Hagler Systems, Inc. et al v. Hagler Group Global, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Hagler Systems, Inc., David R. Hagler, Sr. and Robert S. Hagler, Sr.
Defendant: Benjamin L. Hagler, Sr., Hagler Group Global, LLC, Lee Henry and Benjamin L. Hagler, Jr.
Special Master: Honorable Brian K. Epps
Case Number: 1:2020cv00026
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Augusta Office
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Filing 66 RESPONSE to Motion re #55 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint filed by Benjamin L. Hagler, Jr, Benjamin L. Hagler, Sr, Hagler Group Global, LLC, Lee Henry. (Tucker, Thomas)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #64 Motion to Seal Documents 62 Response, 63 Notice of Filing. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 04/14/2020. (thb)
April 13, 2020 Filing 64 MOTION to Seal Document 62 Response, 63 Notice of Filing, by Benjamin L. Hagler, Sr, Hagler Group Global, LLC, Lee Henry. Responses due by 4/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tucker, Thomas)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #60 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #55 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint. Responses due by 4/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 04/02/2020. (thb)
April 2, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #60 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #55 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint. (thb)
April 2, 2020 Filing 60 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #55 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Benjamin L. Hagler, Jr, Benjamin L. Hagler, Sr, Hagler Group Global, LLC, Lee Henry. Responses due by 4/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tucker, Thomas)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #33 Motion to Seal Document re 32 MOTION for Sanctions Spoliation Sanctions and Contempt. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 3/30/2020. (pts)
March 30, 2020 Filing 58 RESPONSE filed by Benjamin L. Hagler, Jr, Benjamin L. Hagler, Sr, Hagler Group Global, LLC, Lee Henry. (Tucker, Thomas)
March 26, 2020 Filing 57 RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 MOTION to Dismiss with Included Memorandum of Law filed by David R. Hagler, Sr, Robert S. Hagler, Sr, Hagler Systems, Inc.. (Price, John)
March 25, 2020 Filing 56 CLERK'S EXTENSION ORDER granting #54 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 32 MOTION for Spoliation Sanctions and Contempt. Responses due by 4/10/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 03/25/2020. (thb)
March 24, 2020 Filing 55 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by David R. Hagler, Sr, Robert S. Hagler, Sr, Hagler Systems, Inc.. Responses due by 4/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Adams, Samuel) Modified on 3/25/2020 (pts).
March 24, 2020 Filing 54 MOTION for Extension of Time to 4/10/20 , by Benjamin L. Hagler, Jr, Benjamin L. Hagler, Sr, Hagler Group Global, LLC, Lee Henry. Responses due by 4/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Consent Order for Extension)(Tucker, Thomas)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER setting Mediation for March 25, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. Confidential Mediation statements due by March 24, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 03/23/2020. (jlh)
March 20, 2020 Filing 52 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps: Status Conference by telephone held on 3/20/2020. Mediation scheduled for Wednesday, March 25 at 9:00 a.m. Parties discussed potential solutions for return of electronic devices. (cjc)
March 19, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference Proceedings held on 3/17/2020, before Judge JRH. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Davenport, Telephone number 706-823-6468. Tape Number: FTR. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. (Transcript Redaction Policy Issued or Click here to view <) Redaction Request due 4/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/19/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/17/2020. (Davenport, Lisa)
March 19, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE of Intent to File Reply Brief by Benjamin L. Hagler, Jr, Benjamin L. Hagler, Sr, Hagler Group Global, LLC, Lee Henry. (Tucker, Thomas)
March 18, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE of Hearing by telephone: Status Conference by telephone set for 3/20/2020 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps. Please dial 877-336-1829, enter code 5508163 and enter password 0026 to access the teleconference. (cjc)
March 18, 2020 Filing 48 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps: Status Conference by telephone held on 3/18/2020. Parties to report back on Friday, March 20, 2020 regarding interest in mediationand/or stay of litigation, status of returning electronic devices, and terms governing same (Court Reporter FTR.) (cjc)
March 18, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Hearing by telephone: Status Conference by telephone set for 3/18/2020 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps. Please dial 877-336-1829, enter code 5508163 and enter password 0026 to access the teleconference.
