepum Patel, Thao Tran, Thuy Hang Tran.(Lauridsen, R.)
April 26, 2022 Filing 148 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE submitted by Alfred Jester, Ben Johnson, Roy McClain, James Newland, James A. O'Brien.(Broder, Karl)
April 22, 2022 Filing 147 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Re Plaintiffs Rule 5.4 Notice Of Service Of Discovery by Nora Aquino, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Anjali Enjeti-Sydow, Steven J Paik, Deepum Patel, Thao Tran, Thuy Hang Tran.
April 22, 2022 Filing 146 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Clarke County Board of Election and Voter Registration, Willa Jean Fambrough, Hunaid Qadir, Rocky Raffle, Adam Shirley, Charlotte Sosebee, Ann Till.(Sowell, Gregory)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER denying #12 MOTION for Reconsideration re ( 86 in 1:21-cv-01229-JPB) Order on Motion to Dismiss and Order on MOTION for Certificate of Appealability ; denying #12 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/21/2022. (abm) Modified on 4/25/2022 to edit docket text(abm).
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER denying #11 MOTION for Reconsideration re (69 in 1:21-cv-02575-JPB, 69 in 1:21-cv-02575-JPB, 69 in 1:21-cv-02575-JPB) Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment MOTION for Certificate of Appealability . See Order for further details. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/21/2022. (abm)
April 21, 2022 Filing 143 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Debra DeBerry, Debra DeBerry Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-02575-JPB(Vander Els, Irene)
April 20, 2022 Filing 142 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Subpoena for documents to the Clerk of DeKalb County Superior Court by The United States of America.(Ryan, Elizabeth)
April 20, 2022 Filing 141 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Forsyth County Board of Voter Registrations and Elections, Barbara Luth, Joel Natt, Carla Radzikinas, Mandi B Smith.(Jaugstetter, Patrick)
April 19, 2022 Filing 140 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Columbia County Board of Elections, Columbia County Board of Registrars.(Bell, Jordan)
April 19, 2022 Filing 139 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Black Voters Matter Fund, Jauan Durbin, Fannie Marie Jackson Gibbs, Rise, Inc., Elbert Solomon, The New Georgia Project.(Sparks, Adam)
April 18, 2022 Filing 138 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bibb County Board of Elections, Bibb County Board of Registrars, Karen Evans-Daniel, Joel Hazard, Mike Kaplan, Darius Maynard, Veronica Seals, Herbert Spangler.(Martin, Grace)
April 18, 2022 Filing 137 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Richmond Defendants by Sherry T. Barnes, Marcia Brown, Terence Dicks, Travis Doss, Jr, Issac McAdams, Tim McFalls, Richmond County Board of Elections.(Mack, Rachel)
April 18, 2022 Filing 136 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by DeKalb County Board of Registrations and Elections Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01284-JPB, 1:21-cv-01333-JPB(Momo, Shelley)
April 18, 2022 Filing 135 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Response to Plaintiffs' Request for Production by Ken Cochran, Hall County Board of Elections and Registration, David Kennedy, Craig Lutz, Gala Sheats, Tom Smiley, Lori Wurtz.(Bloodworth, Kristin)
April 18, 2022 Filing 134 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Clayton County Board of Elections and Registration.(Sabzevari, Arash)
April 18, 2022 Filing 133 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chatham County Board of Elections, Chatham County Board of Registrars.(Sabzevari, Arash)
April 18, 2022 Filing 132 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by George Awuku, Stephen W. Day, Gwinnett County Board of Registrations and Elections, Zach Manifold, Alice O'Lenick, Anthony Rodriguez, Wandy Taylor(in their official capacities as Members of the GWINNETT County Board of Registrations and Elections).(Wilson, Melanie)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER {by Docket Entry Only}: Because the Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church will continue to be represented by other counsel, Sean J. Youngs Motion to Withdraw as Counsel #131 is GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to remove Mr. Young as counsel for Plaintiff. Ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/15/22. (ceo)
April 14, 2022 Filing 131 MOTION to Withdraw Sean Young as Attorneyby Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church. (Young, Sean)
April 8, 2022 Filing 130 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The United States of America.(Jhaveri, Sejal)
April 7, 2022 Filing 129 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for State Defendants' production bates labeled (SOS0000001 through SOS0004032) in response to Consolidated Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents by Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice Johnston, Brian Kemp, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger.(Tyson, Bryan)
April 4, 2022 Filing 128 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 5.4 by DeKalb County Board of Registrations and Elections, Janine Eveler, Nancy Jester, Anthony Lewis, Susan Motter, Dele L. Smith, Karli Swift.(Vander Els, Irene)
March 31, 2022 Filing 127 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): April 5, 2022 - April 11, 2022, July 5, 2022 - July 12, 2022 , by Kristin K Bloodworth. Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB et al.(Bloodworth, Kristin) Modified on 3/31/2022 to include dates of leave(adg).
March 30, 2022 Filing 126 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE CBC Plaintiffs' Rule 5.4 Notice of Service of Discovery by The Concerned Black Clergy of Metropolitan Atlanta, Inc..(Kastorf, Kurt)
March 25, 2022 Filing 125 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Subpoena for Documents to the Supervisor of Elections for Mitchell County by The United States of America.(O'Connor, Maura Eileen)
March 25, 2022 Filing 124 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Request for Production of Documents to Brooks County Defendants by The United States of America.(O'Connor, Maura Eileen)
March 25, 2022 Filing 123 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Subpoena for Documents to Election Supervisor for Peach County by The United States of America.(O'Connor, Maura Eileen)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER GRANTING #120 Motion for Entry of ESI Order. The Stipulation and Order Regarding Discovery ( #120 -1) is approved and incorporated by reference as if fully set forth herein. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 3/21/2022. (adg)
March 21, 2022 Submission of #120 Consent MOTION for Order regarding ESI, to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (adg)
March 18, 2022 Filing 121 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for State Defendants' Responses to Consolidated Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents by Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice Johnston, Brian Kemp, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger.(Tyson, Bryan)
March 18, 2022 Filing 120 Consent MOTION for Order regarding ESI by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding ESI)Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB et al.(O'Connor, Maura Eileen)
March 17, 2022 Filing 119 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Women Watch Afrika , Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Latino Community Fund Georgia, and The Arc of the United States. Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB et al.(Jedreski, Matthew) Modified on 3/21/2022 to correct filer information. (adg).
March 14, 2022 Filing 118 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Consolidated Plaintiffs' Discovery Requests to Spalding County and Brooks County Defendants by Nora Aquino, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Black Voters Matter Fund, Common Cause, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Jauan Durbin, Anjali Enjeti-Sydow, Exousia Lighthouse International C.M., Inc., Faith in Action Network, First Congregational Church, United Church of Christ Incorporated, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Adapt, Georgia Advocacy Office, Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Inc., Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Greater Works Ministries Network, Inc., Fannie Marie Jackson Gibbs, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc., Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe, Metropolitan Atlanta Baptist Ministers Union, Inc., Mijente, Inc., Steven J Paik, Deepum Patel, Rise, Inc., Samuel Dewitt Proctor Conference, Inc., Sankofa United Church of Christ Limited, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Elbert Solomon, Southern Christian Leadership Conference, The Arc of the United States, The Concerned Black Clergy of Metropolitan Atlanta, Inc., The Justice Initiative, Inc., The New Georgia Project, The United States of America, The Urban League of Greater Atlanta, Inc., Thao Tran, Thuy Hang Tran, Women Watch Afrika.(Sparks, Adam)
March 14, 2022 Filing 117 NOTICE of Appearance by Grace Simms Martin on behalf of Bibb County Board of Elections, Bibb County Board of Registrars, Henry Ficklin, Mike Kaplan, Veronica Seals, Jeanetta R. Watson, Karen Evans-Daniel, Joel Hazard, Darius Maynard, Herbert Spangler Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01284-JPB(Martin, Grace)
March 10, 2022 Filing 116 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Discovery Requests to Plaintiffs by Gregory W. Edwards, Georgia State Election Board, Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice Johnston, Brian Kemp, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Matthew Mashburn(in his official capacity as a member of the Georgia State Election Board), Brad Raffensperger, The Georgia State Election Board, The State of Georgia.(Schaerr, Gene)
March 10, 2022 Filing 115 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Subpoena for documents to the Director of Elections and Registration for Muscogee County by The United States of America.(O'Connor, Maura Eileen)
March 7, 2022 Filing 114 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Plaintiffs' Request for Production of Documents to Forsyth County Defendants filed by Nora Aquino, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Anjali Enjeti-Sydow, Steven J Paik, Deepum Patel, Thao Tran, Thuy Hang Tran Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01333-JPB(Lauridsen, R.) Modified on 3/8/2022 to remove all caps text (adg).
