Fort Gordon Housing, LLC v. Walton
Plaintiff: Fort Gordon Housing, LLC
Defendant: Alexander Walton
Case Number: 1:2019cv00021
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Augusta Office
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. This case stands closed. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 3/14/2019. (pts)
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Fort Gordon Housing, LLC (Hamilton, Daniel)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fort Gordon Housing, LLC. Alexander Walton served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (Hamilton, Daniel)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Alexander Walton. (maa)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Submitted (Hamilton, Daniel)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 02/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Blank Forms.) (jlh)
February 12, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 113J-2540128. (jlh)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alexander Walton, filed by Fort Gordon Housing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Resident Responsibility Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Default Letter, #3 Exhibit C - Ledger, and #4 Civil Cover Sheet.) (jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fort Gordon Housing, LLC v. Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fort Gordon Housing, LLC
Represented By: Daniel W. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?