Joubert et al v. Hussain et al
Plaintiff: Demetris Stokes, Olga Maria Acevedo, Katherine Patten, Keton Hollingsworth and Jacqueline Joubert
Defendant: Victory Duncan, Lisa Childs, Zachary Hussain, Cheri Newman, Waylon Cawley, Harriet Coles, Michael Newman, Sondy Lawrence, Jim Hannah, Edna Awad, Tina Bland and Columbia County, Georgia
Case Number: 1:2018cv00147
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Augusta Office
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Filing 21 RESPONSE to #17 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Cheri Newman, Tina Bland, Sondy Lawrence, Jim Hannah, Zachary Hussain, Edna Awad, Lisa Childs, Harriet Coles, Victory Duncan, Michael Newman, Waylon Cawley filed by Olga Maria Acevedo, Keton Hollingsworth, Jacqueline Joubert, Katherine Patten, Demetris Stokes. (Rollins, Charles)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting Defendants' #18 Motion to Stay. The Court stays all discovery in this action pending resolution of the motion for judgment on the pleadings. Should any portion of the case remain after resolution of the motion, the parties shall submit a Rule 26(f) Report within seven days of the presiding District Judge's ruling. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/03/2018. (jlh) Modified on 10/3/2018 (jlh).
October 3, 2018 Filing 19 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Tina Bland. (Nelson, Frank)
October 1, 2018 MOTION REFERRED: #18 MOTION to Stay re #17 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. (jlh)
October 1, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Stay re #17 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Edna Awad, Tina Bland, Waylon Cawley, Lisa Childs, Harriet Coles, Victory Duncan, Jim Hannah, Zachary Hussain, Sondy Lawrence, Cheri Newman, Michael Newman. Responses due by 10/15/2018. (Nelson, Frank)
October 1, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Edna Awad, Tina Bland, Waylon Cawley, Lisa Childs, Harriet Coles, Victory Duncan, Jim Hannah, Zachary Hussain, Sondy Lawrence, Cheri Newman, Michael Newman. Responses due by 10/15/2018. (Nelson, Frank)
October 1, 2018 Filing 16 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Edna Awad, Waylon Cawley, Lisa Childs, Harriet Coles, Victory Duncan, Jim Hannah, Zachary Hussain, Sondy Lawrence, Cheri Newman, Michael Newman. (Nelson, Frank) Modified on 10/2/2018 (jlh).
October 1, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Interested Parties by Edna Awad, Tina Bland, Waylon Cawley, Lisa Childs, Harriet Coles, Victory Duncan, Jim Hannah, Zachary Hussain, Sondy Lawrence, Cheri Newman, Michael Newman (Nelson, Frank)
October 1, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Edna Awad, Tina Bland, Waylon Cawley, Lisa Childs, Harriet Coles, Victory Duncan, Jim Hannah, Zachary Hussain, Sondy Lawrence, Cheri Newman, Michael Newman.(Nelson, Frank)
October 1, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank Adam Nelson on behalf of Edna Awad, Tina Bland, Waylon Cawley, Lisa Childs, Harriet Coles, Victory Duncan, Jim Hannah, Zachary Hussain, Sondy Lawrence, Cheri Newman, Michael Newman (Nelson, Frank)
September 11, 2018 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Columbia County, Georgia waiver sent on 9/11/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. (Rollins, Charles) Modified on 9/19/2018 (jlh).
September 11, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Demetris Stokes, Jacqueline Joubert, Katherine Patten, Olga Maria Acevedo, Keton Hollingsworth. Edna Awad served on 9/10/2018, answer due 10/1/2018; Tina Bland served on 9/9/2018, answer due 10/1/2018; Waylon Cawley served on 9/9/2018, answer due 10/1/2018; Lisa Childs served on 9/10/2018, answer due 10/1/2018; Harriet Coles served on 9/9/2018, answer due 10/1/2018; Victory Duncan served on 9/9/2018, answer due 10/1/2018; Jim Hannah served on 9/10/2018, answer due 10/1/2018; Zachary Hussain served on 9/9/2018, answer due 10/1/2018; Sondy Lawrence served on 9/9/2018, answer due 10/1/2018; Cheri Newman served on 9/9/2018, answer due 10/1/2018; Michael Newman served on 9/9/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (Attachments: #1 Executed Summons, #2 Executed Summons, #3 Executed Summons, #4 Executed Summons, #5 Executed Summons, #6 Executed Summons, #7 Executed Summons, #8 Executed Summons, #9 Executed Summons, #10 Executed Summons)(Rollins, Charles)
September 7, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing by Keton Hollingsworth, Jacqueline Joubert, Katherine Patten, Demetris Stokes (Rollins, Charles)
September 7, 2018 Filing 9 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Olga Maria Acevedo. (Rollins, Charles)
September 7, 2018 Filing 8 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Keton Hollingsworth. (Rollins, Charles)
September 7, 2018 Filing 7 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Katherine Patten. (Rollins, Charles)
September 7, 2018 Filing 6 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Demetris Stokes. (Rollins, Charles)
September 7, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to all Defendants. (jlh)
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Olga Maria Acevedo, Keton Hollingsworth, Jacqueline Joubert, Katherine Patten, Demetris Stokes. (Rollins, Charles)
September 7, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing by Olga Maria Acevedo Exhibits G and K (Rollins, Charles)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 09/07/2018. (Attachments: #1 Blank Forms.) (jlh)
September 7, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 113J-2442479. (jlh)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all Defendants, filed by Demetris Stokes, Jacqueline Joubert, Katherine Patten, Olga Maria Acevedo, Keton Hollingsworth. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit L, #12 Exhibit M, and #13 Exhibit N.) (Exhibits G & K to be filed conventionally.)(jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joubert et al v. Hussain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victory Duncan
Represented By: Frank Adam Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Childs
Represented By: Frank Adam Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary Hussain
Represented By: Frank Adam Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheri Newman
Represented By: Frank Adam Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waylon Cawley
Represented By: Frank Adam Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harriet Coles
Represented By: Frank Adam Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Newman
Represented By: Frank Adam Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sondy Lawrence
Represented By: Frank Adam Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Hannah
Represented By: Frank Adam Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edna Awad
Represented By: Frank Adam Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Bland
Represented By: Frank Adam Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia County, Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetris Stokes
Represented By: Charles H. Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olga Maria Acevedo
Represented By: Charles H. Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Patten
Represented By: Charles H. Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keton Hollingsworth
Represented By: Charles H. Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Joubert
Represented By: Charles H. Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?