Luckett v. Hutchins et al
Plaintiff: Jabari Luckett
Defendant: Clark Hiebert and Gary Hutchins
Case Number: 1:2019cv00103
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered in accordance with #9 Order. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 08/26/2019. (maa)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ADOPTING #5 Report and Recommendations, OVERRULING Plaintiff's objections, DISMISSING this case and CLOSING this civil action. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 08/26/2019. (maa)
July 30, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 8/13/2019. (maa)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #7 Objection to Report and Recommendations. (maa)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 OBJECTION to #5 Report and Recommendations by Jabari Luckett. (Document Restricted) (maa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/30/2019: #1 Corrected Document) (maa). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/12/2019: #2 Signed Copy) (maa).
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing service of #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 07/16/2019. (maa)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the #1 Complaint filed by Jabari Luckett be DISMISSED and this civil action be CLOSED. Objections to R&R due by 8/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 07/16/2019. (maa)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 07/16/2019. (maa)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 07/15/2019. (maa)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jabari Luckett. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(maa)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Clark Hiebert, Gary Hutchins, filed by Jabari Luckett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(maa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luckett v. Hutchins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark Hiebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jabari Luckett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?