Gilliard v. Ditech Financial, LLC
Plaintiff: Brenda Gilliard
Defendant: Ditech Financial, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00041
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Augusta Office
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs and fees except as otherwise agreed. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 04/01/2019. (maa)
March 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Brenda Gilliard (Rhodes, Joseph)
March 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph T. Rhodes on behalf of Brenda Gilliard (Rhodes, Joseph)
March 19, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines. (maa)
March 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines by Ditech Financial, LLC. Responses due by 4/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Briefs Memo in Support of the Motion to Stay Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines)(Tate, William)
March 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Ditech Financial, LLC. Responses due by 4/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Briefs Memo in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit)(Tate, William)
March 18, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Ditech Financial, LLC answer due 3/25/2019. (jlh)
March 18, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance re #3 Notice due by 3/28/2019. (jlh)
March 18, 2019 Filing 3 REMOVAL NOTICE to All Counsel of Record re #1 Notice of Removal. (jlh)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 03/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Blank Forms.) (jlh) Modified on 3/19/2019 (jlh).
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ditech Financial, LLC from Superior Court of Richmond County, Georgia, case number 2018RCCV142, filed by Ditech Financial, LLC. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 113J-2562824) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint (Exs A, B, C), Summons, Coversheet, Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Preliminary and Interlocutory Injunction and Brief in Support, Standing Order for Mediation in Civil Cases, Order Granting Preliminary Injunction, Special Appearance Motion to Dissolve Order Granting Preliminary Injunction, Consent Order Dissolving Preliminary Injunction, and #2 Civil Cover Sheet.)(jlh) Modified on 3/18/2019 (jlh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilliard v. Ditech Financial, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Gilliard
Represented By: Joseph T. Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ditech Financial, LLC
Represented By: William Oxford Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?