Ivy v. United States of America
Petitioner: Gregory D. Ivy
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00134
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the Clerk to update Petitioner's address on the docket and serve Petitioner with a copy #2 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 09/06/2019. (thb) Modified on 9/6/2019 (thb).
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Gregory D. Ivy. (pts)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall serve the United States Attorney with this Order and a copy of the #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255). The Court directs Respondent to file an answer within sixty days of the date of this Order. Compliance due by 10/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 08/27/2019. (thb)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 (Nunc Pro Tunc to 07/15/2019) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Gregory D. Ivy.(thb) Modified on 8/22/2019 (thb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ivy v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gregory D. Ivy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Nancy Colleen Greenwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?