Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Southbound Smokehouse, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., Velvet Apple Music, Post Oak Publishing, SONY/ATV Songs, LLC and Dynatone Publishing Company
Defendant: Southbound Smokehouse, LLC and Brian Brittingham
Case Number: 1:2019cv00087
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 16 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Brian Brittingham. (Johnston, Wendell)
July 2, 2019 Filing 15 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Southbound Smokehouse, LLC. (Johnston, Wendell)
July 2, 2019 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Brian Brittingham. (Johnston, Wendell)
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Brian Brittingham.(Johnston, Wendell)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Southbound Smokehouse, LLC. (Johnston, Wendell)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE filed by Southbound Smokehouse, LLC. (Johnston, Wendell)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Post Oak Publishing, Broadcast Music, Inc., Dynatone Publishing Company, Velvet Apple Music, SONY/ATV Songs, LLC. Southbound Smokehouse, LLC served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Covington, Troy)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Post Oak Publishing, Broadcast Music, Inc., Dynatone Publishing Company, Velvet Apple Music, SONY/ATV Songs, LLC. Brian Brittingham served on 6/22/2019, answer due 7/13/2019. (Covington, Troy)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties by Broadcast Music, Inc., Dynatone Publishing Company, Post Oak Publishing, SONY/ATV Songs, LLC, Velvet Apple Music and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Covington, Troy)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Broadcast Music, Inc., Dynatone Publishing Company, Post Oak Publishing, SONY/ATV Songs, LLC, Velvet Apple Music. (Covington, Troy)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to Register of Copyrights. (pts)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (pts)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 6/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Blank Forms) (pts)
June 14, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 113J-2623411. (pts)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Post Oak Publishing, Broadcast Music, Inc., Dynatone Publishing Company, Velvet Apple Music, SONY/ATV Songs, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Schedule, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(pts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Southbound Smokehouse, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Troy R. Covington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Velvet Apple Music
Represented By: Troy R. Covington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Post Oak Publishing
Represented By: Troy R. Covington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SONY/ATV Songs, LLC
Represented By: Troy R. Covington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dynatone Publishing Company
Represented By: Troy R. Covington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southbound Smokehouse, LLC
Represented By: Wendell E. Johnston, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Brittingham
Represented By: Wendell E. Johnston, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?