Gray v. McHugh
Plaintiff: Russell Gray
Defendant: John M. McHugh
Case Number: 1:2013cv00224
Filed: December 27, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Augusta Office
County: Richmond
Presiding Judge: Brian K. Epps
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER dismissing Mr. Gray's claims without prejudice. The Clerk shall serve a copy of this Order on Mr. Gray and close this case. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 03/10/2015. (thb)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER denying Mr. Gray's request for court-appointed counsel. Mr. Gray is directed to report in writing within seven days from the date of this Order.(1) whether he intends to continue litigating this case and (2) if so, whether he will represe nt himself or retain new legal counsel. Failure to comply with this directive will result in dismissal of his claims without prejudice. The court directs the Clerk to serve a copy of this Order on Mr. Gray at the following address: Russell Gray, 3922 Barrett Street, Augusta, GA 30909. Compliance due by 3/10/2015. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 03/03/2015. (thb)
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 33 Motion to Amend/Correct; terminating 28 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff is allowed 7 days from the date of this Order to file his 3rd amended complaint as a stand alone document. Defendant shall have 21 days from the date of this order to renew his motion to dismiss or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's 3rd amended complaint. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 9/19/14. (cmr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. McHugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Gray
Represented By: Chuck R. Pardue
Represented By: Shellana Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M. McHugh
Represented By: Sanjay S. Karnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?