Hesed-El v. Federal National Mortgage Association et al
Plaintiff: Bro T. Hesed-El
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association, Richmond County Marshal's Office, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Richmond County Sheriff's Office, Courtney McCord, Dustin Burdick, Branden James Glover and Richard Roundtree
Case Number: 1:2017cv00146
Filed: November 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Augusta Office
County: Richmond
Presiding Judge: Brian K. Epps
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER that the 140 USCA Mandate is made the order of this Court. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 05/18/2020. (thb)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER denying 114 Motion Rule 60; denying 115 Motion Rule 52; denying 117 Motion/REQUEST for Judicial Notice; denying 119 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 24(a) (4), the Clerk is directed to transmit this Order to the Eleventh Circuit Courtof Appeals. This case remains closed. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 10/10/2019. (thb)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER denying as moot 54 Motion for Hearing and Motion for Extension of Time to File; withdrawing 55 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying as moot 58 Motion to Stay and Motion to Strike; granting 60 Motion to Withdraw; denying as mo ot 67 Motion for TRO; denying as moot 71 Motion to Lift Stay on Discovery; denying as moot 73 Motion to Strike; granting 88 Motion to Dismiss; denying 91 Motion for Leave to File; denying 100 Motion for Leave to File; denying as moot 103 Motion for TRO. Plaintiff's case is dismissed. The Clerk is directed to terminate document 55 and all other pending motions, if any, and close this case. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 03/29/2019. (thb)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting 32 Motion to Set Aside Default; denying as moot 32 Motion to Dismiss; denying 24 Motion for Default Judgment; denying 29 Motion to Allow the Clerk to Enter Default Judgment against Courtney McCord; denying 45 Motion to S tay; denying 48 Motion for Hearing; denying 53 Motion to Withdraw; denying as moot 5 Motion for TRO; denying 61 Motion for Leave to File. The Court sets aside the default entered against Defendant. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 08/20/2018. (thb)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER directing El to file an amended complaint and to provide further explanation as to why he is now the real party in interest. The Court directs the Clerk to enclose Form Pro Se 1, Complaint for a Civil Case, stamped with the appropriate case number, with Plaintiff's service copy of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 11/08/2017. (thb)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing Plaintiff to retain counsel and have that counsel file a notice of appearance in this case within fourteen days of the date of this Order. The Court will not consider any pending motions until Plaintiff retains counsel and that counsel enters a notice of appearance. Compliance due by 11/20/2017. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 11/06/2017. (thb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hesed-El v. Federal National Mortgage Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bro T. Hesed-El
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richmond County Marshal's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richmond County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Burdick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Branden James Glover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Roundtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?