Renasant Bank v. Goodman Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Renasant Bank
Defendant: Halana Goodman, Steven Goodman, Good Bakery, LLC and Goodman Management, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00101
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Renasant Bank. (Austin, Thomas)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Good Bakery, LLC, Halana Goodman, Steven Goodman, Goodman Management, LLC. (Clark, Christopher)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by Good Bakery, LLC, Halana Goodman, Steven Goodman, Goodman Management, LLC.(Clark, Christopher)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Troy Clark on behalf of All Defendants (Clark, Christopher)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Renasant Bank. Steven Goodman served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Austin, Thomas)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Renasant Bank. Halana Goodman served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Austin, Thomas)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Renasant Bank. Good Bakery, LLC served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Austin, Thomas)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Renasant Bank. Goodman Management, LLC served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Austin, Thomas)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Good Bakery, LLC, Halana Goodman, Steven Goodman, Goodman Management, LLC. (maa)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 07/03/2019. (maa)
July 3, 2019 Filing fee: $400, receipt number 113J-2634910. (maa)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Renasant Bank. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(maa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Renasant Bank v. Goodman Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halana Goodman
Represented By: Christopher Troy Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Goodman
Represented By: Christopher Troy Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Good Bakery, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Troy Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodman Management, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Troy Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renasant Bank
Represented By: Thomas E. Austin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?