Moore v. Robertson & Penn, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Thomas H. Moore
Defendant: Robertson & Penn, LLC, American Fire & Casualty Company and Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2016cv00079
Filed: June 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Augusta Office
County: McDuffie
Presiding Judge: Brian K. Epps
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER for Plaintiff's exhibits, entered into evidence during the jury trial of 06/20/2017, be returned to John C. Bell, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 05/29/2018. (jlh)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER to feed the jury. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 6/21/17. (cmr)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER directing Dr. Jeremy Hertza, Psy.D. to produce his raw test data from Plaintiff's neuropsychological evaluation to Defendants within 10 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 02/10/2017. (maa)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Robertson & Penn, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas H. Moore
Represented By: John C. Bell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robertson & Penn, LLC
Represented By: Robert E. Casey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: Robert E. Casey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert E. Casey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?