Southside Imports, Inc. et al v. Nissan North America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Wallace M. Watson and Southside Imports, Inc.
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00050
Filed: March 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Augusta Office
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to File AMENDED COMPLAINT by Southside Imports, Inc., Wallace M. Watson. Responses due by 7/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint)(Bissell, W.)
July 1, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Barton on behalf of Nissan North America, Inc. ADDED Motion to Substitute Attorney. (Barton, Eric) Modified on 7/2/2019 (pts).
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Consent PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 6/27/2019. (pts)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/15/2019. Fact Discovery due 10/03/2019. Expert Discovery due by 1/21/2020. Motions due by 2/21/2020. Expert Witness Report for party bearing the burden of proof due by 11/4/2019. Rebuttal Expert Witness Report for the party without the burden of proof due by 12/4/2019. Status Report due by 1/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 6/27/2019. (pts)
June 24, 2019 Filing 23 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER ON CONFIDENTIALITY OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS)(Bissell, W.)
May 17, 2019 Filing 22 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Schillinger, Caleb)
May 16, 2019 Filing 21 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Schillinger, Caleb)
May 16, 2019 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nissan North America, Inc. identifying Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. as Corporate Parent.. (Schillinger, Caleb)
May 16, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint by Nissan North America, Inc..(Schillinger, Caleb)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; and #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 5/14/2019. (cjc)
May 13, 2019 MOTION REFERRED: #17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Receipt Number 113J-2600633, Fee Amount $200; #16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Receipt Number 113J-2600631, Fee Amount $200; #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Receipt Number 113J-2600624, Fee Amount $200. (thb)
May 10, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Receipt Number 113J-2600633, Fee Amount $200, by Nissan North America, Inc. Responses due by 5/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Hart, Daniel) Modified on 5/13/2019 (thb).
May 10, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Receipt Number 113J-2600631, Fee Amount $200, by Nissan North America, Inc. Responses due by 5/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Hart, Daniel) Modified on 5/13/2019 (thb).
May 10, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Receipt Number 113J-2600624, Fee Amount $200, by Nissan North America, Inc. Responses due by 5/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Hart, Daniel) Modified on 5/13/2019 (thb).
May 1, 2019 Filing 14 Clerk's Extension ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Nissan North America, Inc. answer due 5/16/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/1/2019. (pts)
May 1, 2019 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Nissan North America, Inc.. Responses due by 5/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hart, Daniel)
April 16, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Nissan North America, Inc. answer due 5/2/2019. (pts)
April 16, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Southside Imports, Inc.. All Plaintiffs. (Harvey, John)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 4/12/2019. (cjc)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 4/12/2019. (cjc)
April 12, 2019 Filing 9 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Southside Imports, Inc., Wallace M. Watson. (Harvey, John)
April 9, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Receipt Number 113J-2578618, Fee Amount $200; #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Receipt Number 113J-2578631, Fee Amount $200. (thb)
April 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing by Southside Imports, Inc., Wallace M. Watson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Harvey, John)
April 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number 113J-2578631, Fee Amount $200, by Southside Imports, Inc., Wallace M. Watson. Responses due by 4/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Harvey, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/9/2019: #2 Correct Application For Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (thb).
April 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing by Southside Imports, Inc., Wallace M. Watson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Harvey, John)
April 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number 113J-2578618, Fee Amount $200, by Southside Imports, Inc., Wallace M. Watson. Responses due by 4/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Harvey, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/9/2019: #2 Correct Application For Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (thb).
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 04/01/2019. (Attachments: #1 Blank Forms.) (jlh)
April 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Nissan North America, Inc. (jlh)
March 29, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 113J-2571863. (pts)
March 29, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Southside Imports, Inc. and Wallace M. Watson. (jlh)
March 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nissan North America, Inc., filed by Wallace M. Watson and Southside Imports, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, and #2 Civil Cover Sheet.)(jlh) Modified on 4/1/2019 (jlh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southside Imports, Inc. et al v. Nissan North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wallace M. Watson
Represented By: John D. Harvey
Represented By: Richard N. Sox, Jr.
Represented By: W. Kirby Bissell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southside Imports, Inc.
Represented By: John D. Harvey
Represented By: Richard N. Sox, Jr.
Represented By: W. Kirby Bissell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel P. Hart
Represented By: Caleb J. Schillinger
Represented By: Katherine R. Moskop
Represented By: Eric Barton
Represented By: Brandon L. Bigelow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?