Fort Gordon Housing, LLC v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Fort Gordon Housing, LLC
Defendant: Percy Johnson and Patricia Johnson
Case Number: 1:2018cv00217
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Augusta Office
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1443(1) Rent, Lease & Ejectment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. This case stands closed. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 1/30/2019. (pts)
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Fort Gordon Housing, LLC (Hamilton, Daniel)
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fort Gordon Housing, LLC. Patricia Johnson served on 1/2/2019, answer due 1/23/2019. (Hamilton, Daniel)
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fort Gordon Housing, LLC. Percy Johnson served on 1/2/2019, answer due 1/23/2019. (Hamilton, Daniel)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 12/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Blank Forms.) (jlh)
December 18, 2018 Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number 113J-2503775. (jlh)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Patricia Johnson and Percy Johnson. (jlh)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Patricia Johnson and Percy Johnson, filed by Fort Gordon Housing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, and #4 Civil Cover Sheet.)(jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fort Gordon Housing, LLC v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Percy Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fort Gordon Housing, LLC
Represented By: Daniel W. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?