Vargas et al v. U.S. Department of State et al
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Vargas and Maria Guadalupe Faustino Mendez
Defendant: U.S. Consulate General in Ciudad Juarez, Christopher A. Wray, Chad Wolf, Michael R. Pompeo, John Tavenner, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, William Barr, U.S. Citizenship and Immigrations Services and Federal Bureau of Investigations
Case Number: 2:2020cv00083
Filed: March 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SECOND AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 04/30/2020. (mmc) (ADI)
April 2, 2020 Filing 18 Return of Service Executed by Maria Guadalupe Faustino Mendez, Guadalupe Vargas. U.S. Consulate General in Ciudad Juarez served on 3/26/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Holden, Giovanna)
April 2, 2020 Filing 17 Return of Service Executed by Maria Guadalupe Faustino Mendez, Guadalupe Vargas. U.S. Department of State served on 3/26/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Holden, Giovanna)
April 2, 2020 Filing 16 Return of Service Executed by Maria Guadalupe Faustino Mendez, Guadalupe Vargas. U.S. Citizenship and Immigrations Services served on 3/26/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Holden, Giovanna)
April 2, 2020 Filing 15 Return of Service Executed by Maria Guadalupe Faustino Mendez, Guadalupe Vargas. Byung Jin Pak served on 3/26/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Holden, Giovanna)
April 2, 2020 Filing 14 Return of Service Executed by Maria Guadalupe Faustino Mendez, Guadalupe Vargas. U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 3/26/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Holden, Giovanna)
April 2, 2020 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed by Maria Guadalupe Faustino Mendez, Guadalupe Vargas. Michael R. Pompeo served on 3/26/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Holden, Giovanna)
April 2, 2020 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed by Maria Guadalupe Faustino Mendez, Guadalupe Vargas. Kenneth T. Cuccinelli served on 3/26/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Holden, Giovanna)
April 2, 2020 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed by Maria Guadalupe Faustino Mendez, Guadalupe Vargas. John Tavenner served on 3/26/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Holden, Giovanna)
April 2, 2020 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by Maria Guadalupe Faustino Mendez, Guadalupe Vargas. Federal Bureau of Investigations served on 3/26/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Holden, Giovanna)
April 2, 2020 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by Maria Guadalupe Faustino Mendez, Guadalupe Vargas. Christopher A. Wray served on 3/26/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Holden, Giovanna)
April 2, 2020 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Maria Guadalupe Faustino Mendez, Guadalupe Vargas. Chad Wolf served on 3/26/2020, answer due 5/26/2020., Return of Service Executed by Maria Guadalupe Faustino Mendez; Guadalupe Vargas. Chad Wolf served on 3/26/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Holden, Giovanna)
April 2, 2020 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Maria Guadalupe Faustino Mendez, Guadalupe Vargas. William Barr served on 3/26/2020, answer due 5/26/2020., Return of Service Executed by Maria Guadalupe Faustino Mendez; Guadalupe Vargas. William Barr served on 3/26/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Holden, Giovanna)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (dgs) (ADI)
March 25, 2020 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Chad Wolf, #2 Summons Christopher Wray, #3 Summons FBI, #4 Summons John Tavenner, #5 Summons Kenneth Cuccinelli, #6 Summons Michael Pompeo, #7 Summons Office of the General Counsel, #8 Summons US Attorney, #9 Summons US Citizenship and Immigration Services, #10 Summons US Consulate General in Ciudad Juarez, #11 Summons US Department of State)(dgr)
March 24, 2020 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Maria Guadalupe Faustino Mendez, Guadalupe Vargas (Holden, Giovanna)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 GENERAL ORDER 20-01 IN RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/16/2020. (rsg)
March 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE Of Filing Civil Cover Sheet by Maria Guadalupe Faustino Mendez, Guadalupe Vargas (Holden, Giovanna)
March 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Mandamus Relief filed by Guadalupe Vargas and Maria Guadalupe Faustino Mendez. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-9508400) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through C)(dgr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vargas et al v. U.S. Department of State et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Consulate General in Ciudad Juarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher A. Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael R. Pompeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Tavenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigrations Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Vargas
Represented By: Giovanna Andrea Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Guadalupe Faustino Mendez
Represented By: Giovanna Andrea Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?