March 7, 2022 Filing 113 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Adapt, Georgia Advocacy Office, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Southern Christian Leadership Conference.(Faransso, Tania)
March 7, 2022 Filing 112 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Request for Production of Documents to Fulton County Defendants by The United States of America.(Ryan, Elizabeth)
March 7, 2022 Filing 111 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Request for Production of Documents to DeKalb County Defendants by The United States of America.(Ryan, Elizabeth)
March 7, 2022 Filing 110 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by The United States of America for Request for Production of Documents to Richmond County Defendants (Richardson, Jasmyn)
March 4, 2022 Filing 109 NOTICE of Consolidated Plaintiffs' Rule 5.4 Service of Discovery by Nora Aquino, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Black Voters Matter Fund, Common Cause, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Jauan Durbin, Anjali Enjeti-Sydow, Exousia Lighthouse International C.M., Inc., Faith in Action Network, First Congregational Church, United Church of Christ Incorporated, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Adapt, Georgia Advocacy Office, Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Inc., Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Greater Works Ministries Network, Inc., Fannie Marie Jackson Gibbs, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc., Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe, Metropolitan Atlanta Baptist Ministers Union, Inc., Mijente, Inc., Steven J Paik, Deepum Patel, Rise, Inc., Samuel Dewitt Proctor Conference, Inc., Sankofa United Church of Christ Limited, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Elbert Solomon, Southern Christian Leadership Conference, The Arc of the United States, The Concerned Black Clergy of Metropolitan Atlanta, Inc., The Justice Initiative, Inc., The New Georgia Project, The United States of America, The Urban League of Greater Atlanta, Inc., Thao Tran, Thuy Hang Tran, Women Watch Afrika Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB et al.(Aden, Leah) Text modified on 3/7/2022 (adg).
February 28, 2022 Filing 108 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 4/27/2022 - 5/10/2022, by Cheryl Ringer. Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01229-JPB, 1:21-cv-01259-JPB, 1:21-cv-01284-JPB, 1:21-cv-01333-JPB(Ringer, Cheryl)
February 24, 2022 Filing 107 NOTICE by Nora Aquino, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Black Voters Matter Fund, Common Cause, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Jauan Durbin, Anjali Enjeti-Sydow, Exousia Lighthouse International C.M., Inc., Faith in Action Network, First Congregational Church, United Church of Christ Incorporated, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Adapt, Georgia Advocacy Office, Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Inc., Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Greater Works Ministries Network, Inc., Fannie Marie Jackson Gibbs, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc., Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe, Metropolitan Atlanta Baptist Ministers Union, Inc., Mijente, Inc., Steven J Paik, Deepum Patel, Rise, Inc., Samuel Dewitt Proctor Conference, Inc., Sankofa United Church of Christ Limited, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Elbert Solomon, Southern Christian Leadership Conference, The Arc of the United States, The Concerned Black Clergy of Metropolitan Atlanta, Inc., The Justice Initiative, Inc., The New Georgia Project, The United States of America, The Urban League of Greater Atlanta, Inc., Thao Tran, Thuy Hang Tran, Women Watch Afrika of Consolidated Plaintiffs' Rule 5.4 Notice of Service of Discovery Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB et al.(Aden, Leah)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 106 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #105 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 2/22/2022. (anc)
February 22, 2022 Filing 105 Consent MOTION for Protective Order by Nora Aquino, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Black Voters Matter Fund, Common Cause, Jauan Durbin, Anjali Enjeti-Sydow, Exousia Lighthouse International C.M., Inc., Faith in Action Network, First Congregational Church, United Church of Christ Incorporated, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Adapt, Georgia Advocacy Office, Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Inc., Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Greater Works Ministries Network, Inc., Fannie Marie Jackson Gibbs, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc., Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe, Metropolitan Atlanta Baptist Ministers Union, Inc., Mijente, Inc., Steven J Paik, Deepum Patel, Rise, Inc., Samuel Dewitt Proctor Conference, Inc., Sankofa United Church of Christ Limited, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Elbert Solomon, Southern Christian Leadership Conference, The Concerned Black Clergy of Metropolitan Atlanta, Inc., The Justice Initiative, Inc., The New Georgia Project, The United States of America, Thao Tran, Thuy Hang Tran, Women Watch Afrika. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB et al.(Sells, Bryan)
February 17, 2022 Filing 104 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/31/2022, before Judge JP Boulee. Court Reporter/Transcriber PENNY COUDRIET. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/10/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of filing) (ppc)
February 15, 2022 Filing 103 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): March 24-25, 2022, April 4-8, 2022, May 23-27, 2022, and July 5-8, 2022, by Joyce Gist Lewis. (Lewis, Joyce)
February 15, 2022 Filing 102 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): March 06, 2022 - March 11, 2022; November 21, 2022 - November 25, 2022, by Alex Benjamin Kaufman. (Kaufman, Alex)
February 10, 2022 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin T. Kucharz on behalf of Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee (Kucharz, Kevin)
February 10, 2022 Filing 100 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL Loren L. AliKhan a by District of Columbia. (AliKhan, Loren) Modified on 2/10/2022 (adg).
February 9, 2022 Filing 99 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): June 8, 2022 - June 22, 2022, by Irene B. Vander Els. (Vander Els, Irene)
February 8, 2022 Filing 98 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of State Defendants' Initial Disclosures by Gregory W. Edwards, Georgia State Election Board, Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice Johnston, Brian Kemp, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Matthew Mashburn(in his official capacity as a member of the Georgia State Election Board), Brad Raffensperger, The Georgia State Election Board, The State of Georgia.(Schaerr, Gene)
February 8, 2022 Filing 97 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by The United States of America (Richardson, Jasmyn)
February 7, 2022 Filing 96 Initial Disclosures by Exousia Lighthouse International C.M., Inc., Faith in Action Network, First Congregational Church, United Church of Christ Incorporated, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Inc., Greater Works Ministries Network, Inc., Metropolitan Atlanta Baptist Ministers Union, Inc., Mijente, Inc., Samuel Dewitt Proctor Conference, Inc., Sankofa United Church of Christ Limited, The Concerned Black Clergy of Metropolitan Atlanta, Inc., The Justice Initiative, Inc..(Kastorf, Kurt)
February 7, 2022 Filing 95 Initial Disclosures by Common Cause, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc., Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe.(Houk, Julie)
February 7, 2022 Filing 94 Amended Initial Disclosures by Black Voters Matter Fund, Jauan Durbin, Fannie Marie Jackson Gibbs, Rise, Inc., Elbert Solomon, The New Georgia Project.(Nkwonta, Uzoma)
February 7, 2022 Filing 93 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures by Nora Aquino, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Anjali Enjeti-Sydow, Steven J Paik, Deepum Patel, Thao Tran, Thuy Hang Tran.(Lauridsen, R.)
February 7, 2022 Filing 92 Initial Disclosures by Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church.(Jedreski, Matthew)
February 7, 2022 Filing 91 Initial Disclosures by Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee.(Carver, William)
February 7, 2022 RETURN of #85 APPLICATION for Admission of Laura Murchie Pro Hac Vice. to attorney for correction re: refund - Application filed in member case. (cdg)
February 7, 2022 RETURN of #83 APPLICATION for Admission of Jeffrey Hetzel Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number BGANDC-11555352). to attorney for correction re: refund. (cdg)
February 7, 2022 RETURN of #86 APPLICATION for Admission of Jeffrey Hetzel Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11566166). to attorney for correction re: refund. (cdg)
February 4, 2022 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by James Cullen Evans on behalf of Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee (Evans, James)
February 4, 2022 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex Benjamin Kaufman on behalf of Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee (Kaufman, Alex)
February 4, 2022 Submission of #11 MOTION for Reconsideration re (69 in 1:21-cv-02575-JPB, 69 in 1:21-cv-02575-JPB, 69 in 1:21-cv-02575-JPB) Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment MOTION for Certificate of Appealability , #12 MOTION for Reconsideration re (86 in 1:21-cv-01229-JPB, 86 in 1:21-cv-01229-JPB, 86 in 1:21-cv-01229-JPB, 86 in 1:21-cv-01229-JPB, 86 in 1:21-cv-01229-JPB, 86 in 1:21-cv-01229-JPB, 86 in 1:21-cv-01229-JPB) Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, Order on Moti MOTION for Certificate of Appealability , #15 Consent MOTION to Substitute Party Defendant Anthony Rodriguez, to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (adg)
February 3, 2022 Filing 88 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION for Reconsideration re (86 in 1:21-cv-01229-JPB, 86 in 1:21-cv-01229-JPB, 86 in 1:21-cv-01229-JPB, 86 in 1:21-cv-01229-JPB, 86 in 1:21-cv-01229-JPB, 86 in 1:21-cv-01229-JPB, 86 in 1:21-cv-01229-JPB) Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, Order on Moti MOTION for Certificate of Appealability filed by Gregory W. Edwards, Georgia State Election Board, Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice Johnston, Brian Kemp, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, The Georgia State Election Board. (Schaerr, Gene)
February 3, 2022 Filing 87 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION for Reconsideration re (69 in 1:21-cv-02575-JPB, 69 in 1:21-cv-02575-JPB, 69 in 1:21-cv-02575-JPB) Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment MOTION for Certificate of Appealability filed by Brad Raffensperger, The Georgia State Election Board, The State of Georgia. (Schaerr, Gene)
February 3, 2022 Filing 86 APPLICATION for Admission of Jeffrey Hetzel Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11566166).by Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (Carver, William) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
February 2, 2022 Filing 85 APPLICATION for Admission of Laura Murchie Pro Hac Vice. with Brief In Support by Nora Aquino, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Anjali Enjeti-Sydow, Steven J Paik, Deepum Patel, Thao Tran, Thuy Hang Tran, Nora Aquino, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Anjali Enjeti-Sydow, Steven J Paik, Deepum Patel, Thao Tran, Thuy Hang Tran. Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01333-JPB(Yoon, Meredyth) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 2/1/22. (bnw)
January 31, 2022 Filing 83 APPLICATION for Admission of Jeffrey Hetzel Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number BGANDC-11555352).by Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (Carver, William) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 31, 2022 Filing 82 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. P. Boulee: The Court held a Scheduling Conference on 1/31/22. See transcript for more details. Docket order forthcoming. Hearing concluded. (Court Reporter Penny Coudriet)(ceo)
January 28, 2022 Filing 81 Initial Disclosures by Columbia County Board of Elections, Columbia County Board of Registrars, Ann Cushman, Wanda Duffie, Nancy L. Gay, Larry Wiggins.(Cathey, Thomas)
January 28, 2022 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Tobias C. Tatum, Sr on behalf of Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice Johnston, Brian Kemp, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger (Tatum, Tobias)
January 28, 2022 Filing 79 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Initial Disclosures by Ken Cochran, Hall County Board of Elections and Registration, David Kennedy, Craig Lutz, Gala Sheats, Tom Smiley, Lori Wurtz.(Bloodworth, Kristin) Modified on 1/31/2022 to correct docket text (adg).