March 17, 2020 Filing 46 PLAINTIFF EXHIBITS 1 - 9 by Hagler Systems, Inc. (Document Sealed). (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff Exhibit 2, #2 Plaintiff Exhibit 3, #3 Plaintff Exhibit 4, #4 Plaintiff Exhibit 5, #5 Plaintiff Exhibit 6, #6 Plaintiff Exhibit 7, #7 Plaintiff Exhibits 8 & 9)(lcw)
March 17, 2020 Filing 45 DEFENDANT EXHIBITS 1 - 6 by Hagler Group Global, LLC. (Attachments: #1Def Exhibit 2, #2Def Exhibit 3, #3 Def Exhibit 4, #4Def Exhibit 5, #5Def Exhibit 6)(lcw) Modified on 3/17/2020 (lcw).
March 17, 2020 Filing 44 Exhibit List by Hagler Group Global, LLC.(lcw)
March 17, 2020 Filing 43 Exhibit List by Hagler Systems, Inc. (lcw)
March 17, 2020 Filing 42 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge J. Randal Hall: Motion Hearing held on 3/17/2020 re #3 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by David R. Hagler, Sr., Hagler Systems, Inc., Robert S. Hagler, Sr. (Court Reporter Lisa Davenport.) (lcw)
March 17, 2020 Filing 40 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Benjamin L. Hagler, Jr, Benjamin L. Hagler, Sr, Hagler Group Global, LLC, Lee Henry. (Tucker, Thomas)
March 16, 2020 Filing 39 RESPONSE to #35 Response filed by Lee Henry, Benjamin L. Hagler, Jr., Benjamin L. Hagler, Sr., Hagler Group Global, LLC filed by David R. Hagler, Sr, Robert S. Hagler, Sr, Hagler Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit)(Caison, Robert)
March 16, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Filing by David R. Hagler, Sr, Robert S. Hagler, Sr, Hagler Systems, Inc. re #37 Brief in Support/Opposition of Motion,, Corrected Exhibit 9 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Adams, Samuel)
March 16, 2020 Filing 37 Brief in Support re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Supplemental Brief filed by David R. Hagler, Sr, Robert S. Hagler, Sr, Hagler Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit)(Adams, Samuel)
March 16, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Filing by Benjamin L. Hagler, Jr, Benjamin L. Hagler, Sr, Hagler Group Global, LLC, Lee Henry re #35 Response (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin L. Hagler, #2 Declaration of R. Wayne Peters)(Long, John)
March 16, 2020 Filing 35 RESPONSE filed by Benjamin L. Hagler, Jr, Benjamin L. Hagler, Sr, Hagler Group Global, LLC, Lee Henry. (Long, John)
March 13, 2020 Filing 41 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge J. Randal Hall: Motion Hearing held on 3/13/2020 re #3 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by David R. Hagler, Sr., Hagler Systems, Inc., Robert S. Hagler, Sr. (Court Reporter Lisa Davenport.) (lcw)
March 13, 2020 Filing 34 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by David R. Hagler, Sr, Robert S. Hagler, Sr, Hagler Systems, Inc. (Adams, Samuel) Modified on 3/13/2020 (jlh).
March 13, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION to Seal Document 32 MOTION for Sanctions Spoliation Sanctions and Contempt by David R. Hagler, Sr, Robert S. Hagler, Sr, Hagler Systems, Inc.. Responses due by 3/27/2020. (Hagler, Robert)
March 12, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss with Included Memorandum of Law by Benjamin L. Hagler, Jr, Benjamin L. Hagler, Sr, Hagler Group Global, LLC, Lee Henry. Responses due by 3/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Tucker, Thomas) Modified on 3/13/2020 (jlh).
