Loggins v. A.T.A.T

Plaintiff: Claire Loggins
Defendant: A.T.A.T
Case Number: 1:2018cv00174
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing service of the #7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/13/2018. (thb)
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff's #1 Complaint be dismissed and that this civil action be closed. Objections to R&R due by 11/30/2018 Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/13/2018. (thb)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER vacating #3 Report and Recommendations; granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/13/2018. (thb)
November 9, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Claire Loggins. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(maa)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing service of #3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/8/2018. (maa)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the #1 Complaint filed by Claire Loggins be DISMISSED without prejudice and this civil action be CLOSED. Objections to R&R due by 11/29/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/08/2018. (maa)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Fee Deficiency re #1 Complaint. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 10/30/2018. (thb)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A.T.A.T, filed by Claire Loggins.(thb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loggins v. A.T.A.T
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.T.A.T
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claire Loggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?