Gold Cross EMS, Inc. v. The Children's Hospital of Alabama

Plaintiff: Gold Cross EMS, Inc.
Defendant: The Children's Hospital of Alabama
Counter_claimant: The Children's Hospital of Alabama
Counter_defendant: Gold Cross EMS, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv00081
Filed: May 17, 2013
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Augusta Office
County: Columbia
Referring Judge: Brian K. Epps
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Overpayment and Enforcement of Judgment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order 92 ORDER DISMISSING CASE that, subsequent to the filing of the parties' 91 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice, the Court dismisses with prejudice all claims remaining in this matter. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Each party shall bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 09/24/2015. (jah)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order 77 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 71 Motions in Limine. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 09/14/2015. (jah)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order 68 ORDER denying Plaintiff Gold Cross EMS, Inc.'s 62 Motion for Reconsideration; and declining Gold Cross's requests for certification to the Georgia Supreme Court or interlocutory review. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 06/01/2015. (jah)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order 61 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant The Children's Hospital of Alabama's 43 Motion for Summary Judgment. This case shall proceed to trial on all remaining claims. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 1/8/2015. (jah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gold Cross EMS, Inc. v. The Children's Hospital of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gold Cross EMS, Inc.
Represented By: Steven D. Henry
Represented By: J. Robert Persons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Children's Hospital of Alabama
Represented By: Alexander H. Booth
Represented By: Jasper P. Juliano
Represented By: Marcus W. Lee
Represented By: Mark W. Wortham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: The Children's Hospital of Alabama
Represented By: Alexander H. Booth
Represented By: Jasper P. Juliano
Represented By: Marcus W. Lee
Represented By: Mark W. Wortham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Gold Cross EMS, Inc.
Represented By: J. Robert Persons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?