Pix International, LLC v. Metro Spirit, Inc.
Plaintiff: Pix International, LLC
Defendant: Metro Spirit, Inc. and The Metropolitan Spirit, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00059
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Augusta Office
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pix International, LLC. The Metropolitan Spirit, Inc. served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/27/2019. (Rothman, Joel)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER upon #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Pix International, LLC, it is ordered that Plaintiff's claims against Metro Spirit, Inc. are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 05/02/2019. (jlh) Modified on 5/2/2019 (jlh).
May 2, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to The Metropolitan Spirit, Inc. (jlh)
May 2, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Submitted (Rothman, Joel)
May 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Pix International, LLC (Rothman, Joel)
May 1, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against The Metropolitan Spirit, Inc., filed by Pix International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Demand Letters)(Rothman, Joel)
April 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pix International, LLC. Metro Spirit, Inc. served on 4/19/2019, answer due 5/10/2019. (Rothman, Joel)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 04/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Blank Forms.) (jlh)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Metro Spirit, Inc. (jlh)
April 11, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 113J-2580850. (jlh)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Persons pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Pix International, LLC. (jlh)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Metro Spirit, Inc., filed by Pix International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Demand Letters, and #4 Civil Cover Sheet.)(jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pix International, LLC v. Metro Spirit, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pix International, LLC
Represented By: Joel Benjamin Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro Spirit, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Metropolitan Spirit, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?