January 28, 2022 Filing 78 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Hall County Defendants Initial Disclosures by Ken Cochran, David Kennedy, Craig Lutz, Gala Sheats, Tom Smiley, Lori Wurtz.(Bloodworth, Kristin)
January 28, 2022 Filing 77 Initial Disclosures by Charles Dave, Zurich Deshazior, Don DiStefano, Karen Murray.(White, Daniel)
January 28, 2022 Filing 76 Initial Disclosures by Bibb County Board of Elections, Bibb County Board of Registrars, Karen Evans-Daniel, Joel Hazard, Mike Kaplan, Darius Maynard, Veronica Seals, Herbert Spangler.(Noland, William)
January 28, 2022 Filing 75 Initial Disclosures by Jessica M. Brooks, Steven Bruning, Cobb County Board of Elections and Registration, Janine Eveler, Pat Gartland(Members of the Cobb County Board of Elections and Registration, in their official capacities), Jennifer Mosbacher, Tori Silas.(White, Daniel)
January 28, 2022 Filing 74 Initial Disclosures by Fulton County Registration and Elections Board.(Lowman, David)
January 28, 2022 Filing 73 Initial Disclosures by Keith Gammage.(Rosenberg, Steven)
January 28, 2022 Filing 72 Initial Disclosures by Wanda Andrews, Chatham County Board of Elections, Chatham County Board of Registrars, Katherine Durso, Debra Geiger, Marianne Heimes, Malinda Hodge, Antan Lang, Thomas J. Mahoney, Colin Mcrae, William L. Norse.(Sabzevari, Arash)
January 28, 2022 Filing 71 Initial Disclosures by Clayton County Board of Elections and Registration, Shauna Dozier, Diane Givens, Dorothy F. Hall, Darlene Johnson, Patricia Pullar, Carol Wesley.(Sabzevari, Arash)
January 28, 2022 Filing 70 Initial Disclosures by Clayton County Board of Elections and Registration, Shauna Dozier, Diane Givens, Dorothy F. Hall, Darlene Johnson, Patricia Pullar, Carol Wesley.(Sabzevari, Arash)
January 28, 2022 Filing 69 Initial Disclosures by DeKalb County Board of Registrations and Elections.(Momo, Shelley)
January 28, 2022 Filing 68 Initial Disclosures by Lynn Bailey, Sherry T. Barnes, Marcia Brown, Terence Dicks, Bob Finnegan, Tim McFalls, Richmond County Board of Elections.(Mack, Rachel)
January 28, 2022 Filing 67 Initial Disclosures by Clarke County Board of Election and Voter Registration, Willa Jean Fambrough, Hunaid Qadir, Rocky Raffle, Adam Shirley, Charlotte Sosebee, Ann Till.(Sowell, Gregory)
January 28, 2022 Filing 66 Initial Disclosures by Forsyth County Board of Voter Registrations and Elections, Barbara Luth, Joel Natt, Carla Radzikinas, Mandi B Smith.(Jaugstetter, Patrick)
January 28, 2022 Filing 65 Initial Disclosures by Margaret Bentley, Betty Bryant, Glenda Henley, Roy McClain, Vera McIntosh.(Broder, Karl)
January 28, 2022 Filing 64 Initial Disclosures by George Awuku, Stephen W. Day, Gwinnett County Board of Registrations and Elections, Alice O'Lenick, Wandy Taylor.(Wilson, Melanie)
January 28, 2022 Filing 63 Initial Disclosures by George Awuku, Stephen W. Day, Gwinnett County Board of Registrations and Elections, Alice O'Lenick, Wandy Taylor.(Wilson, Melanie)
January 28, 2022 Filing 62 Initial Disclosures by George Awuku, Stephen W. Day, Gwinnett County Board of Registrations and Elections, Alice O'Lenick, Wandy Taylor.(Wilson, Melanie)
January 28, 2022 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah Ann Ausburn on behalf of Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice Johnston, Brian Kemp, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger (Ausburn, Deborah)
January 28, 2022 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel H Weigel on behalf of Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice Johnston, Brian Kemp, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger (Weigel, Daniel)
January 28, 2022 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Diane Festin LaRoss on behalf of Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice Johnston, Brian Kemp, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger (LaRoss, Diane)
January 27, 2022 RETURN of #58 APPLICATION for Admission of Laura Murchie Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number GANDC-11542909). to attorney for correction re: refund. (cdg)
January 27, 2022 NOTICE OF VIDEO PROCEEDING : Status Conference to discuss issues raised in the parties' Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan set for 1/31/2022 at 10:30 AM in before Judge J. P. Boulee. Connection Instructions for the public: https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1611986916 Passcode:716927 You must follow the instructions of the Court for remote proceedings available #here. The procedure for filing documentary exhibits admitted during the proceeding is available #here. Photographing, recording, or broadcasting of any judicial proceedings, including proceedings held by video teleconferencing or telephone conferencing, is strictly and absolutely prohibited. Attorneys have been emailed separately. If you have not received an email from the Court AND will have a speaking role in this proceeding, please contact the Court.(bnw) Modified on 1/27/2022 to edit text (bnw).
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER : Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(d), a public officer's successor is automatically substituted as a party after an officer who is a party in an official capacity ceases to hold office while the action is pending. Accordingly, the Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate existing public officer parties and add the new officers as set forth on pages 25-28 of the parties' #50 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. No action by the Clerk is necessary if substitution has already occurred for a specific party. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 1/27/22. (bnw)
January 26, 2022 Filing 58 APPLICATION for Admission of Laura Murchie Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number GANDC-11542909). with Brief In Support by Nora Aquino, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Anjali Enjeti-Sydow, Steven J Paik, Deepum Patel, Thao Tran, Thuy Hang Tran, Nora Aquino, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Anjali Enjeti-Sydow, Steven J Paik, Deepum Patel, Thao Tran, Thuy Hang Tran. Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01333-JPB(Yoon, Meredyth) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 26, 2022 RETURN of #31 APPLICATION for Admission of Kimberly Leung Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number GANDC-11533751). to attorney for correction re: for refund. (cdg)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Court grants the #10 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 1/25/22. The Urban League of Greater Atlanta, Inc. is dismissed with prejudice. Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01259-JPB(bnw)
January 21, 2022 Filing 57 ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT of The New Georgia Project, et al. by Gregory W. Edwards, Anh Le(in her official capacity as a member of the Georgia State Election Board), Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Matthew Mashburn(in his official capacity as a member of the Georgia State Election Board), Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, Rebecca Sullivan (in her official capacity as the Vice Chair of the Georgia State Election Board), David Worley.(Schaerr, Gene) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 1/31/2022 to correct docket text(adg).
January 21, 2022 Filing 56 ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT of the Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, et al. by Sara Tindall Ghazal, Anh Le(in her official capacity as a member of the Georgia State Election Board), Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Matthew Mashburn(in his official capacity as a member of the Georgia State Election Board), Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, Rebecca Sullivan (in her official capacity as the Vice Chair of the Georgia State Election Board).(Schaerr, Gene) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 1/31/2022 to correct docket text (adg).
January 21, 2022 Filing 55 ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT of Concerned Black Clergy, et al. by Anh Le(in her official capacity as a member of the Georgia State Election Board), Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Matthew Mashburn(in his official capacity as a member of the Georgia State Election Board), Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, Rebecca Sullivan (in her official capacity as the Vice Chair of the Georgia State Election Board), David Worley.(Schaerr, Gene) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 1/31/2022 to correct docket text(adg).
January 21, 2022 Filing 54 ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT of Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, et al. by Georgia State Election Board, Sara Tindall Ghazal, Brian Kemp, Anh Le(in her official capacity as a member of the Georgia State Election Board), Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Matthew Mashburn(in his official capacity as a member of the Georgia State Election Board), Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, Rebecca Sullivan (in her official capacity as the Vice Chair of the Georgia State Election Board), The Georgia State Election Board.(Schaerr, Gene) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 1/31/2022 to correct docket text (adg).
January 21, 2022 Filing 53 ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT of Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, et al. by Sara Tindall Ghazal, Anh Le(in her official capacity as a member of the Georgia State Election Board), Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Matthew Mashburn(in his official capacity as a member of the Georgia State Election Board), Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, Rebecca Sullivan (in her official capacity as the Vice Chair of the Georgia State Election Board).(Schaerr, Gene) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 1/31/2022 to correct docket text (adg).
January 21, 2022 Filing 52 ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by United States by Georgia State Election Board, Brad Raffensperger, The State of Georgia.(Schaerr, Gene) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 1/31/2022 to correct docket text (adg).
