Lancer Insurance Company v. Jet Executive Limousine Service, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lancer Insurance Company
Defendant: Robin Raina, Kent Plowman, Georganna Gullia, United States Liability Insurance Company, Steven Hoppenbrouwer, Jet Executive Limousine Service, Inc., Sahil Raina, John Mason, Stephen Farrar, Alan Cooling, Hennessy Transportation, Inc., Ray Shreyas, Thomas Matthesen, Rick Tomcho, Scott Armstrong, Kenny Strickler, Tim Sheehy, Jessica Barnes, Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, Brian Dill, Wesley Hudson, Joseph Best, Steven Taylor and Cooper-Global Chauffeured Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00136
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Filing 69 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Terry Jackson as to Scott Armstrong, Alan Cooling. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(pts)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #66 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. The deadline to respond is extended nunc pro tunc, and Tim Sheehy answer is due 10/29/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/23/2018. (thb)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #65 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. The deadline to respond is extended nunc pro tunc, and Kenny Strickler answer is due 11/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/23/2018. (thb)
October 22, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #65 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer for Kenny Strickler, #66 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer for Tim Sheehy. (thb)
October 22, 2018 Filing 66 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Tim Sheehy by Lancer Insurance Company. Responses due by 11/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McMickle, Scott)
October 22, 2018 Filing 65 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer for Kenny Strickler by Lancer Insurance Company. Responses due by 11/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McMickle, Scott)
October 22, 2018 Filing 64 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lancer Insurance Company. Hennessy Transportation, Inc. served on 10/10/2018, answer due 10/31/2018. (McMickle, Scott)
October 22, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #63 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Terry D. Jackson, Receipt Number 113J-2468147, Fee Amount $200. #62 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Terry D. Jackson, Receipt Number 113J-2468136, Fee Amount $200. (thb)
October 19, 2018 Filing 63 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Terry D. Jackson, Receipt Number 113J-2468147, Fee Amount $200, by Alan Cooling. Responses due by 11/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lowry, Stephen) Modified on 10/22/2018 (thb).
October 19, 2018 Filing 62 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Terry D. Jackson, Receipt Number 113J-2468136, Fee Amount $200, by Scott Armstrong. Responses due by 11/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lowry, Stephen) Modified on 10/22/2018 (thb).
October 19, 2018 Filing 61 Consent MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of Georgia, Atlanta Division by Scott Armstrong, Alan Cooling. Responses due by 11/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lowry, Stephen)
October 19, 2018 Filing 60 ANSWER to Complaint by Joseph Best.(Law, Peter)
October 19, 2018 Filing 59 ANSWER to Complaint by Tim Sheehy.(McEvoy, R.)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 TEXT ORDER granting #55 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Georganna Gullia, and finding the requirements in Local Rule 83.4 have been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/17/2018. (cjc)
October 17, 2018 Filing 57 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #55 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Barry Goodman. (thb)
October 17, 2018 MOTION REFERRED: #55 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Barry Goodman, Receipt Number 113J-2465715, Fee Amount $200. (thb)
October 16, 2018 Filing 56 ANSWER to Complaint by Georganna Gullia.(Nichols, Titus)
October 16, 2018 Filing 55 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Barry Goodman, Receipt Number 113J-2465715, Fee Amount $200, by Georganna Gullia. Responses due by 10/30/2018. (Nichols, Titus) Modified on 10/17/2018 (thb). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/17/2018: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (thb).
