Fort Gordon Housing, LLC v. Brooks
Plaintiff: Fort Gordon Housing, LLC
Defendant: Lakita Brooks
Case Number: 1:2019cv00060
Filed: April 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Augusta Office
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1443(1) Rent, Lease & Ejectment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING CASE re #3 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. This matter is dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate all motions, if any, and close this case. Each party shall bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 05/29/2019. (thb)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Fort Gordon Housing, LLC (Hamilton, Daniel)
April 19, 2019 Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number 113J-2586320. (jlh)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 04/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Blank Forms) (jlh)
April 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lakita Brooks, filed by Fort Gordon Housing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Lease Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Demand Letter, #3 Exhibit C - Ledger, and #4 Civil Cover Sheet.) (jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fort Gordon Housing, LLC v. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakita Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fort Gordon Housing, LLC
Represented By: Daniel W. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?