Curry v. State of Georgia et al
Plaintiff: |
Terrance Deion Curry |
Defendant: |
State of Georgia, City of Augusta, Georgia, FNU Day and John Does |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv00173 |
Filed: |
August 27, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia |
Office: |
Augusta Office |
County: |
Johnson |
Presiding Judge: |
Brian K. Epps |
Presiding Judge: |
J. Randal Hall |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 24, 2016 |
Filing
56
ORDER adopting the 54 Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation as the opinion of the Court; granting Plaintiff's 51 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice; denying as moot Defendant's 39 Motion for Summary Judgment; dismissing this case without prejudice; and closing this civil action. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 8/24/2016. (jah)
|
July 29, 2016 |
Filing
55
ORDER directing service of the R&R on all parties - re 54 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 51 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Terrance Deion Curry, 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Michael Day. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 7/29/16. (cmr)
|
December 9, 2015 |
Filing
53
ORDER adopting 49 Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendations; and dismissing without prejudice the John Doe Defendants, as well as all claims raised against them, based on the failure to timely effect service. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 12/9/2015. (jah)
|
July 15, 2015 |
Filing
36
ORDER denying Plaintiff's 32 Motion to Stay his deposition; directing that Plaintiff shall sit for his deposition and answer defense counsel's questions, pursuant to the terms of the Court's 7 November 10, 2014 Order; directing th at discovery shall be reopened for thirty (3) days from the date of this Order solely for the purpose of taking Plaintiff's deposition; warning that, if the Plaintiff fails to cooperate at the deposition such failure will result in dismissal of this case as a sanction under Fed. R. Cv. P. 37; directing that the deadline for filing motions, including motions for summary judgment, is also extended until thirty (30) days after the close of this new discovery period; directing the Clerk to term inate the improperly filed 34 Motion to Extend Discovery (by Daniel W. Taylor) from the motions report; ruling that Daniel W. Taylor is not a party to this case and cannot represent Plaintiff in this case; and, as such, directing the Clerk of Court to return any documents not signed by Plaintiff and accept for filing only documents signed by Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 7/15/2015. (jah)
|
April 15, 2015 |
Filing
23
ORDER denying Plaintiff's 21 Motion for Contempt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 04/15/2015. (jah)
|
March 16, 2015 |
Filing
20
ORDER denying Plaintiff's 18 Motion to Compel; and cautioning Plaintiff and Mr. Taylor (Daniel W. Taylor) that Mr. Taylor may not sign papers in this case on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 03/16/2015. (jah)
|
December 9, 2014 |
Filing
10
ORDER adopting the 8 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge as its opinion; and, therefore, dismissing Defendants the State of Georgia and the City of Augusta, Georgia from this case. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 12/9/2014. (jah)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?