Johnson v. Hireright, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan Carl Alexander Johnson
Defendant: Hireright, Inc. and MAU Leasing, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00194
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: MAU Leasing, LLC answer due 1/11/2019. (pts)
December 21, 2018 Filing 12 Clerk's Extension ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendant MAU Leasing, LLC d/b/a MAU Workforce Solutions answer due 1/11/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 12/21/2018. (pts)
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Answer or Other Responsive Pleading in response to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Damages by MAU Leasing, LLC. Responses due by 1/4/2019. (Simpson, Matthew)
December 18, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Hireright, Inc. answer due 1/11/2019. (thb)
December 18, 2018 Filing 10 CLERK'S EXTENSION ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Hireright, Inc. answer due 1/11/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 12/18/2018. (thb) Modified on 12/18/2018 (thb). Modified on 12/18/2018 (thb).
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 Consent Motion for Clerks Extension of Time (LR 6.1) to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Hireright, Inc. Responses due by 12/31/2018. (Lott, Joshua) Modified on 12/18/2018 (thb).
December 10, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to MAU Leasing, LLC by Jonathan Carl Alexander Johnson. Answer due 12/28/2018. (Smith, Ian) Modified on 12/10/2018 (thb).
December 10, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Hireright, Inc. by Jonathan Carl Alexander Johnson. Answer due by 12/28/2018. (Smith, Ian) Modified on 12/10/2018 (thb).
November 16, 2018 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Jonathan Carl Alexander Johnson. (Smith, Ian)
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Jonathan Carl Alexander Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Disclosure Statement S.D. Ga. LR 7.1.1)(Smith, Ian)
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (pts)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 Blank Forms) (pts)
November 5, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 113J-2477347. (pts)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jonathan Carl Alexander Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Hireright, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hireright, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua M. Lott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAU Leasing, LLC
Represented By: Matthew R. Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Carl Alexander Johnson
Represented By: Ian Edward Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?