Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.

Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00049
Filed: March 20, 2018
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Augusta Office
County: Richmond
Referring Judge: Brian K. Epps
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2018 27 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT. This case stands closed. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 09/24/2018. (jlh)
September 10, 2018 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Motion to Stay; thus, the Court stays all discovery in this action pending resolution of Defendant's motion for judgment on the pleadings or, in the alternative, motion for summary judgment. Should Defendant's motion be denied, the parties shall submit a proposed joint revised scheduling order within 7 days of the order denying the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 09/10/2018. (jlh)
March 20, 2018 3 Opinion or Order of the Court RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 03/20/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Blank Forms) (jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: James W. Allen
Represented By: Steven Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?