Fort Gordon Housing, LLC v. Ranaldson et al
Plaintiff: Fort Gordon Housing, LLC
Defendant: Tyianna Dixon, Deaudis Dixon, Derrick Ranaldson and Larissa Ranaldson
Case Number: 1:2019cv00009
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Augusta Office
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1443(1) Rent, Lease & Ejectment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 02/13/2019. (jlh)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Fort Gordon Housing, LLC. (Hamilton, Daniel) Modified on 2/12/2019 (jlh).
January 28, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Deaudis Dixon answer due 2/13/2019; Tyianna Dixon answer due 2/13/2019; Derrick Ranaldson answer due 2/13/2019; Larissa Ranaldson answer due 2/13/2019. (jlh)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons Defendants served on Raynecia Myers on January 23, 2019, filed by Fort Gordon Housing, LLC. (Hamilton, Daniel)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 01/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Blank Forms.) (jlh)
January 16, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 113J-2520486. (jlh)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to all Defendants. (jlh)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all Defendants, filed by Fort Gordon Housing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Resident Responsibility Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Notice to Cure Default and Demand for Possession, #3 Exhibit C - Ledger, and #4 Civil Cover Sheet.)(jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fort Gordon Housing, LLC v. Ranaldson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyianna Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deaudis Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derrick Ranaldson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larissa Ranaldson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fort Gordon Housing, LLC
Represented By: Daniel W. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?