January 21, 2022 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredyth Yoon on behalf of Nora Aquino, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Anjali Enjeti-Sydow, Steven J Paik, Thao Tran, Thuy Hang Tran, Deepum Patel Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01333-JPB(Yoon, Meredyth)
January 21, 2022 Filing 50 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by The United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Chart of claims and challenged provisions by case)Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB et al.(O'Connor, Maura Eileen)
January 21, 2022 Filing 49 ANSWER to MENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Bibb County Board of Elections, Bibb County Board of Registrars, Henry Ficklin, Mike Kaplan, Cassandra Powell, Veronica Seals, Herbert Spangler, Jeanetta R. Watson, Rinda Wilson.Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01284-JPB(Noland, William) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 1/31/2022 to correct docket text (adg).
January 21, 2022 Filing 48 ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT by Fulton County Registration and Elections Board.Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01259-JPB(Lowman, David) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 1/31/2022 to correct docket text (adg).
January 21, 2022 Filing 47 ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT by Fulton County Registration and Elections Board.Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01284-JPB(Lowman, David) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 1/31/2022 to correct docket text (adg).
January 21, 2022 Filing 46 ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT COMPLAINT for Declaratory Injunctive Relief by Fulton County Registration and Elections Board.Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01229-JPB(Lowman, David) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 1/31/2022 to correct docket text (adg).
January 21, 2022 Filing 45 Forsyth County Defendant's ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT by Matthew Blender, Forsyth County Board of Voter Registrations and Elections, Randy Ingram, Barbara Luth, Joel Natt, Carla Radzikinas, Mandi B Smith.Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01333-JPB(Jaugstetter, Patrick) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 1/31/2022to correct docket text (adg).
January 21, 2022 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick D. Jaugstetter on behalf of Matthew Blender, Forsyth County Board of Voter Registrations and Elections, Randy Ingram, Barbara Luth, Joel Natt, Carla Radzikinas, Mandi B Smith (Jaugstetter, Patrick)
January 21, 2022 Filing 43 ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory Injunctive Relief by Fulton County Registration and Elections Board.Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01333-JPB(Lowman, David) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 1/31/2022 to correct docket text(adg).
January 21, 2022 Filing 42 ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT by Fulton County Registration and Elections Board. Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01284-JPB(Lowman, David) Modified on 1/31/2022 to correct docket text (adg).
January 21, 2022 Filing 41 ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Wanda Andrews, Chatham County Board of Elections, Chatham County Board of Registrars, Marianne Heimes, Malinda Hodge, Antan Lang, Thomas J. Mahoney, Colin Mcrae, William L. Norse, Jon Pannell, Randolph Slay.Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01284-JPB(Sabzevari, Arash) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 1/31/2022 to correct docket text (adg).
January 21, 2022 Filing 40 ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT by Columbia County Board of Elections, Columbia County Board of Registrars, Ann Cushman, Wanda Duffie, Nancy L. Gay, Larry Wiggins.Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01284-JPB(Cathey, Thomas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 1/31/2022 to correct docket text (adg).
January 21, 2022 Filing 39 ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Clayton County Board of Elections and Registration, Shauna Dozier, Diane Givens, Dorothy F. Hall, Darlene Johnson, Patricia Pullar, Carol Wesley.Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01333-JPB(Sabzevari, Arash) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 1/31/2022 to correct docket text (adg).
January 21, 2022 Filing 38 ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Clayton County Board of Elections and Registration, Shauna Dozier, Diane Givens, Dorothy F. Hall, Darlene Johnson, Patricia Pullar, Carol Wesley.Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01284-JPB(Sabzevari, Arash) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 1/31/2022 to correct docket text (adg).
January 21, 2022 Filing 37 ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT by Ken Cochran, Hall County Board of Elections and Registration, David Kennedy, Craig Lutz, Gala Sheats, Tom Smiley, Lori Wurtz.Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01284-JPB(Bloodworth, Kristin) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 1/31/2022 to correct docket text (adg).
January 21, 2022 Filing 36 Brooks County Defendants' ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by The New Georgia Project, et al. by Charles Dave, Zurich Deshazior, Don DiStefano, Karen Murray.Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01229-JPB(White, Daniel) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 1/21/2022 to change docket text to Brooks County Defendants' (bgt). Modified on 1/31/2022 to correct docket text (adg).
January 21, 2022 Filing 35 Cobb County Defendants' ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, et al. by Jessica M. Brooks, Steven Bruning, Cobb County Board of Elections and Registration, Janine Eveler, Pat Gartland, Jennifer Mosbacher, Tori Silas.Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01333-JPB(White, Daniel) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 1/30/2022 to correct docket text(adg).
January 21, 2022 Filing 34 Cobb County Defendants' ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Sixth District Methodist Episcopal Church, et al. by Jessica M. Brooks, Steven Bruning, Cobb County Board of Elections and Registration, Janine Eveler, Pat Gartland, Jennifer Mosbacher, Tori Silas.Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01284-JPB(White, Daniel) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 1/30/2022 to correct docket text(adg).
January 21, 2022 Filing 33 Cobb County Defendants' ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, et al. by Jessica M. Brooks, Steven Bruning, Cobb County Board of Elections and Registration, Janine Eveler, Pat Gartland, Jennifer Mosbacher, Tori Silas.Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01259-JPB(White, Daniel) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 1/30/2022 to correct docket text (adg).
January 21, 2022 Filing 32 Gwinnett Defendants' ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief by Gwinnett County Board of Registrations and Elections.Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01259-JPB(Wilson, Melanie) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 1/30/2022 correct docket text (adg).
January 21, 2022 Filing 31 APPLICATION for Admission of Kimberly Leung Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number GANDC-11533751). with Brief In Support by Nora Aquino, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Anjali Enjeti-Sydow, Steven J Paik, Deepum Patel, Thao Tran, Thuy Hang Tran, Nora Aquino, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Anjali Enjeti-Sydow, Steven J Paik, Deepum Patel, Thao Tran, Thuy Hang Tran. Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01333-JPB(Yoon, Meredyth) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 21, 2022 Filing 30 Richmond Defendants ANSWER to COMPLAINT by Lynn Bailey, Sherry T. Barnes, Marcia Brown, Terence Dicks, Bob Finnegan, Tim McFalls, Richmond County Board of Elections.Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01284-JPB(Mack, Rachel) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
January 21, 2022 Filing 29 ANSWER to COMPLAINT by Margaret Bentley, Betty Bryant, Glenda Henley, Roy McClain, Vera McIntosh.Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01229-JPB(Broder, Karl) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
January 21, 2022 Filing 28 Gwinnett Defendants' ANSWER to COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief by Gwinnett County Board of Registrations and Elections.Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01333-JPB(Wilson, Melanie) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
January 21, 2022 Filing 27 ANSWER to COMPLAINT by DeKalb County Board of Registrations and Elections.Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB et al.(Vander Els, Irene) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
January 21, 2022 Filing 26 ANSWER to COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Keith Gammage.Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01229-JPB(Denmark, Emilie) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
January 21, 2022 Filing 25 ANSWER to COMPLAINT by DeKalb County Board of Registrations and Elections.Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB et al.(Vander Els, Irene) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
January 21, 2022 Filing 24 ANSWER to COMPLAINT by Clarke County Board of Election and Voter Registration, Willa Jean Fambrough, Hunaid Qadir, Rocky Raffle, Adam Shirley, Charlotte Sosebee, Ann Till.Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01284-JPB(Sowell, Gregory) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
January 21, 2022 Filing 23 Gwinnett Defendants' ANSWER to COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief by Gwinnett County Board of Registrations and Elections.Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01259-JPB, 1:21-cv-01284-JPB, 1:21-cv-01333-JPB(Wilson, Melanie) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
January 20, 2022 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re (97 in 1:21-cv-01229-JPB, 97 in 1:21-cv-01229-JPB) MOTION for Reconsideration re (86 in 1:21-cv-01229-JPB, 86 in 1:21-cv-01229-JPB, 86 in 1:21-cv-01229-JPB, 86 in 1:21-cv-01229-JPB, 86 in 1:21-cv-01229-JPB, 86 in 1:21-cv-01229-JPB, 86 in 1:21-cv-01229-JPB) Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, Order on Moti MOTION for Certificate of Appealability filed by Black Voters Matter Fund, Jauan Durbin, Fannie Marie Jackson Gibbs, Rise, Inc., Elbert Solomon, The New Georgia Project. Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01229-JPB(Nkwonta, Uzoma)
January 20, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Sejal Jhaveri on behalf of The United States of America Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-02575-JPB(Jhaveri, Sejal)
January 20, 2022 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Persons by Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (Carver, William)
January 20, 2022 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION for Reconsideration re (69 in 1:21-cv-02575-JPB, 69 in 1:21-cv-02575-JPB, 69 in 1:21-cv-02575-JPB) Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment MOTION for Certificate of Appealability filed by The United States of America. (Evans, Rachel)
January 20, 2022 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re (12 in 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 12 in 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 74 in 1:21-cv-01259-JPB, 74 in 1:21-cv-01259-JPB, 119 in 1:21-cv-01284-JPB, 119 in 1:21-cv-01284-JPB) MOTION for Reconsideration re (86 in 1:21-cv-01229-JPB, 86 in 1:21-cv-01229-JPB, 86 in 1:21-cv-01229-JPB, 86 in 1:21-cv-01229-JPB, 86 in 1:21-cv-01229-JPB, 86 in 1:21-cv-01229-JPB, 86 in 1:21-cv-01229-JPB) Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, Order on Moti MOTION for Certificate of Appealability filed by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Adapt, Georgia Advocacy Office, Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Southern Christian Leadership Conference, The Arc of the United States, Women Watch Afrika, Common Cause, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc., Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe, The Urban League of Greater Atlanta, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01259-JPB, 1:21-cv-01284-JPB(Faransso, Tania)
January 18, 2022 Filing 17 Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Steven E. Rosenberg replacing attorney William K. Scott. Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01229-JPB(Rosenberg, Steven)
January 18, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #13 APPLICATION for Admission of Annika M Boone Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11511047).. Attorney Annika M. Boone added appearing on behalf of Sara Ghazal, Brian Kemp, Anh Le, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, Rebecca Sullivan, The Georgia State Election Board, The State of Georgia, David Worley (nmb)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 1/18/22. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnw)
January 14, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Maura Eileen O'Connor on behalf of The United States of America Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-02575-JPB(O'Connor, Maura Eileen) Modified on 1/21/2022 to correct filer (adg).
