Pearson v. Augusta, Georgia et al
Plaintiff: |
Melinda Beazley Pearson |
Defendant: |
Augusta, Georgia, Fred Russell, Bill Shanahan, Sam Smith and John and Jane Doe |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv00110 |
Filed: |
May 2, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia |
Office: |
Augusta Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Brian K. Epps |
Presiding Judge: |
J. Randal Hall |
Nature of Suit: |
Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1331 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 21, 2017 |
Filing
214
ORDER denying 201 Motion for Certificate of Appealability; denying 202 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b); denying 203 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 204 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 08/21/2017. (pts)
|
June 19, 2017 |
Filing
200
ORDER denying these motions 194 Motion for Reconsideration; 196] Motion for Reconsideration; 197 Motion for Reconsideration. This case will proceed to trial. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 6/19/17. (cmr)
|
March 9, 2017 |
Filing
193
ORDER denying Plaintiff's 54 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting Augusta, Georgia's 55 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting Fred Russell's 56 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting Bill Shanahan's 57 Motion for Summa ry Judgment; granting Sam Smith's 58 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying Plaintiff's 54 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; terminating Plaintiff's 131 Motion for Extension of Time; denying Plaintiff's 138 Motion fo r Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part Augusta, Georgia's 141 Motion for Summary Judgment; terminating Plaintiff's 185 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff's Title VII retaliation claim will proceed. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 03/09/2017. (pts)
|
March 2, 2016 |
Filing
132
ORDER granting 28 Motion to Consolidate Cases. The Clerk is instructed to consolidate case numbers CV114-110 and CV115-123. The case will now go forward as case number CV114-110. The Court will reserve ruling on pending motions for summary judg ment until all additional motions have been filed. Furthermore, the Court grants in part and denies in part Defendant City of Augusta's motion to dismiss (Pearson II doc. 10). Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 03/02/2016. (thb) Modified on 3/2/2016 (thb).
|
February 24, 2015 |
Filing
23
ORDER denying as moot 15 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying as moot in part 16 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying as moot in part 17 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying as moot in part 18 Motion to D ismiss. All causes of action against Fred Russell, Bill Shanahan, Sam Smith, and unnamed City Employees in their official capacities are dismissed as duplicative of the causes of action against the city. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 02/24/2015. (thb)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?