Green v. Simpson, et al
Plaintiff: Ramone Willie Green
Defendant: Harold Simpson, FNU Greenway, FNU Neighbors, Justin Washington, Ben LNU, Lenon Butler, Clifford Brown, Devon Perry, FNU Williams and Jerry L. Beard
Case Number: 1:2014cv00192
Filed: October 6, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Augusta Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Brian K. Epps
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER that this matter is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk is instructed to close this case. Each party shall bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 07/31/2017. (thb)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER denying 86 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum; denying 88 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying 90 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum; denying 91 Motion to Court for Replacement of Legal Document; grantin g 92 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The Court directs the Clerk to mail this Order as well as the Court's Order dated March 20, 2017 (doc. 77), to Plaintiff's new address. Plaintiff must file a proposed pretrial order by 5:00 p.m. on Thursday, June 8, 2017. If Plaintiff fails to file his proposed pretrial order in accordance with the Court's instructions, his case will be dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 05/31/2017. (thb)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER adopting 72 Report and Recommendations; granting in part and denying in part 64 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 08/25/2016. (thb)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER adopting 38 Report and Recommendations. Therefore, dismissing Plaintiff's deliberate indifference claims against Defendants Greenaway,Nabors, Binns, Washington, and Beard. Plaintiffs claim for use of excessive force shall proceed against all ten Defendants, and his claim for deliberate indifference to a serious medical need shall proceed against Defendant Butler. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 6/18/15. (cmr)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER that Defendants shall have fourteen days from the date of this Order to answer the amended complaint. Jerry L. Beard; Clifford Brown; Lenon Butler; Julian Greenway; Antoine Nabors; Devon Perry; Harold Simpson; Justin Washington; John Williams answer due by 5/21/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 05/07/2015. (thb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Simpson, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramone Willie Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Greenway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Neighbors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenon Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devon Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry L. Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?