McNorrill v. Asset Acceptance, LLC
Plaintiff: Joseph Michael McNorrill
Defendant: Asset Acceptance, LLC
Case Number: 1:2014cv00210
Filed: November 7, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Augusta Office
County: Columbia
Presiding Judge: Brian K. Epps
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 59 Motion to Dismiss. This case is dismissed without prejudice and stands CLOSED. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 08/01/2017. (pts)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 07/21/2016. (thb)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER LIFTING STAY. Parties shall have until June 21, 2016 to file any supplemental briefing addressing Johnson's impact on the presently pending motions in those cases. Brief due by 6/21/2016. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 06/01/2016. (thb)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER STAYING CASE pending the Eleventh Circuit's decision in Johnson v. Midland Funding, LLC, at which time any party may move to lift the stay. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 05/04/2015. (thb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNorrill v. Asset Acceptance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Michael McNorrill
Represented By: Christopher A. Cosper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asset Acceptance, LLC
Represented By: Jason W. Blanchard
Represented By: Benjamin H. Brewton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?