Hinson v. Wilkes et al

Plaintiff: Christopher Mark Hinson, Jr.
Defendant: Scott Wilkes, Ruthie Shelton, Augusta State Medical Prison, Mary Alston, Sharon Lewis, Young, Stan Shepard, Fisherman, Nathan Deal, Gregory C. Dozier, Cody, Red, Moton, COI, Kelley and COI, Cummings
Case Number: 1:2018cv00025
Filed: February 8, 2018
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Augusta Office
County: Richmond
Referring Judge: Brian K. Epps
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2018 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing service of the 34 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on all parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/25/2018. (jlh)
October 3, 2018 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing service of the Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 and 41 to Plaintiff Hinson re the 30 MOTION to Dismiss. If Plaintiff fails to respond, the motion will be deemed unopposed and granted. If Plaintiff also fails to respond to the 31 MOTION to Stay it will likewise be deemed unopposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/03/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 and 41) (jlh)
September 10, 2018 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Motion to Stay as to Defendants Cummings, Alston, and Shelton. This Order does not stay the service deadline for Defendant Cousins or stay the time period by which Defendant Cousins must file a responsive pleading once he is served or waives service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 09/10/2018. (jlh) Modified on 9/10/2018 (jlh).
August 30, 2018 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing service of Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 and 41 to Plaintiff Hinson re Defendants' 22 MOTION to Dismiss so to assure that Plaintiff's response is made with fair notice of the requirements of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure regarding motions to dismiss, generally, and motions to dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 08/30/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 and 41) (jlh)
July 26, 2018 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and dismisses Plaintiff's haircut, gender dysphoria, and housing claims, dismisses Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Wilkes, Lewis, Moton, Shepard, Deal, and Dozier, and dismisses Defendants Wilkes, Lewis, Moton, Separd, Deal, and Dozier from this case. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 07/26/2018. (jlh)
March 22, 2018 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Plaintiff to amend the 1 Complaint within fourteen days of the date of this Order. (Compliance due by 4/5/2018.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 03/22/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Prisoner Complaint) (jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hinson v. Wilkes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Mark Hinson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Wilkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruthie Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Augusta State Medical Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Alston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stan Shepard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fisherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Deal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory C. Dozier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COI, Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COI, Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?