Davila v. Marshall et al
Plaintiff: |
Anthony Davila |
Defendant: |
Logan Marshall and FNU Durden |
Case Number: |
1:2012cv00149 |
Filed: |
October 3, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia |
Office: |
Augusta Office |
County: |
McDuffie |
Presiding Judge: |
W. Leon Barfield |
Presiding Judge: |
J. Randal Hall |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner - Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 20, 2015 |
Filing
97
ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 73 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's RLUIPA claims are dismissed. Plaintiff's Complaint is Dismissed, with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter the appropriate judgment of dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 1/20/2015. (csr)
|
September 2, 2014 |
Filing
89
ORDER granting 73 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's Complaint is Dismissed, without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter the appropriate judgment of dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 9/2/2014. (csr)
|
October 17, 2013 |
Filing
52
ORDER adopting Magistrate Judge's 49 Report and Recommendations; granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 25 Motion to Dismiss; that Plaintiff's RLUIPA claims for monetary damages are dismissed; that Plaintiff's 42 U.S.C. § 1983 claims for compensatory damages are also dismissed; and that all other claims remain pending. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 10/17/13. (jah)
|
September 4, 2013 |
Filing
48
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's request for certification. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 9/4/2013. (csr)
|
April 23, 2013 |
Filing
26
ORDER directing Plaintiff to file any objections to Defendants' 25 MOTION to Dismiss, or to otherwise inform the court of his decision not to object to the Defendants' motion within twenty-one days of the date of this Order. The Clerk is instructed to attach a copy of Rule 41, FED. R. CIV. P., as well as Rule 12, FED. R. CIV.P., to the copy of this Order that is served on the Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 4/23/2013. (csr)
|
February 12, 2013 |
Filing
15
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 12 Report and Recommendations, that Plaintiff's Objections are overruled; and that Plaintiff's claims Defendants Marshall and Durden in their official capacities are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 2/12/13. (jah)
|
January 23, 2013 |
Filing
11
ORDER that a copy of Plaintiff's Complaint and a copy of this Order shall be served upon Defendants Marshal and Durden by the United States Marshal. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 1/23/2013. (csr)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?