Tidwell et al v. Chattanooga Fire Protection, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Douglas Tidwell and David Keith Leggett
Defendant: Chattanooga Fire Protection, Inc. and Joseph Anthony Bishop
Case Number: 1:2017cv00030
Filed: March 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Augusta Office
County: Columbia
Presiding Judge: Brian K. Epps
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. This case stands closed. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 12/6/2018. (pts)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER and Notice of Pretrial Proceedings. The Court Orders lead counsel for the parties to meet and confer, in person, and prepare and file with the Clerk of this Court one consolidated proposed pretrial order. (Motions in Limine and Evidentiary Obj ections due by 1/3/2019, Pretrial Order due by 12/20/2018.), (Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/31/2019 10:00 AM in Augusta - 2nd Floor before Chief Judge J. Randal Hall, Jury Selection set for 2/4/2019 09:00 AM in Augusta - 2nd Floor before Chief Judge J. Randal Hall.) Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 10/29/2018. (pts)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER finding the Court has subject-matter jurisdiction over this case at this time, and that the case shall proceed. Further, the Court DIRECTS the Clerk to correct docket entry 24 Response filed by Douglas Tidwell, to reflect the document is the Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/10/2017. (pts)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tidwell et al v. Chattanooga Fire Protection, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Tidwell
Represented By: Harold V. Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Keith Leggett
Represented By: Harold V. Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chattanooga Fire Protection, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Anthony Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?