January 12, 2022 Filing 15 Consent MOTION to Substitute Defendant Anthony Rodriguez by Nora Aquino, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Anjali Enjeti-Sydow, Steven Paik, Deepum Patel, Thao Tran, Thuy Tran. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01333-JPB(Lauridsen, R.) Modified on 1/13/2022 to edit text (jra).
January 12, 2022 Filing 14 REQUEST for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): January 12, 2022 to February 11, 2022, by Nancy Gbana Abudu. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01284-JPB(Abudu, Nancy) Modified on 1/20/2022 (adg).
January 11, 2022 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Admission of Annika M Boone Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11511047).by Sara Ghazal, Brian Kemp, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, The Georgia State Election Board, The State of Georgia, David Worley. (Tyson, Bryan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 10, 2022 Submission of (10 in 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 73 in 1:21-cv-01259-JPB) Stipulation of Dismissal of Plaintiff The Urban League of Greater Atlanta, Inc., to District Judge J. P. Boulee. Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01259-JPB(adg)
January 7, 2022 RETURN of #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Adam Tuetken Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11499232). to attorney for correction re: Refund. (cdg)
January 6, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Reconsideration re (86 in 1:21-cv-01229-JPB, 86 in 1:21-cv-01229-JPB, 86 in 1:21-cv-01229-JPB, 86 in 1:21-cv-01229-JPB, 86 in 1:21-cv-01229-JPB, 86 in 1:21-cv-01229-JPB, 86 in 1:21-cv-01229-JPB) Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, (64 in 1:21-cv-01259-JPB, 64 in 1:21-cv-01259-JPB, 64 in 1:21-cv-01259-JPB) Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, (110 in 1:21-cv-01284-JPB, 110 in 1:21-cv-01284-JPB, 110 in 1:21-cv-01284-JPB) Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , or in the alternative, MOTION for Certificate of Appealability with Brief In Support by Georgia State Election Board, Georgia State Elections Board, Brian Kemp, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, David Worley, Georgia State Election Board, Sara Tindall Ghazal, Brian Kemp, Anh Le, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, Rebecca Sullivan, The Georgia State Election Board, David Worley, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, David Worley, Sara Tindall Ghazal, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A: NGP Order (Doc 86), #3 Exhibit B: NAACP Order (Doc 64), #4 Exhibit C: AME Order (Doc 110), #5 Exhibit D: Fair Fight Action Inc v. Raffensperger)Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01229-JPB, 1:21-cv-01259-JPB, 1:21-cv-01284-JPB(Schaerr, Gene) Text Modified on 1/10/2022 (adg).
January 6, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Reconsideration re (69 in 1:21-cv-02575-JPB, 69 in 1:21-cv-02575-JPB, 69 in 1:21-cv-02575-JPB) Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment , or in the alternative, MOTION for Certificate of Appealability with Brief In Support by Brad Raffensperger, The Georgia State Election Board, The State of Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-02575-JPB(Schaerr, Gene) Text Modified on 1/10/2022 (adg).
January 6, 2022 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation and Consent Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Plaintiff The Urban League of Greater Atlanta, Inc. with Prejudice by Common Cause, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc., Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe, The Urban League of Greater Atlanta, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order and Consent Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Plaintiff The Urban League of Greater Atlanta, Inc.)Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01259-JPB(Houk, Julie)
January 6, 2022 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Adam Tuetken Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11499232).by District of Columbia. (Pate, Page) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 6, 2022 RETURN of #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Steven C. Begakis Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11495832). to attorney for correction re: Refund. (cdg)
January 6, 2022 RETURN of #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Cameron T. Norris Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11495841). to attorney for correction re: Refund (cdg)
January 6, 2022 RETURN of #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Tyler R. Green Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11495755). to attorney for correction re: Refund. (cdg)
January 5, 2022 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Cameron T. Norris Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11495841).by Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (Carver, William) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 5, 2022 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Steven C. Begakis Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11495832).by Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (Carver, William) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 5, 2022 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Tyler R. Green Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11495755).by Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (Carver, William) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 4, 2022 Filing 5 RESPONSE re (2 in 1:21-mi-55555-JPB) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Partial Consent Motion filed by Exousia Lighthouse International C.M., Inc., Faith in Action Network, First Congregational Church, United Church of Christ Incorporated, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Inc., Greater Works Ministries Network, Inc., Metropolitan Atlanta Baptist Ministers Union, Inc., Mijente, Inc., New Birth Missionary Baptist Church, Inc., Samuel Dewitt Proctor Conference, Inc., Sankofa United Church of Christ Limited, The Concerned Black Clergy of Metropolitan Atlanta, Inc., The Justice Initiative, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01728-JPB(Kastorf, Kurt)
January 4, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE Of Filing Receipt of Additional Consents by Gregory W. Edwards, Georgia State Election Board, Sara Tindall Ghazal, Brian Kemp, Anh Le(in her official capacity as a member of the Georgia State Election Board), Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Matthew Mashburn(in his official capacity as a member of the Georgia State Election Board), Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, Rebecca Sullivan (in her official capacity as the Vice Chair of the Georgia State Election Board), The Georgia State Election Board, The State of Georgia re Order, #2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Partial Consent Motion (Tyson, Bryan)
January 4, 2022 Filing 3 RESPONSE re (2 in 1:21-mi-55555-JPB) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Partial Consent Motion filed by Common Cause, Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc., Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe, The Urban League of Greater Atlanta, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01259-JPB(Sells, Bryan)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER: Defendants' #2 Motion to Extend is GRANTED. The deadline to file an answer is extended to January 21, 2022. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 1/4/22. (bnw)
January 3, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Partial Consent Motion by Georgia State Election Board, Sara Tindall Ghazal, Brian Kemp, Anh Le, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, Rebecca Sullivan, The Georgia State Election Board, The State of Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tyson, Bryan)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER: Plaintiffs in Case Nos. 1:21-cv-01259 and 1:21-cv-01728 are DIRECTED to respond to Defendants' #2 Motion to Extend by noon on January 4, 2022. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 1/3/22. Associated Cases: 1:21-mi-55555-JPB, 1:21-cv-01259-JPB, 1:21-cv-01728-JPB(bnw)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER. Applying the reasoning of Young and Hendrix, and in light of the consent of the parties, the Court finds that it is appropriate to consolidate the Consenting Cases (1:21-cv-01229; 1:21-cv-01259; 1:21-cv-01284; 1:21-cv-01333; 1:21-cv-01728; and 1:21-cv-02575) at least for discovery purposes. Going forward, the parties in the Consenting Cases are hereby DIRECTED to file all documents (whether or not related to discovery) in Master Docket File No. 1:21-MI-55555-JPB ("In re Georgia Senate Bill 202"), which was created to facilitate consolidation of these matters. The Clerk is DIRECTED to add the instant order as well as all counsel of record in the Related Actions to the Master Docket File. The individual Consenting Cases shall be ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED for docket management purposes. Administrative closure will not prejudice the rights of the parties in the Consenting Cases in any manner, and the parties may request to reopen an individual case at any time if necessary. The Court declines to consolidate the Objecting Cases into the Master File Docket for reasons including the possible prejudice to the plaintiffs in those matters of burdensome discovery unrelated to their claims. As such, these matters will remain on their individual dockets. The parties in the Objecting Cases are not required to participate in discovery with the Consenting Cases, but they may elect and are strongly encouraged to coordinate with those cases on specific issues, such as document requests, a central document repository, deposition scheduling, etc. The Court will, however, endeavor to keep the Related Actions on the same general timeline where possible. To that end, the following directions apply to all Related Actions: Any defendant who has not yet answered the complaint must do so by January 7, 2022. The parties (Consenting and Objecting Cases) must meet collectively pursuant to Rule 26(f) by January 14, 2022. Rule 26(f) reports must be filed by January 21, 2022. The Objecting Cases may join the Rule 26(f) report of the Consenting Cases or file separate reports highlighting where they differ from the Consenting Cases. The Court DENIES as moot and without prejudice to being re-filed any pending motion relating to discovery. All discovery is stayed pending the Courts entry of an order pursuant to Rule 26(f). Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 12/23/2021. (bgt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE GEORGIA SENATE BILL 202
