Mays v. Joseph
Plaintiff: Ryan Alexander Mays
Defendant: Warden Evan Joseph
Case Number: 1:2019cv00215
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Filing fee payment received, Amount $2.50, Receipt AUG027473. (jlh)
January 17, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance re #8 Order is due by 2/16/2020. (jlh)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Ryan Alexander Mays. The Court Orders Plaintiff to pay an initial filing fee of $2.50 within 30 days of the date of this Order. Compliance due by 2/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 01/17/2020. (maa)
January 17, 2020 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Ryan Alexander Mays. (pts)
January 17, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT by Prisoner Ryan Alexander Mays to collection of fees. (pts)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. PLRA due by 1/18/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 12/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 PLRA Forms.) (jlh) Modified on 12/19/2019 (jlh).
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Ryan Alexander Mays. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(pts)
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 Inmate Account Statement by Ryan Alexander Mays. (pts)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ryan Alexander Mays. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(pts) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/17/2019: #1 Correct PDF) (pts).
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Evan Joseph, filed by Ryan Alexander Mays.(pts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mays v. Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Alexander Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Evan Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?