Anderson v. Wilco Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Vanessa Anderson
Defendant: Wilco Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00008
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
0 Judge: Brian K Epps
1 Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE to Motion re #21 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Brief in support filed by Wilco Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Randy Greenwood)(Campbell, Elizabeth)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion to Stay. Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendant's #22 motion to dismiss is stayed until after the Court enters an Order on Plaintiff's motion to remand. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 03/08/2019. (thb)
March 5, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Stay deadline to respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss #22 or alternative motion for extension by Vanessa Anderson. Responses due by 3/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brigham, Leroy).
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #21 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Brief in support. Responses due by 3/11/2019. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 02/26/2019. (thb)
February 25, 2019 Motion No Longer Referred: #23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. (thb)
February 25, 2019 MOTION REFERRED: #23 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to 03/11/2019 for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. (thb)
February 22, 2019 Filing 23 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to 03/11/2019 for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, by Wilco Life Insurance Company. Responses due by 3/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Campbell, Elizabeth)
February 19, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Wilco Life Insurance Company. Responses due by 3/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anderson Policy)(Campbell, Elizabeth)
February 11, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Brief in support by Vanessa Anderson. Responses due by 2/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit policy)(Brigham, Leroy)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 2/5/2019. (cjc)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 2/5/2019. (cjc)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 2/5/2019. (cjc)
February 5, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Carl Scherz, Receipt Number 113J-2533360, Fee Amount $200, #16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Taylor Brinkman, Receipt Number 113J-2533358, Fee Amount $200, #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Anna K. Kinger, Receipt Number 113J-2533350, Fee Amount $200. (thb)
February 4, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Carl Scherz Receipt Number 113J-2533360, Fee Amount $200, by Wilco Life Insurance Company. Responses due by 2/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Campbell, Elizabeth)
February 4, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Taylor Brinkman Receipt Number 113J-2533358, Fee Amount $200, by Wilco Life Insurance Company. Responses due by 2/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Campbell, Elizabeth)
February 4, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Anna K. Kinger Receipt Number 113J-2533350, Fee Amount $200, by Wilco Life Insurance Company. Responses due by 2/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Campbell, Elizabeth)
January 28, 2019 Filing 14 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Vanessa Anderson. (McCallum, Charles)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Vanessa Anderson, and finding the requirements in Local Rule 83.4 have been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 1/24/2019. (cjc)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Vanessa Anderson, and finding the requirements in Local Rule 83.4 have been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 1/24/2019. (cjc)
January 23, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert Brent Irby, Receipt Number 113J-2525352, Fee Amount $200, #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Charles A. McCallum, III, Receipt Number 113J-2525345, Fee Amount $200. (thb)
January 23, 2019 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Vanessa Anderson. (Brigham, Leroy)
January 23, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert Brent Irby, Receipt Number 113J-2525352, Fee Amount $200, by Vanessa Anderson. Responses due by 2/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit certificate of good standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brigham, Leroy) Modified on 1/23/2019 (thb).
January 23, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Charles A. McCallum, III, Receipt Number 113J-2525345, Fee Amount $200, by Vanessa Anderson. Responses due by 2/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of good standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brigham, Leroy) Modified on 1/23/2019 (thb).
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Leroy Weathers Brigham on behalf of Vanessa Anderson (Brigham, Leroy)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re [1-1] Complaint. Wilco Life Insurance Company answer due 2/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 01/16/2019. (jlh)
January 15, 2019 MOTION REFERRED: #6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. (thb)
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Wilco Life Insurance Company. Responses due by 1/29/2019. (Campbell, Elizabeth)
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Wilco Life Insurance Company. (Campbell, Elizabeth)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth J. Campbell on behalf of Wilco Life Insurance Company (Campbell, Elizabeth)
January 14, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Wilco Life Insurance Company answer due 1/18/2019. Notice of Appearance due by 1/24/2019. (thb)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 Removal NOTICE to All Counsel of Record. (pts)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 1/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Blank Forms) (pts)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wilco Life Insurance Company from Superior Court of Columbia County, Georgia, case number 2018ECV0446. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113J-2517310). (Attachments: #1 Superior Court Filings, Complaint, Exhibits, Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(pts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Wilco Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilco Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Campbell
Represented By: Taylor F. Brinkman
Represented By: Anna K. Finger
Represented By: Carl C. Scherz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Anderson
Represented By: Leroy Weathers Brigham
Represented By: Charles A. McCallum, III
Represented By: R. Brent Irby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?