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The New Georgia Project
Represented By: Marcos Mocine-McQueen
Represented By: Adam Martin Sparks
Represented By: Halsey G. Knapp, Jr
Represented By: Jacob D Shelly
Represented By: Joyce Gist Lewis
Represented By: Jyoti Jasrasaria
Represented By: Spencer McCandless
Represented By: Tina Yazhou Meng
Represented By: Uzoma Nkwonta
Represented By: Tina Yazhuo Meng
Represented By: Spencer W. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Black Voters Matter Fund
Represented By: Marcos Mocine-McQueen
Represented By: Adam Martin Sparks
Represented By: Halsey G. Knapp, Jr
Represented By: Jacob D Shelly
Represented By: Joyce Gist Lewis
Represented By: Jyoti Jasrasaria
Represented By: Spencer McCandless
Represented By: Tina Yazhou Meng
Represented By: Uzoma Nkwonta
Represented By: Tina Yazhuo Meng
Represented By: Catherine Harding McCord
Represented By: Spencer W. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rise, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Martin Sparks
Represented By: Halsey G. Knapp, Jr
Represented By: Jacob D Shelly
Represented By: Joyce Gist Lewis
Represented By: Jyoti Jasrasaria
Represented By: Uzoma Nkwonta
Represented By: Spencer W. Klein
Represented By: Spencer McCandless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fannie Marie Jackson Gibbs
Represented By: Adam Martin Sparks
Represented By: Uzoma Nkwonta
Represented By: Catherine Harding McCord
Represented By: Spencer W. Klein
Represented By: Spencer McCandless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jauan Durbin
Represented By: Adam Martin Sparks
Represented By: Uzoma Nkwonta
Represented By: Catherine Harding McCord
Represented By: Spencer W. Klein
Represented By: Spencer McCandless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elbert Solomon
Represented By: Adam Martin Sparks
Represented By: Uzoma Nkwonta
Represented By: Spencer W. Klein
Represented By: Spencer McCandless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia State Conference of the NAACP
Represented By: Bryan Ludington Sells
Represented By: Ezra David Rosenberg
Represented By: Gerald R. Weber
Represented By: Gregory Farrell
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum
Represented By: Julie Marie Houk
Represented By: Neil J. Oxford
Represented By: Vilia Hayes
Represented By: Armen Nercess Nercessian
Represented By: Catherine Harding McCord
Represented By: Ethan Michael Thomas
Represented By: Jennifer Nwachukwu
Represented By: Joseph S. Belichick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Ludington Sells
Represented By: Ezra David Rosenberg
Represented By: Gerald R. Weber
Represented By: Gregory Farrell
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum
Represented By: Julie Marie Houk
Represented By: Neil J. Oxford
Represented By: Vilia Hayes
Represented By: Armen Nercess Nercessian
Represented By: Catherine Harding McCord
Represented By: Ethan Michael Thomas
Represented By: Jennifer Nwachukwu
Represented By: Joseph S. Belichick
Represented By: Molly Melcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Ludington Sells
Represented By: Ezra David Rosenberg
Represented By: Gerald R. Weber
Represented By: Gregory Farrell
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum
Represented By: Julie Marie Houk
Represented By: Neil J. Oxford
Represented By: Vilia Hayes
Represented By: Armen Nercess Nercessian
Represented By: Catherine Harding McCord
Represented By: Ethan Michael Thomas
Represented By: Jennifer Nwachukwu
Represented By: Joseph S. Belichick
Represented By: Molly Melcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Ludington Sells
Represented By: Ezra David Rosenberg
Represented By: Gerald R. Weber
Represented By: Gregory Farrell
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum
Represented By: Julie Marie Houk
Represented By: Neil J. Oxford
Represented By: Vilia Hayes
Represented By: Armen Nercess Nercessian
Represented By: Catherine Harding McCord
Represented By: Ethan Michael Thomas
Represented By: Jennifer Nwachukwu
Represented By: Joseph S. Belichick
Represented By: Molly Melcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Common Cause
Represented By: Bryan Ludington Sells
Represented By: Ezra David Rosenberg
Represented By: Gerald R. Weber
Represented By: Gregory Farrell
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum
Represented By: Julie Marie Houk
Represented By: Neil J. Oxford
Represented By: Vilia Hayes
Represented By: Armen Nercess Nercessian
Represented By: Catherine Harding McCord
Represented By: Ethan Michael Thomas
Represented By: Jennifer Nwachukwu
Represented By: Joseph S. Belichick
Represented By: Molly Melcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe
Represented By: Bryan Ludington Sells
Represented By: Ezra David Rosenberg
Represented By: Gerald R. Weber
Represented By: Gregory Farrell
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum
Represented By: Julie Marie Houk
Represented By: Neil J. Oxford
Represented By: Vilia Hayes
Represented By: Armen Nercess Nercessian
Represented By: Catherine Harding McCord
Represented By: Ethan Michael Thomas
Represented By: Jennifer Nwachukwu
Represented By: Joseph S. Belichick
Represented By: Molly Melcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Urban League of Greater Atlanta, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Ludington Sells
Represented By: Gerald R. Weber
Represented By: Catherine Harding McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church
Represented By: Brian Lawrence Dimmick
Represented By: Dale E. Ho
Represented By: Davin M. Rosborough
Represented By: Debo P. Adegbile
Represented By: George P. Varghese
Represented By: Ilya Feldsherov
Represented By: John Spencer Cusick
Represented By: Jonathan S. Topaz
Represented By: Leah C. Aden
Represented By: Nana Wilberforce
Represented By: Rahul Garabadu
Represented By: Sean Young
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Represented By: Stephanie Lin
Represented By: Susan Mizner
Represented By: Tania Christine Faransso
Represented By: Catherine Harding McCord
Represented By: Dayton Campbell-Harris
Represented By: Jonathan Topaz
Represented By: Bradley Erik Heard
Represented By: Caitlin Felt May
Represented By: Sean Jengwei Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia Muslim Voter Project
Represented By: Adam Sieff
Represented By: Courtney Turco DeThomas
Represented By: David Morris Gossett
Represented By: Grace Katherine Thompson
Represented By: Kate Kennedy
Represented By: Matthew R. Jedreski
Represented By: Nancy Gbana Abudu
Represented By: Pichaya Poy Winichakul
Represented By: Rahul Garabadu
Represented By: Brittni Abra Hamilton
Represented By: Catherine Harding McCord
Represented By: Sabrina S. Khan
Represented By: Bradley Erik Heard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Women Watch Afrika
Represented By: Adam Sieff
Represented By: Courtney Turco DeThomas
Represented By: David Morris Gossett
Represented By: Grace Katherine Thompson
Represented By: Kate Kennedy
Represented By: Matthew R. Jedreski
Represented By: Nancy Gbana Abudu
Represented By: Pichaya Poy Winichakul
Represented By: Rahul Garabadu
Represented By: Brittni Abra Hamilton
Represented By: Catherine Harding McCord
Represented By: Sabrina S. Khan
Represented By: Bradley Erik Heard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latino Community Fund of Georgia
Represented By: Adam Sieff
Represented By: Courtney Turco DeThomas
Represented By: David Morris Gossett
Represented By: Grace Katherine Thompson
Represented By: Kate Kennedy
Represented By: Matthew R. Jedreski
Represented By: Nancy Gbana Abudu
Represented By: Pichaya Poy Winichakul
Represented By: Rahul Garabadu
Represented By: Catherine Harding McCord
Represented By: Sabrina S. Khan
Represented By: Bradley Erik Heard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Lawrence Dimmick
Represented By: Dale E. Ho
Represented By: Davin M. Rosborough
Represented By: Debo P. Adegbile
Represented By: George P. Varghese
Represented By: Ilya Feldsherov
Represented By: John Spencer Cusick
Represented By: Jonathan S. Topaz
Represented By: Leah C. Aden
Represented By: Nana Wilberforce
Represented By: Nancy Gbana Abudu
Represented By: Rahul Garabadu
Represented By: Sean Young
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Represented By: Stephanie Lin
Represented By: Susan Mizner
Represented By: Tania Christine Faransso
Represented By: Catherine Harding McCord
Represented By: Dayton Campbell-Harris
Represented By: Jonathan Topaz
Represented By: Bradley Erik Heard
Represented By: Caitlin Felt May
Represented By: Cory Isaacson
Represented By: Sean Jengwei Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Arc of the United States
Represented By: Pichaya Poy Winichakul
Represented By: Catherine Harding McCord
Represented By: Sabrina S. Khan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia Adapt
Represented By: Davin M. Rosborough
Represented By: Jonathan S. Topaz
Represented By: Rahul Garabadu
Represented By: Catherine Harding McCord
Represented By: Dayton Campbell-Harris
Represented By: Jonathan Topaz
Represented By: Caitlin Felt May
Represented By: Cory Isaacson
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Represented By: Tania Christine Faransso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Christian Leadership Conference
Represented By: Davin M. Rosborough
Represented By: Jonathan S. Topaz
Represented By: Rahul Garabadu
Represented By: Catherine Harding McCord
Represented By: Dayton Campbell-Harris
Represented By: Jonathan Topaz
Represented By: Caitlin Felt May
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Represented By: Tania Christine Faransso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia Advocacy Office
Represented By: Davin M. Rosborough
Represented By: Jonathan S. Topaz
Represented By: Rahul Garabadu
Represented By: Catherine Harding McCord
Represented By: Dayton Campbell-Harris
Represented By: Jonathan Topaz
Represented By: Caitlin Felt May
Represented By: Cory Isaacson
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Represented By: Tania Christine Faransso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Exousia Lighthouse International C.M., Inc.
