Swanson et al v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Michele D. Swanson and Brian D. Swanson
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2018cv00196
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Augusta Office
0 Judge: Brian K Epps
1 Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying as moot #10 Motion to Stay Answer Deadline; granting #11 Motion to Stay. This case is hereby stayed until the DOJ's funding is restored, and all pending deadlines in this matter, if any, are extended for the same number of days as the DOJ's lapse in funding. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 01/02/2019. (thb)
January 2, 2019 Motion No Longer Referred: #10 MOTION to Stay Answer Deadline in Light of Lapse of Appropriations. (jlh)
January 2, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay (due to lapse in appropriations) by United States of America. Responses due by 1/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Statkus, Shannon)
January 2, 2019 MOTION REFERRED: #10 MOTION to Stay Answer Deadline in Light of Lapse of Appropriations. (thb)
January 2, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay Answer Deadline in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by United States of America. Responses due by 1/16/2019. (Sholian, Margaret)
December 11, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian D. Swanson, Michele D. Swanson as to the United States of America. (thb)
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian D. Swanson, Michele D. Swanson as to the United States of America. (thb)
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian D. Swanson, Michele D. Swanson. United States of America served on 11/28/2018, answer due 1/27/2019. (thb)
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Brian D. Swanson, Michele D. Swanson. (thb)
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Brian D. Swanson, Michele D. Swanson. (thb)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER providing Plaintiffs with some basic instructions regarding the development and progression of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/8/2018. (pts)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/07/2018. (Attachments: #1 Blank Forms.) (jlh)
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to United States of America-Commissioner of Internal Revenue, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jlh)
November 7, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number AUG025144. (jlh)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America, filed by Brian D. Swanson, Michele D. Swanson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet.)(jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swanson et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele D. Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian D. Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Margaret Sholian
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?