Raykovitz v. Electrical Builders, Inc.
Plaintiff: Frank Raykovitz
Defendant: Electrical Builders, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00137
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION or Alternatively, Motion to Transfer filed by Frank Raykovitz. (Jones, Taylor)
October 17, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #20 MOTION to Dismiss, or Alternatively, Motion to Transfer Venue. Responses due by 10/18/2019. (jlh)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting parties Joint #23 Stipulation construed as a Consent Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall have through and including Friday, October 18, 2019 to respond to Defendant's motion. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 10/17/2019. (jlh) Modified on 10/17/2019 (jlh).
October 16, 2019 Filing 23 STIPULATION re #20 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION or Alternatively, Motion to Transfer Deadline to Respond by Frank Raykovitz. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Taylor)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/3/2019. (cjc)
October 2, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Electrical Builders, Inc. identifying n/a as Corporate Parent. (Adler, Bradley) Modified on 10/3/2019 (jlh).
October 2, 2019 MOTION REFERRED: #19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Anne T. Regan. (jlh)
October 2, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION or Alternatively, Motion to Transfer by Electrical Builders, Inc. Responses due by 10/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Jessica Netter Ducharme, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration - Employment Agreement, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration - 2018-2019 Time Sheets, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration - 2018-2019 Pay Stubs, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration - Non-Compete Agreement, #6 Text of Proposed Order to Transfer)(Adler, Bradley) Modified on 10/21/2019 (jlh).
October 2, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Anne T. Regan Receipt Number 113J-2697009, Fee Amount $200, by Electrical Builders, Inc.. Responses due by 10/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adler, Bradley)
September 30, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley T. Adler on behalf of Electrical Builders, Inc. (Adler, Bradley)
September 26, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing by Frank Raykovitz of Filing Notice of Consent (Jones, Taylor)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Electrical Builders, Inc. answer due 10/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 09/17/2019. (thb)
September 17, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (maa)
September 17, 2019 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Frank Raykovitz. Responses due by 10/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dunlap, Andrew)
August 29, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Electrical Builders, Inc. answer due 9/17/2019. (jlh)
August 28, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Alisha Smith on August 27, 2019, filed by Frank Raykovitz. (Lanier, Troy)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice and #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 8/28/2019. (cjc)
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Certificate of Good Standing by Frank Raykovitz re #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Taylor A. Jones Receipt Number 113J-2671540, Fee Amount $200. (Lanier, Troy) Modified on 8/28/2019 (jlh).
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Supplement to Motion by Frank Raykovitz re #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrew W. Dunlap Receipt Number 113J-2671533, Fee Amount $200. (Lanier, Troy) Modified on 8/28/2019 (jlh).
August 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Certificate of Good Standing by Frank Raykovitz re #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrew W. Dunlap Receipt Number 113J-2671533, Fee Amount $200. (Lanier, Troy) Modified on 8/28/2019 (jlh).
August 26, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrew W. Dunlap; #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Taylor A. Jones. (jlh)
August 26, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance re #7 and #8 Notices due by 8/28/2019. (jlh)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Taylor A. Jones. (jlh)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrew W. Dunlap. (jlh)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Taylor A. Jones Receipt Number 113J-2671540, Fee Amount $200, by Frank Raykovitz. Responses due by 9/6/2019. (Lanier, Troy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2019: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Supplement to Pro Hac Vice Motion) (jlh).
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrew W. Dunlap Receipt Number 113J-2671533, Fee Amount $200, by Frank Raykovitz. Responses due by 9/6/2019. (Lanier, Troy)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Frank Raykovitz. (Lanier, Troy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/23/2019: #1 Corrected Disclosure Statement) (jlh).
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Electrical Builders, Inc. (pts)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 8/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Forms) (pts)
August 22, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 113J-2670528. (pts)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Electrical Builders, Inc., filed by Frank Raykovitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(pts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raykovitz v. Electrical Builders, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrical Builders, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley T. Adler
Represented By: Anne T. Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Raykovitz
Represented By: Troy A. Lanier
Represented By: Andrew W. Dunlap
Represented By: Taylor A. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?