Represented By: Britton Dale Davis
Represented By: Chahira Solh
Represented By: Clifford Zatz
Represented By: Esperanza Segarra
Represented By: Gilda Rae Williams
Represented By: Jess Unger
Represented By: Jorge Luis Vasquez
Represented By: Judith Browne Dianis
Represented By: Kurt G. Kastorf
Represented By: Nkechi Kanu
Represented By: Sabrina S. Khan
Represented By: Warrington S. Parker, III
Represented By: William Tucker
Represented By: Catherine Harding McCord
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Joseph Wardenski
Represented By: Justin Kingsolver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faith in Action Network
Represented By: Britton Dale Davis
Represented By: Chahira Solh
Represented By: Clifford Zatz
Represented By: Esperanza Segarra
Represented By: Gilda Rae Williams
Represented By: Jess Unger
Represented By: Jorge Luis Vasquez
Represented By: Judith Browne Dianis
Represented By: Kurt G. Kastorf
Represented By: Nkechi Kanu
Represented By: Sabrina S. Khan
Represented By: Warrington S. Parker, III
Represented By: William Tucker
Represented By: Catherine Harding McCord
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Joseph Wardenski
Represented By: Justin Kingsolver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Congregational Church, United Church of Christ Incorporated
Represented By: Britton Dale Davis
Represented By: Chahira Solh
Represented By: Clifford Zatz
Represented By: Esperanza Segarra
Represented By: Gilda Rae Williams
Represented By: Jess Unger
Represented By: Jorge Luis Vasquez
Represented By: Judith Browne Dianis
Represented By: Kurt G. Kastorf
Represented By: Nkechi Kanu
Represented By: Sabrina S. Khan
Represented By: Warrington S. Parker, III
Represented By: William Tucker
Represented By: Catherine Harding McCord
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Justin Kingsolver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta
Represented By: Candice Mai Khanh Nguyen
Represented By: Connie P. Sung
Represented By: Eileen Jean Ma
Represented By: Leo L. Lam
Represented By: Luis G. Hoyos
Represented By: Niyati Shah
Represented By: Phi Nguyen
Represented By: R. Adam Lauridsen
Represented By: Rylee Kercher Olm
Represented By: Terry Ao Minnis
Represented By: Meredyth Yoon
Represented By: Catherine Harding McCord
Represented By: Emily A. Hasselberg
Represented By: Kimberly Leung
Represented By: Laura Jean Murchie
Represented By: Zainab Omar Ramahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven J Paik
Represented By: Phi Nguyen
Represented By: Meredyth Yoon
Represented By: Candice Mai Khanh Nguyen
Represented By: Catherine Harding McCord
Represented By: Connie P. Sung
Represented By: Eileen Jean Ma
Represented By: Emily A. Hasselberg
Represented By: Kimberly Leung
Represented By: Laura Jean Murchie
Represented By: Leo L. Lam
Represented By: Luis G. Hoyos
Represented By: Niyati Shah
Represented By: R. Adam Lauridsen
Represented By: Rylee Kercher Olm
Represented By: Terry Ao Minnis
Represented By: Zainab Omar Ramahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thuy Hang Tran
Represented By: Phi Nguyen
Represented By: Meredyth Yoon
Represented By: Candice Mai Khanh Nguyen
Represented By: Catherine Harding McCord
Represented By: Connie P. Sung
Represented By: Eileen Jean Ma
Represented By: Emily A. Hasselberg
Represented By: Kimberly Leung
Represented By: Laura Jean Murchie
Represented By: Leo L. Lam
Represented By: Luis G. Hoyos
Represented By: Niyati Shah
Represented By: R. Adam Lauridsen
Represented By: Rylee Kercher Olm
Represented By: Terry Ao Minnis
Represented By: Zainab Omar Ramahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thao Tran
Represented By: Phi Nguyen
Represented By: Meredyth Yoon
Represented By: Candice Mai Khanh Nguyen
Represented By: Catherine Harding McCord
Represented By: Connie P. Sung
Represented By: Eileen Jean Ma
Represented By: Emily A. Hasselberg
Represented By: Kimberly Leung
Represented By: Laura Jean Murchie
Represented By: Leo L. Lam
Represented By: Luis G. Hoyos
Represented By: Niyati Shah
Represented By: R. Adam Lauridsen
Represented By: Rylee Kercher Olm
Represented By: Terry Ao Minnis
Represented By: Zainab Omar Ramahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deepum Patel
Represented By: Phi Nguyen
Represented By: Meredyth Yoon
Represented By: Candice Mai Khanh Nguyen
Represented By: Catherine Harding McCord
Represented By: Connie P. Sung
Represented By: Eileen Jean Ma
Represented By: Emily A. Hasselberg
Represented By: Kimberly Leung
Represented By: Laura Jean Murchie
Represented By: Leo L. Lam
Represented By: Luis G. Hoyos
Represented By: Niyati Shah
Represented By: R. Adam Lauridsen
Represented By: Rylee Kercher Olm
Represented By: Terry Ao Minnis
Represented By: Zainab Omar Ramahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nora Aquino
Represented By: Phi Nguyen
Represented By: Meredyth Yoon
Represented By: Candice Mai Khanh Nguyen
Represented By: Catherine Harding McCord
Represented By: Connie P. Sung
Represented By: Eileen Jean Ma
Represented By: Emily A. Hasselberg
Represented By: Kimberly Leung
Represented By: Laura Jean Murchie
Represented By: Niyati Shah
Represented By: Leo L. Lam
Represented By: Luis G. Hoyos
Represented By: R. Adam Lauridsen
Represented By: Rylee Kercher Olm
Represented By: Terry Ao Minnis
Represented By: Zainab Omar Ramahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anjali Enjeti-Sydow
Represented By: Phi Nguyen
Represented By: Meredyth Yoon
Represented By: Candice Mai Khanh Nguyen
Represented By: Catherine Harding McCord
Represented By: Connie P. Sung
Represented By: Eileen Jean Ma
Represented By: Emily A. Hasselberg
Represented By: Kimberly Leung
Represented By: Laura Jean Murchie
Represented By: Leo L. Lam
Represented By: Luis G. Hoyos
Represented By: R. Adam Lauridsen
Represented By: Niyati Shah
Represented By: Rylee Kercher Olm
Represented By: Zainab Omar Ramahi
Represented By: Terry Ao Minnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Inc.
Represented By: Britton Dale Davis
Represented By: Chahira Solh
Represented By: Clifford Zatz
Represented By: Esperanza Segarra
Represented By: Gilda Rae Williams
Represented By: Jess Unger
Represented By: Jorge Luis Vasquez
Represented By: Judith Browne Dianis
Represented By: Kurt G. Kastorf
Represented By: Nkechi Kanu
Represented By: Sabrina S. Khan
Represented By: Warrington S. Parker, III
Represented By: William Tucker
Represented By: Catherine Harding McCord
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Joseph Wardenski
Represented By: Justin Kingsolver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greater Works Ministries Network, Inc.
Represented By: Britton Dale Davis
Represented By: Chahira Solh
Represented By: Clifford Zatz
Represented By: Esperanza Segarra
Represented By: Gilda Rae Williams
Represented By: Jess Unger
Represented By: Jorge Luis Vasquez
Represented By: Judith Browne Dianis
Represented By: Kurt G. Kastorf
Represented By: Nkechi Kanu
Represented By: Sabrina S. Khan
Represented By: Warrington S. Parker, III
Represented By: William Tucker
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Joseph Wardenski
Represented By: Justin Kingsolver
Represented By: Catherine Harding McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Atlanta Baptist Ministers Union, Inc.
Represented By: Britton Dale Davis
Represented By: Chahira Solh
Represented By: Clifford Zatz
Represented By: Esperanza Segarra
Represented By: Gilda Rae Williams
Represented By: Jess Unger
Represented By: Jorge Luis Vasquez
Represented By: Judith Browne Dianis
Represented By: Kurt G. Kastorf
Represented By: Nkechi Kanu
Represented By: Warrington S. Parker, III
Represented By: William Tucker
Represented By: Catherine Harding McCord
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Joseph Wardenski
Represented By: Justin Kingsolver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mijente, Inc.
Represented By: Britton Dale Davis
Represented By: Chahira Solh
Represented By: Clifford Zatz
Represented By: Esperanza Segarra
Represented By: Gilda Rae Williams
Represented By: Jess Unger
Represented By: Jorge Luis Vasquez
Represented By: Judith Browne Dianis
Represented By: Kurt G. Kastorf
Represented By: Nkechi Kanu
Represented By: Sabrina S. Khan
Represented By: Warrington S. Parker, III
Represented By: William Tucker
Represented By: Catherine Harding McCord
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Joseph Wardenski
Represented By: Justin Kingsolver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Dewitt Proctor Conference, Inc.
Represented By: Britton Dale Davis
Represented By: Chahira Solh
Represented By: Clifford Zatz
Represented By: Esperanza Segarra
Represented By: Gilda Rae Williams
Represented By: Jess Unger
Represented By: Jorge Luis Vasquez
Represented By: Judith Browne Dianis
Represented By: Kurt G. Kastorf
Represented By: Nkechi Kanu
Represented By: Sabrina S. Khan
Represented By: Warrington S. Parker, III
Represented By: William Tucker
Represented By: Catherine Harding McCord
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Joseph Wardenski
Represented By: Justin Kingsolver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sankofa United Church of Christ Limited
Represented By: Britton Dale Davis
Represented By: Chahira Solh
Represented By: Clifford Zatz
Represented By: Esperanza Segarra
Represented By: Gilda Rae Williams
Represented By: Jess Unger
Represented By: Jorge Luis Vasquez
Represented By: Judith Browne Dianis
Represented By: Kurt G. Kastorf
Represented By: Nkechi Kanu
Represented By: Sabrina S. Khan
Represented By: Warrington S. Parker, III
Represented By: William Tucker
Represented By: Catherine Harding McCord
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Joseph Wardenski
Represented By: Justin Kingsolver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Concerned Black Clergy of Metropolitan Atlanta, Inc.
