Fountain v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Maria Fountain
Defendant: United States of America, John M. McHugh and Alex Gaines
Case Number: 1:2014cv00127
Filed: June 4, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Augusta Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Brian K. Epps
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:134
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER making the 108 USCA Mandate the Order of this Court. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 07/24/2018. (jlh)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER ADOPTING 90 Report and Recommendations, DENYING AS MOOT 70 First Motion to Compel, DENYING AS MOOT 86 Second Motion to Compel, GRANTING 72 Motion for Sanctions, DENYING AS MOOT 74 Motion to Stay, DENYING AS MOOT 73 Motion for Reconsideration, GRANTING Defendant's request for attorney's fees, DISMISSING this case and CLOSING this civil action. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 1/31/2017. (maa) (maa)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 65 Motion for judicial notice of damages; denying Plaintiff's 66 Motion for Protective Order; and ordering Plaintiff to appear for her deposition as noticed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 08/29/2016. (jah)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion for leave to serve additional requests for admission upon Defendant. The Court ORDERS Defendant to serve a response to the disputed requests for admission within 30 days (by 9/1/2016) of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 08/02/2016. (pts)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 30 Motion to Dismiss; denying Plaintiff's 36 Motion to Strike; and denying as moot Plaintiff's 46 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 4/14/2016. (jah)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fountain v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Fountain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M. McHugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Gaines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?