M.I.T., Inc., v. Medcare Express, N. Charleston, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
M.I.T., Inc., |
Defendant: |
Medcare Express, N. Charleston, LLC, Medcare Urgent Care Center, W. Ashley, LLC and Medcare Express Lexington, LLC |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv00081 |
Filed: |
March 25, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia |
Office: |
Augusta Office |
County: |
McDuffie |
Presiding Judge: |
Brian K. Epps |
Presiding Judge: |
J. Randal Hall |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 23, 2016 |
Filing
21
ORDER denying Defendants' 14 Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 8/23/2016. (jah)
|
October 14, 2014 |
Filing
12
ORDER granting the Plaintiff's 9 Motion for Default Judgment; instructing the Clerk to enter judgment in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant Medcare Express N. Charleston in the sum of $115,731.67, and against Defendant Medcare Urge nt Care Center in the sum of $147,231.67, and against Defendant Medcare Express Lexington in the sum of $165,231.67; and, directing the Clerk to terminate all deadlines and motions, and close this case. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 10/14/2014. (jah)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: M.I.T., Inc., v. Medcare Express, N. Charleston, LLC et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: M.I.T., Inc., |
Represented By: |
Robert J. Lowe, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Medcare Express, N. Charleston, LLC |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Medcare Urgent Care Center, W. Ashley, LLC |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Medcare Express Lexington, LLC |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?