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #50 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Brian Dill answer due 11/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/16/2018. (thb)
October 16, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joseph Best answer due 10/22/2018. (thb)
October 16, 2018 Filing 53 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lancer Insurance Company. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company served on 9/5/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (McMickle, Scott)
October 16, 2018 MOTION REFERRED: #50 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer for Brian Dill. (thb)
October 16, 2018 Filing 52 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed on behalf of Joseph Best Acknowledgement filed by Lancer Insurance Company. (McMickle, Scott)
October 15, 2018 Filing 51 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lancer Insurance Company. Cooper-Global Chauffeured Transportation, Inc. waiver sent on 9/24/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (McMickle, Scott)
October 15, 2018 Filing 50 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer for Brian Dill by Lancer Insurance Company. Responses due by 10/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McMickle, Scott)
October 15, 2018 Filing 49 ANSWER to Complaint by Scott Armstrong.(Lowry, Stephen)
October 15, 2018 Filing 48 ANSWER to Complaint by Alan Cooling.(Lowry, Stephen)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #46 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Jessica Barnes answer due 11/1/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/15/2018. (thb)
October 12, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #46 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer for Jessica Barnes. (pts)
October 12, 2018 Filing 46 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer for Jessica Barnes by Lancer Insurance Company. Responses due by 10/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McMickle, Scott)
October 12, 2018 Filing 45 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.(Jackson, Kim)
October 4, 2018 Filing 44 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lancer Insurance Company. Tim Sheehy served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (McMickle, Scott)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #42 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Brian Dill answer due 10/18/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/04/2018. (thb)
October 3, 2018 MOTION REFERRED: #42 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, for Defendant Brian Hill. (thb)
October 3, 2018 Filing 42 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, for Defendant Brian Hill by Lancer Insurance Company. Responses due by 10/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McMickle, Scott) Modified on 10/3/2018 (thb).
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #39 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Georganna Gullia answer due 10/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/02/2018. (thb)
October 1, 2018 MOTION REFERRED: #39 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer for Defendant Georganna Gullia. (thb)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Jessica Barnes answer due 10/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/01/2018. (thb) Modified on 10/2/2018 (thb).
October 1, 2018 Filing 39 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer for Defendant Georganna Gullia by Lancer Insurance Company. Responses due by 10/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McMickle, Scott)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Scott Armstrong answer due 10/15/2018; Alan Cooling answer due 10/15/2018; Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company answer due 10/12/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 09/27/2018. (thb)
September 27, 2018 MOTION REFERRED: #37 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, for Defendant Jessica Barnes. (thb)
September 27, 2018 Filing 37 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, for Defendant Jessica Barnes by Lancer Insurance Company. Responses due by 10/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McMickle, Scott) Modified on 9/27/2018 (thb).
September 27, 2018 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kent Plowman, Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Kent Plowman. (Burbine, Jennifer)
September 27, 2018 Filing 35 ANSWER to Complaint by Kent Plowman.(Burbine, Jennifer)
September 25, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #34 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (pts)
September 25, 2018 Filing 34 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Responses due by 10/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Jackson, Kim)
September 25, 2018 Filing 33 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Jackson, Kim)
September 25, 2018 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lancer Insurance Company. Brian Dill served on 9/13/2018, answer due 10/4/2018. (McMickle, Scott)
September 25, 2018 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lancer Insurance Company. Kenny Strickler served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (McMickle, Scott) Modified on 9/26/2018 (thb).
September 25, 2018 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lancer Insurance Company. John Mason served on 9/14/2018, answer due 10/5/2018. (McMickle, Scott) Modified on 9/26/2018 (thb).
September 24, 2018 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lancer Insurance Company. Jessica Barnes served on 9/10/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (McMickle, Scott)
September 24, 2018 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lancer Insurance Company. John Mason served on 9/14/2018, answer due 10/5/2018. (McMickle, Scott)
September 24, 2018 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lancer Insurance Company. Kent Plowman served on 9/7/2018, answer due 9/28/2018. (McMickle, Scott)
September 24, 2018 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lancer Insurance Company. Georganna Gullia served on 9/12/2018, answer due 10/3/2018. (McMickle, Scott)
September 24, 2018 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lancer Insurance Company. Rick Tomcho served on 9/12/2018, answer due 10/3/2018. (McMickle, Scott)
September 24, 2018 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lancer Insurance Company. Stephen Farrar served on 9/11/2018, answer due 10/2/2018. (McMickle, Scott)
September 24, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Jessica Barnes answer due 10/1/2018. (thb)
September 24, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: John Mason answer due 10/5/2018. (thb)
September 24, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Kenny Strickler answer due 10/8/2018. (thb)
September 24, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Kent Plowman answer due 9/28/2018. (thb)
September 24, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Georganna Gullia answer due 10/3/2018. (thb)
September 24, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Rick Tomcho answer due 10/3/2018. (thb)
September 24, 2018 MOTION REFERRED: #12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment. (thb)
September 24, 2018 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lancer Insurance Company. Thomas Matthesen waiver sent on 9/12/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. (McMickle, Scott)
September 24, 2018 Filing 21 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, #4 Summons Issued, Acknowledgement filed by Lancer Insurance Company. (McMickle, Scott) Modified on 9/25/2018 (thb).
