Fort Gordon Housing, LLC v. Russell
Plaintiff: Fort Gordon Housing, LLC
Defendant: Kyle Russell
Case Number: 1:2018cv00220
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Fort Gordon Housing, LLC (Hamilton, Daniel)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fort Gordon Housing, LLC. Kyle Russell served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019. (Hamilton, Daniel)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f)ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 12/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Blank forms for new civil case filings) (thb)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kyle Russell. (thb)
December 20, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 113J-2504873. (thb)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT/Dispossessory Affidavit against Kyle Russell, filed by Fort Gordon Housing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Resident Responsibility Agreement, #2 Exhibit - Notice to Cure Defendant and Demand for Possession, #3 Exhibit - Ledger, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(thb) Modified on 12/20/2018 (thb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fort Gordon Housing, LLC v. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fort Gordon Housing, LLC
Represented By: Daniel W. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?