Whitfield v. Fluor Enterprises, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Porsha L Whitfield
Defendant: Bo Lewis and Fluor Enterprises, Inc
Case Number: 1:2017cv00098
Filed: August 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Augusta Office
County: Richmond
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Filing 44 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Fluor Enterprises, Inc. against Porsha L Whitfield. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 03/15/2019. (jlh)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting Defendant's #33 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court finds that Defendant carried its burden to negate an essential element of Plaintiff's sexual harassment and retaliation claims, who in turn, failed to create a genuine issue of material fact on either of those claims. All deadlines are terminated and this case is closed. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 03/15/2019. (jlh)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER denying #25 Motion for Reconsideration re #9 Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 10/26/2018. (thb)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #33 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 08/24/2018. (thb)
August 14, 2018 Filing 40 Brief in Support re #33 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant's Reply Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Fluor Enterprises, Inc. (Austin, Porsche)
August 10, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE of Intent Notice of Defendant's Intent to File a Reply Brief by Fluor Enterprises, Inc re #37 Response in Opposition to Motion. (Austin, Porsche)
August 2, 2018 Filing 38 RESPONSE to the Statement of Undisputed Facts re #33 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Porsha L Whitfield. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(thb)
August 2, 2018 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #33 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Porsha L Whitfield. (thb)
August 2, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #33 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Porsha L Whitfield. Responses due by 8/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(thb)
July 12, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE issued re: #33 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Fluor Enterprises, Inc. Responses due by 8/1/2018. (thb)
July 11, 2018 Filing 34 DEPOSITION of Porsha L. Whitfield taken on 6/6/2018 by Fluor Enterprises, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21)(Austin, Porsche) Modified on 7/12/2018 (thb).
July 11, 2018 Filing 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Fluor Enterprises, Inc. Responses due by 8/1/2018. (Attachments: #1 Stmt of Material Fact, #2 Exhibit Memorandum of Law ISO Def. Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Brian Reid, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Catheryn McCraw)(Austin, Porsche)
June 1, 2018 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #25 MOTION for Reconsideration re #9 Order on Report and Recommendations filed by Fluor Enterprises, Inc. (Austin, Porsche)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying #27 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 06/01/2018. (thb)
May 23, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Porsche D. Austin on behalf of Fluor Enterprises, Inc. (Austin, Porsche) Modified on 5/23/2018 (thb).
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER striking the 24 Amended Complaint. Should Plaintiff desire to file an amended complaint, she must first file a motion to amend with the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 05/22/2018. (thb)
May 21, 2018 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Porsha L Whitfield re 24 Amended Complaint, #25 MOTION for Reconsideration re #9 Order. (thb)
May 21, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Porsha L Whitfield. Responses due by 6/4/2018. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(thb)
May 18, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re 24 Amended Complaint, #25 MOTION for Reconsideration re #9 Order. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 6/1/2018. (thb)
May 18, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION for Reconsideration re #9 Order, by Porsha L. Whitfield. Responses due by 6/1/2018. (thb)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER finding as moot #22 Motion to Amend/Correct as it relates to Bo Lewis, denying #22 Motion to Amend/Correct as it relates to Defendant Fluor Enterprises, Inc. The parties are Ordered to use the amended caption for future filings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 04/17/2018. (thb)
April 13, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION to Amend/Correct re #1 Complaint by Porsha L Whitfield. Responses due by 4/27/2018. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(thb)
March 27, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE that discovery is not filed with the Court re #20 Certificate of Service. (thb)
March 27, 2018 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fluor Enterprises, Inc. re Defendant Fluor Enterprises' First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff. (Austin, Porsche) Modified on 3/27/2018 (thb).
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 3/23/2018. Discovery due by 6/11/2018. Motions due by 7/11/2018. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 4/9/2018. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 5/8/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 03/01/2018. (thb)
February 22, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE that Discovery is not filed with the Court re 17 Notice by Fluor Enterprises, Inc., RULE 26(a)(1)(A) DISCLOSURES. (thb)
February 21, 2018 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Barnum, Eric)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave of Absence. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 1/23/2018. (cjc)
January 23, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #14 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Fluor Enterprises, Inc for dates of : 3/7/2018, 3/8/2018, 3/9/2018, 3/20/2018, 3/21/2018, 3/22/2018, 3/23/2018, 3/24/2018, 3/25/2018, 3/26/2018, 4/18/2018, 4/19/2018, 4/20/2018, 8/6/2018, 8/7/2018, 8/8/2018, 8/9/20. (thb)
January 23, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Fluor Enterprises, Inc for dates of : 3/7/2018, 3/8/2018, 3/9/2018, 3/20/2018, 3/21/2018, 3/22/2018, 3/23/2018, 3/24/2018, 3/25/2018, 3/26/2018, 4/18/2018, 4/19/2018, 4/20/2018, 8/6/2018, 8/7/2018, 8/8/2018, 8/9/2018, 8/10/2018, 8/11/2018, 8/12/2018, 8/13/2018, 10/10/2018, 10/11/2018, 10/12/2018, 10/13/2018, 10/14/2018, 10/15/2018, 11/6/2018, 11/7/2018, 11/8/2018, 11/9/2018, 11/10/2018, 11/11/2018 by Fluor Enterprises, Inc. Responses due by 2/6/2018. (Barnum, Eric)
January 22, 2018 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fluor Enterprises, Inc. (Barnum, Eric)
January 22, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Fluor Enterprises, Inc.(Barnum, Eric)
January 10, 2018 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Fluor Enterprises, Inc. Waiver sent on 11/22/2017. Answer due 1/22/2018. (thb)
January 10, 2018 Filing 10 U.S. Marshal Return of Service Executed as to Fluor Enterprises, Inc. for #5 Order and #4 Amended Complaint on 12/21/2017. (thb)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER adopting #6 Report and Recommendations, dismissing Plaintiff's religious discrimination claim for failure to state a claim, and dismissing Defendant Lewis from this case. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 12/05/2017. (thb)
November 28, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 12/21/2017. (jlh)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing service of the #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/13/2017. (thb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2017: #1 Notice & Waiver Mailed) (jlh).
November 13, 2017 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #4 Amended Complaint, that Defendant Lewis be dismissed from this case and that Plaintiff's religious discrimination claim be dismissed for failure to state a claim. Objections to R&R due by 11/30/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/13/2017. (thb)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that service of process shall be effected on Defendant Fluor Enterprises re #4 Amended Complaint. Plaintiff is Ordered to serve upon Defendant, or upon its attorneys if appearance has been entered by counsel, a copy of every further pleading or other document submitted to the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/13/2017. (thb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/13/2017: #1 USM-285 Form) (thb). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/28/2017: #2 USM-285 Form) (jlh).
September 13, 2017 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Fluor Enterprises, Inc, Bo Lewis, filed by Porsha L Whitfield.(maa)
August 30, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 9/13/2017. (maa)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court hereby ORDERS Plaintiff to amend her complaint to include all of her allegations in one document, within fourteen days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 08/30/2017. (maa)
August 16, 2017 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Porsha L Whitfield. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(pts)
August 16, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Porsha L Whitfield.(pts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitfield v. Fluor Enterprises, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Porsha L Whitfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bo Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Enterprises, Inc
Represented By: Porsche D. Austin
Represented By: Eric L. Barnum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?