elaga-bey v. Matthews et al
Plaintiff: taqi elaga-bey
Defendant: Kimberley Matthews, Kate Harrenstein and Gerlinde Berry
Case Number: 1:2016cv00146
Filed: September 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Augusta Office
County: Richmond
Presiding Judge: Brian K. Epps
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 18:241
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DISMISSING Plaintiff's claims against Defendants. The Clerk is directed to terminate all motions and deadlines and close this case. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 09/29/2017. (thb)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER directing both parties to provide written supplemental briefs regarding jurisdiction, (Briefs due by 3/14/2017). Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 2/15/17. (cmr)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 13 Motion to Stay Discovery. Discovery is stayed pending the ruling from the District Judge on the Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 1/17/17. (cmr)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER offering pro-se plaintiff instructions on how to proceed with service and future filings in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/13/16. (cmr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: elaga-bey v. Matthews et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: taqi elaga-bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberley Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kate Harrenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerlinde Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?