Represented By: Britton Dale Davis
Represented By: Chahira Solh
Represented By: Clifford Zatz
Represented By: Esperanza Segarra
Represented By: Gilda Rae Williams
Represented By: Jess Unger
Represented By: Jorge Luis Vasquez
Represented By: Judith Browne Dianis
Represented By: Kurt G. Kastorf
Represented By: Nkechi Kanu
Represented By: Sabrina S. Khan
Represented By: Warrington S. Parker, III
Represented By: William Tucker
Represented By: Angela A. Groves
Represented By: Catherine Harding McCord
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Joseph Wardenski
Represented By: Justin Kingsolver
Represented By: Marques Banks
Represented By: Mahroh Jahangiri
Represented By: Megan Porter
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Justice Initiative, Inc.
Represented By: Britton Dale Davis
Represented By: Chahira Solh
Represented By: Clifford Zatz
Represented By: Esperanza Segarra
Represented By: Gilda Rae Williams
Represented By: Jess Unger
Represented By: Jorge Luis Vasquez
Represented By: Judith Browne Dianis
Represented By: Kurt G. Kastorf
Represented By: Nkechi Kanu
Represented By: Sabrina S. Khan
Represented By: Warrington S. Parker, III
Represented By: William Tucker
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Joseph Wardenski
Represented By: Justin Kingsolver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The United States of America
Represented By: Aileen Bell Hughes
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Ryan
Represented By: Ernest Alan McFarland
Represented By: Jasmyn Gabrielle Richardson
Represented By: John A Russ, IV
Represented By: Rachel Renae Evans
Represented By: Thomas Christian Herren, Jr.
Represented By: Maura Eileen O'Connor
Represented By: Sejal Jhaveri
Represented By: James Eric Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Raffensperger
Represented By: Brian Field
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Erik Scott Jaffe
Represented By: Gene C. Schaerr
Represented By: H. Christopher Bartolomucci
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Represented By: Riddhi Dasgupta
Represented By: Deborah Ann Ausburn
Represented By: Annika M. Boone
Represented By: Daniel H Weigel
Represented By: Diane Festin LaRoss
Represented By: Tobias C. Tatum, Sr
Represented By: Edward H Trent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Sullivan
Represented By: Brian Field
Represented By: Erik Scott Jaffe
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Gene C. Schaerr
Represented By: H. Christopher Bartolomucci
Represented By: Riddhi Dasgupta
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Worley
Represented By: Brian Field
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Erik Scott Jaffe
Represented By: Gene C. Schaerr
Represented By: H. Christopher Bartolomucci
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Represented By: Riddhi Dasgupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Mashburn
Represented By: Brian Field
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Erik Scott Jaffe
Represented By: Gene C. Schaerr
Represented By: H. Christopher Bartolomucci
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Represented By: Riddhi Dasgupta
Represented By: Annika M. Boone
Represented By: Daniel H Weigel
Represented By: Deborah Ann Ausburn
Represented By: Diane Festin LaRoss
Represented By: Tobias C. Tatum, Sr
Represented By: Edward H Trent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anh Le
Represented By: Brian Field
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Erik Scott Jaffe
Represented By: Gene C. Schaerr
Represented By: H. Christopher Bartolomucci
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Represented By: Riddhi Dasgupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Republican National Committee
Represented By: Cameron T. Norris
Represented By: John E. Hall, Jr.
Represented By: Steven Christopher Begakis
Represented By: Tyler R. Green
Represented By: William Bradley Carver
Represented By: William Dowdy White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Republican Senatorial Committee
Represented By: Cameron T. Norris
Represented By: John E. Hall, Jr.
Represented By: Steven Christopher Begakis
Represented By: Tyler R. Green
Represented By: William Bradley Carver
Represented By: William Dowdy White
Represented By: Baxter D. Drennon
Represented By: Thomas McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Republican Party, Inc.
Represented By: Alex Benjamin Kaufman
Represented By: Cameron T. Norris
Represented By: John E. Hall, Jr.
Represented By: Steven Christopher Begakis
Represented By: Tyler R. Green
Represented By: William Bradley Carver
Represented By: William Dowdy White
Represented By: Baxter D. Drennon
Represented By: Thomas McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Bentley
Represented By: Karl Patrick Broder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenda Henley
Represented By: Karl Patrick Broder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty Bryant
Represented By: Karl Patrick Broder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vera McIntosh
Represented By: Karl Patrick Broder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Dave
Represented By: Daniel Walter White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy McClain
Represented By: Karl Patrick Broder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich Deshazior
Represented By: Daniel Walter White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don DiStefano
Represented By: Daniel Walter White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Murray
Represented By: Daniel Walter White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Wan
Represented By: Cheryl Ringer
Represented By: David R. Lowman
Represented By: Kaye Woodard Burwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Wingate
Represented By: Cheryl Ringer
Represented By: David R. Lowman
Represented By: Kaye Woodard Burwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Ruth
Represented By: David R. Lowman
Represented By: Kaye Woodard Burwell
Represented By: Stephanie Lin
Represented By: Cheryl Ringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vernetta Keith Nuriddin
Represented By: Cheryl Ringer
Represented By: David R. Lowman
Represented By: Kaye Woodard Burwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Johnson
Represented By: David R. Lowman
Represented By: Kaye Woodard Burwell
Represented By: Cheryl Ringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Gammage
Represented By: William K. Scott
Represented By: Steven E. Rosenberg
Represented By: Amelia Michele Joiner
Represented By: Emilie Omer Denmark
Represented By: Brad M. Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory W. Edwards
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Erik Scott Jaffe
Represented By: Gene C. Schaerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice O'Lenick
Represented By: Melanie Felicia Wilson
Represented By: Tuwanda Rush Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wandy Taylor
Represented By: Melanie Felicia Wilson
Represented By: Tuwanda Rush Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen W. Day
Represented By: Melanie Felicia Wilson
Represented By: Tuwanda Rush Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Awuku
Represented By: Melanie Felicia Wilson
Represented By: Tuwanda Rush Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Gartland
Represented By: Daniel Walter White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica M. Brooks
Represented By: Daniel Walter White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Tindall Ghazal
Represented By: Brian Field
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: H. Christopher Bartolomucci
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Represented By: Annika M. Boone
Represented By: Daniel H Weigel
Represented By: Deborah Ann Ausburn
Represented By: Diane Festin LaRoss
Represented By: Gene C. Schaerr
Represented By: Tobias C. Tatum, Sr
Represented By: Edward H Trent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa K. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Mosbacher
Represented By: Daniel Walter White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Bruning
Represented By: Daniel Walter White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tori Silas
Represented By: Daniel Walter White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Kemp
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Erik Scott Jaffe
Represented By: Gene C. Schaerr
Represented By: H. Christopher Bartolomucci
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Represented By: Riddhi Dasgupta
Represented By: Annika M. Boone
Represented By: Daniel H Weigel
Represented By: Deborah Ann Ausburn
Represented By: Diane Festin LaRoss
Represented By: Tobias C. Tatum, Sr
Represented By: Edward H Trent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fulton County Registration and Elections Board
Represented By: Cheryl Ringer
Represented By: David R. Lowman
Represented By: Kaye Woodard Burwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard L. Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeKalb County Board of Registrations and Elections
Represented By: Bennett Davis Bryan
Represented By: Irene B. Vander Els
Represented By: Shelley Driskell Momo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Lewis
Represented By: Bennett Davis Bryan
Represented By: Irene B. Vander Els
Represented By: Shelley Driskell Momo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Motter
Represented By: Bennett Davis Bryan
Represented By: Irene B. Vander Els
Represented By: Shelley Driskell Momo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dele L. Smith
Represented By: Bennett Davis Bryan
Represented By: Irene B. Vander Els
Represented By: Shelley Driskell Momo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel E. Tillman
Represented By: Bennett Davis Bryan
Represented By: Irene B. Vander Els
Represented By: Shelley Driskell Momo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baoky N. Vu
Represented By: Bennett Davis Bryan
Represented By: Irene B. Vander Els
Represented By: Shelley Driskell Momo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwinnett County Board of Registrations and Elections
Represented By: Melanie Felicia Wilson
Represented By: Tuwanda Rush Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cobb County Board of Elections and Registration
Represented By: Daniel Walter White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Daniell
Represented By: Daniel Walter White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Aiken
Represented By: Daniel Walter White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daryl O. Wilson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Walter White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janine Eveler
Represented By: Daniel Walter White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hall County Board of Elections and Registration
Represented By: Eric P. Wilborn
Represented By: Kristin K Bloodworth
Represented By: Michael Van Stephens, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Smiley
Represented By: Eric P. Wilborn
Represented By: Michael Van Stephens, II
Represented By: Kristin K Bloodworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Kennedy
Represented By: Eric P. Wilborn
Represented By: Michael Van Stephens, II
Represented By: Kristin K Bloodworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Cochran
Represented By: Eric P. Wilborn
Represented By: Michael Van Stephens, II
Represented By: Kristin K Bloodworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Lutz
Represented By: Eric P. Wilborn
Represented By: Michael Van Stephens, II
Represented By: Kristin K Bloodworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gala Sheats
Represented By: Eric P. Wilborn
Represented By: Michael Van Stephens, II
Represented By: Kristin K Bloodworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Wurtz
Represented By: Eric P. Wilborn
Represented By: Kristin K Bloodworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton County Board of Elections and Registration
Represented By: Arash A. Sabzevari
Represented By: Jack Reynolds Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darlene Johnson
Represented By: Arash A. Sabzevari
Represented By: Jack Reynolds Hancock
Search News [