Jones v. Poole et al
Plaintiff: Titus Jones
Defendant: Lisa A. Dozier and Shauna Poole
Case Number: 1:2018cv00206
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous by Shauna Poole. Responses due by 2/1/2019. (Jones, Craig)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous for failure to state a claim by Shauna Poole. Responses due by 1/30/2019. (Jones, Craig)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER notifying Plaintiff that he must serve Defendants within ninety days after the complaint was filed, and failure to do so may result in the dismissal of individual defendants or the entire case. Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). It Is Ordered that Plaintiff shall serve upon Defendants, or upon their attorney if appearance has been entered by counsel, a copy of every further pleading or other document submitted to the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/29/2018. (thb)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Blank forms for new civil case filings, #2 Receipt of Instructions) (thb)
November 28, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number AUG025228. (thb)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lisa A. Dozier, Shauna Poole, filed by Titus Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(thb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Poole et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa A. Dozier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shauna Poole
Represented By: Craig T. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Titus Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?