Jordan v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Daniel Taylor Jordan
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Not Yet Classified: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv00069
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Heath Statkus on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill (Statkus, Shannon)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 5-24-2019. (cjc)
May 24, 2019 PRO HAC VICE PAID by Kipler Scott Lamar for Daniel Taylor Jordan: Amount 200.00, Receipt # AUG026190, Date: 05/24/2019. (jlh)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave for W. Daniel Mayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Fee Amount $200.00, by Daniel Taylor Jordan. Responses due by 6/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, and #2 Certificate of Good Standing.)REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(jlh)
May 14, 2019 Filing fee: $400, receipt number 113J-2602816. (maa)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (maa)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by Daniel Taylor Jordan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(maa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Taylor Jordan
Represented By: Kipler Scott Lamar
Represented By: W. Daniel Mayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?