Brown v. Sullivan et al
Plaintiff: Brandon Brown
Defendant: Samuel Sullivan and Paine College
Case Number: 1:2015cv00035
Filed: March 3, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Augusta Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Brian K. Epps
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER DISMISSING CASE upon consideration of the parties' 117 Stipulation of Dismissal. It is therefore ordered that Plaintiff's claims against Defendants are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 03/16/2018. (jlh)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER SETTING MEDIATION for Thursday, February 1, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. Confidential Mediation statements due Wednesday, January 31, 2018, 12:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 01/26/2018. (jlh)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER and NOTICE of PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS. (Proposed pretrial order due by the close of business on 12/15/2017; Evidentiary objections and motions in limine due by the close of business on 01/05/2018 with corresponding responses due by the close of b usiness on 01/19/2018; Jury Selection set for 2/12/2018 09:00 AM in Augusta - 2nd Floor before Chief Judge J. Randal Hall; Pretrial Conference set for 2/7/2018 11:00 AM in Augusta - 2nd Floor before Chief Judge J. Randal Hall.) Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 11/21/2017. (jlh)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 54 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying Plaintiff's 57 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 66 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 08/10/2017. (pts)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER clarifying previous order regarding page limitations - re 84 Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 7/5/17. (cmr)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER directing the parties to file responses to the motions for summary judgment within 14 days - re 57 54 66 . (Compliance due by 7/13/2017). Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 6/29/17. (cmr)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER denies as moot 81 Motion for in camera review of designated confidential documents. In accordance with Local Rule 79.7, the Court DIRECTS the Clerk to return to Plaintiff the disputed exhibits. See Loc. R. 79.7(c). Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 5/10/17. (cmr)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER directing the parties to confer and submit a joint proposal for scheduling through dispositive motions within 7 days of this order, (compliance due by 1/24/2017). Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 1/17/17. (cmr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Sullivan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Brown
Represented By: Fletcher N. Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Yolanda Moniqueka Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Sullivan
Represented By: Michael Montgomery Shetterly
Represented By: Deepa N. Subramanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paine College
Represented By: Michael Montgomery Shetterly
Represented By: Deepa N. Subramanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?