Fort Gordon Housing, LLC v. Kraemer
Plaintiff: Fort Gordon Housing, LLC
Defendant: Eugene Kraemer
Case Number: 1:2019cv00020
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 3/13/2019. (pts)
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Fort Gordon Housing, LLC (Hamilton, Daniel)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fort Gordon Housing, LLC. Eugene Kraemer served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (Hamilton, Daniel)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Eugene Kraemer. (pts)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Submitted (Hamilton, Daniel)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 2/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Blank Forms) (pts)
February 12, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 113J-2539996. (pts)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 Dispossessory Affidavit against Eugene Kraemer, filed by Fort Gordon Housing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lease Agreement and Default Notice, #2 Exhibit Ledger, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(pts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fort Gordon Housing, LLC v. Kraemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Kraemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fort Gordon Housing, LLC
Represented By: Daniel W. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?