Arrington v. Warden
Petitioner: Robert Owen Arrington
Respondent: Warden
Case Number: 1:2017cv00022
Filed: February 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Augusta Office
County: Butts
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting 75 Motion to Dismiss. This case stands Closed. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 3/14/2018. (pts)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER denying 60 Motion for a Scheduling Order; denying 62 Motion to Stay; denying 68 Motion for a Scheduling Order. Petitioner is granted leave to amend his petition. Petitioner's Amended Petition due 11/30/2017. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 10/16/2017. (pts)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER dismissing without prejudice Claims One, Two, Three, Four, Five, and Seven of Petitioner's petition for failure to meet the fact-pleading requirements of Federal Habeas Rule 2. The Court dismisses with prejudice Claim Eight because it is not a cognizable claim in habeas proceedings. The Court requires no action by Respondents with regard to Claim Six because Respondents have already voluntarily filed an answer in this case. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 09/14/2017. (thb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arrington v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Owen Arrington
Represented By: John Paul Batson
Represented By: Brian S. Kammer
Represented By: Heidi E. Reiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Represented By: Sabrina D. Graham
Represented By: Channell Veena Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?