Wiggins v. University Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Machelle Wiggins
Defendant: University Hospital, Danette Thomas and Vita Mason
Case Number: 1:2017cv00026
Filed: March 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Augusta Office
County: Richmond
Presiding Judge: Brian K. Epps
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER denying 47 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 49 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court dismisses Plaintiff's disability discrimination claim for failure to exhaust administrative remedies and closes this case. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 09/06/2018. (maa)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER vacating this order 13 Order on Report and Recommendations. Further, plaintiff's objections are overruled and the R&R is Adopted and defendants Thomas and Mason are Dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 6/26/17. (cmr)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER adopting 6 Report and Recommendations. Therefore defendants Thomas and Mason are Dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 5/19/17. (cmr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiggins v. University Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Machelle Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danette Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vita Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?