Washam v. Burke County Jail
Plaintiff: Micheal Wayne Washam
Defendant: Burke County Jail
Case Number: 1:2017cv00057
Filed: May 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Augusta Office
County: Burke
Presiding Judge: Brian K. Epps
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Upon consideration of the 96 Stipulation of Dismissal signed by all parties, the Court finds dismissal is appropriate under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1). This case stands closed. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 09/25/2018. (jlh)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER ADOPTING the 92 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, as modified herein, as its opinion. The Defendants notified the Court Plaintiff signed and returned the revised release and stipulation of dismissal; the Court denies as moot Defendants' 84 MOTION for Enforcement of Settlement; and denies Plaintiff's 83 , 85 , and 88 Motions challenging the settlement. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 09/19/2018. (jlh) Modified on 9/19/2018 (jlh).
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER directing service of the 92 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on all parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 08/28/2018. (jlh)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER ADOPTING 73 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as the Court's opinion and grants in part and denies in part Defendant Stacey Williams' 58 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant Stacey Williams is ordered to file an answer within 14 days of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 04/23/2018. (jlh)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER directing service of the 73 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on all parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 03/26/2018. (jlh)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER adopting the 56 Report and Recommendations as the Court's opinion and overrules the parties' objections; granting in part and denying in part 40 Motion to Dismiss. The Court Orders Defendants Bush, Huffman, Wilbert Williams, Young, and Haynes to file an answer with 14 days of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 03/06/2018. (jlh)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER directing service of the 56 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on all parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 02/16/2018. (jlh)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER re 29 Waiver of Service Executed re Sheriff Williams served in error; therefore, Sheriff Williams need not file responsive pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 12/06/2017. (jlh)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER adopting 19 Report and Recommendations as its opinion, dismisses Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Alfonzo Williams, dismisses Plaintiff's official capacity claims against Defendants Bush, Huffman, Wilbert Williams, and Haynes, and dismisses Defendant Alfonzo Williams from this case. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 11/29/2017. (jlh)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying 22 Motion to Amend/Correct, in that Plaintiff's proposed amendment does not add any additional facts, legal claims, or relief not already requested; denying 23 Motion for Discovery, in that the Court will not conduct discovery on Plaintiff's behalf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/9/2017. (jlh)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re 19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 17 Amended Complaint filed by Micheal Wayne Washam. Objections due 11/17/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/31/2017. (jlh)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER directing the plaintiff to amend his complaint within 21 days of this order, (Amended Pleadings due by 8/7/2017). Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 7/17/17. (cmr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washam v. Burke County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micheal Wayne Washam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burke County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?