Luke v. University Hospital

Plaintiff: Ramonica M Luke
Defendant: University Hospital
Case Number: 1:2017cv00125
Filed: October 10, 2017
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Augusta Office
County: Richmond
Referring Judge: Brian K. Epps
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 17, 2018 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 51 Oral Motion to conduct a deposition of Chris Westbroook. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 08/17/2018. (jlh)
August 9, 2018 48 Opinion or Order of the Court REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER denying 35 Motion in Limine and reopens the discovery period; granting Defendant's 47 Motion to Withdraw its summary judgment motion; and terminating Defendant's 37 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 08/09/2018. (jlh) Modified on 8/9/2018 (jlh). Modified on 8/9/2018 (jlh).
May 15, 2018 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 33 Motion to Compel Witness to Appear for Deposition and Provide Contact Information. Plaintiff may seek a subpoena from the Clerk of Court for the Southern District of Georgia compelling her attendance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 05/15/2018. (jlh)
May 11, 2018 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 27 Motion to Subpoena Witness. Plaintiff may seek a subpoena from the Clerk of Court for the Southern District of Georgia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 05/11/2018. (jlh)
March 7, 2018 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part Plaintiff's 21 Motion to Compel. Defendants are ordered to produce all time, attendance, and disciplinary records for employees under Vicki Forde's supervision from 01/01/2015-01/07/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 03/07/2018. (jlh)
February 20, 2018 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Motion to amend the name of Defendant from University Hospital to University Health Services, Inc. The 1 Complaint is deemed amended pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15 to correct the misnomer of Defendant University Hospital to reflect its proper name: University Health Services, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 02/20/2018. (jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luke v. University Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramonica M Luke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?