September 24, 2018 Filing 20 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, #4 Summons Issued, Acknowledgement filed by Lancer Insurance Company. (McMickle, Scott) Modified on 9/25/2018 (thb).
September 24, 2018 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Jessica Barnes on 9/10/2018, filed by Lancer Insurance Company. (McMickle, Scott)
September 24, 2018 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on John Mason on 9/14/2018, filed by Lancer Insurance Company. (McMickle, Scott)
September 24, 2018 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Kent Plowman on 9/7/2018, filed by Lancer Insurance Company. (McMickle, Scott)
September 24, 2018 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Georganna Gullia on 9/12/2018, filed by Lancer Insurance Company. (McMickle, Scott)
September 24, 2018 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Rick Tomcho on 9/12/2018, filed by Lancer Insurance Company. (McMickle, Scott)
September 24, 2018 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Stephen Farrar on 9/11/2018, filed by Lancer Insurance Company. (McMickle, Scott)
September 24, 2018 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Lancer Insurance Company. Responses due by 10/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(McMickle, Scott) Modified on 9/24/2018 (thb).
September 12, 2018 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Hennessy Transportation, Inc. (thb)
September 11, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Submitted (McMickle, Scott) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/12/2018: #1 Flatten Document) (thb).
August 29, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Alan Cooling, Kenny Strickler. (thb)
August 29, 2018 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Lancer Insurance Company. (McMickle, Scott)
August 29, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Submitted (McMickle, Scott)
August 28, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Stephen Farrar. (thb)
August 28, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Submitted. (McMickle, Scott) Modified on 8/28/2018 (thb).
August 28, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Scott Armstrong, Jessica Barnes, Joseph Best, Alan Cooling, Cooper-Global Chauffeured Transportation, Inc., Brian Dill, Georganna Gullia, Hennessy Transportation, Inc., Steven Hoppenbrouwer, Wesley Hudson, Jet Executive Limousine Service, Inc., John Mason, Thomas Matthesen, Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, Kent Plowman, Robin Raina, Sahil Raina, Tim Sheehy, Ray Shreyas, Kenny Strickler, Steven Taylor, Rick Tomcho, United States Liability Insurance Company. (thb)
August 28, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Submitted. (McMickle, Scott) Modified on 8/28/2018 (thb).
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 08/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Blank forms for new civil case filings) (thb)
August 27, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 113J-2436548. (thb)
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Scott Armstrong, Jessica Barnes, Joseph Best, Alan Cooling, Cooper-Global Chauffeured Transportation, Inc., Brian Dill, Stephen Farrar, Georganna Gullia, Hennessy Transportation, Inc., Steven Hoppenbrouwer, Wesley Hudson, Jet Executive Limousine Service, Inc., John Mason, Thomas Matthesen, Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, Kent Plowman, Robin Raina, Sahil Raina, Tim Sheehy, Ray Shreyas, Kenny Strickler, Steven Taylor, Rick Tomcho, United States Liability Insurance Company, filed by Lancer Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(thb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lancer Insurance Company v. Jet Executive Limousine Service, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Raina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent Plowman
Represented By: Jennifer R. Burbine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georganna Gullia
Represented By: Titus Thomas Nichols
Represented By: Barry Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Liability Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Hoppenbrouwer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jet Executive Limousine Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sahil Raina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Farrar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Cooling
Represented By: Alexander V. Salzillo
Represented By: Stephen G. Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hennessy Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Shreyas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Matthesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Tomcho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander V. Salzillo
Represented By: Stephen G. Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenny Strickler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Sheehy
Represented By: R. Sean McEvoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Kim M. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Dill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesley Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Best
Represented By: Peter A. Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper-Global Chauffeured Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: John Christopher Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lancer Insurance Company
Represented By: Scott W. McMickle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?