March 12, 2020 Filing 30 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps: Discovery Hearing held on 3/12/2020 regarding alleged waiver of attorney client privilege. All parties to submit briefing by Monday, March 16, 2020. Defendants to submit documents at issue for in camera inspection by the same deadline. (Court Reporter FTR.) (cjc)
March 12, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Hearing: Discovery Hearing set for 3/12/2020 at 03:00 PM in Augusta - 1st Floor before Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps. (cjc)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 PROTECTIVE ORDER Regarding Confidential Information granting #27 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 03/12/2020. (thb)
March 11, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #27 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (cmr)
March 11, 2020 Filing 27 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by David R. Hagler, Sr, Robert S. Hagler, Sr, Hagler Systems, Inc.. Responses due by 3/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Protective Order)(Hagler, Robert)
March 10, 2020 Filing 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps: Status Conference held on 3/10/2020. Parties discussed status of discovery and agree to proceed with hearing Friday, March 13, 2020, and to a continuation of the hearing, if deemed necessary by Judge Hall, on Thursday, March 19 and Friday, March 20, 2020. (Court Reporter FTR.) (cjc)
March 10, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by John B. Long on behalf of All Defendants (Long, John)
March 10, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 3/10/2020 at 03:30 PM in Augusta - 1st Floor before Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps. (cjc)
March 9, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Intent to File Reply by David R. Hagler, Sr, Robert S. Hagler, Sr, Hagler Systems, Inc. re #19 Response. (Hagler, Robert)
March 9, 2020 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps: Discovery Hearing by telephone held on 3/9/2020. Parties discussed time line for defense production of documents. (Court Reporter FTR.) (cjc)
March 6, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Hearing: Discovery Hearing by Telephone set for 3/9/2020 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps. Please dial 877-336-1829, enter code 5508163 and enter password 0026 to access the teleconference.(maa)
March 5, 2020 Filing 20 DECLARATION re #19 Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Benjamin L. Hagler, Jr, Benjamin L. Hagler, Sr, Hagler Group Global, LLC, Lee Henry. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin L. Hagler, Sr., #2 Declaration of Benjamin L. Hagler, Jr., #3 Declaration of Lee Henry, #4 Declaration of Wayne Peters)(Tucker, Thomas)
March 5, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE filed by Benjamin L. Hagler, Jr, Benjamin L. Hagler, Sr, Hagler Group Global, LLC, Lee Henry. (Tucker, Thomas)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that the expiration of the #7 TRO is extended to Friday, March 13, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 03/02/2020. (thb)
February 27, 2020 Filing 17 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #7 Order on Motion for TRO,, #1 Complaint, #4 Emergency MOTION to Expedite DiscoveryEmergency MOTION for Hearing re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on an Expedited Basis, #5 Notice of Interested Parties, #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Acknowledgement filed by David R. Hagler, Sr, Robert S. Hagler, Sr, Hagler Systems, Inc.. (Hagler, Robert)
February 27, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Verified Complaint, Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Expedite Discovery served on Benjamin L Hagler, Jr on 02/20/2020, filed by Hagler Systems, Inc.. (Hagler, Robert)
February 25, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2020 02:30 PM in Augusta - 2nd Floor before Chief Judge J. Randal Hall. (pts)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Expedite Discovery and Emergency Motion for Hearing on an Expedited Basis. The parties are hereby ordered and permitted to proceed immediately with discovery pursuant to the procedure detailed herein. The Court appoints United States Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps as a Special Master in this case. Further, a hearing on Plaintiff's #3 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction has been rescheduled to March 13, 2020, at 2:30 p.m. in Augusta. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 2/25/2020. (pts) Modified on 2/26/2020 (thb).
February 24, 2020 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge J. Randal Hall: Telephone Conference held on 2/24/2020. (Court Reporter Lisa Davenport.) (lcw)
February 24, 2020 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Benjamin L. Hagler, Sr, Benjamin L. Hagler, Jr, Hagler Group Global, LLC, Lee Henry. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tucker, Thomas)
February 24, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas W. Tucker on behalf of All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tucker, Thomas)
February 21, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing on Motion #4 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Discovery. Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 2/24/2020 04:00 PM before Chief Judge J. Randal Hall. The parties will be provided dial-in instructions via email.(lcw)
February 20, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE/ORDER. (jlh)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion for TRO as set forth herein. Plaintiffs are ordered to post a $25,000.00 cash bond as security as required by Rule 65. Further, it is ordered that this TRO shall remain in effect until the earlier of 14 days from the date of this Order, or until this Court's determination of whether this TRO should be converted into a preliminary injunction, the hearing for which is scheduled for Monday, March 2, 2020, at 3:00 p.m., in the Grand Jury Room, 2nd Floor, United States District Courthouse, Augusta, Georgia. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 2/19/2020. (pts)
February 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by David R. Hagler, Sr, Robert S. Hagler, Sr, Hagler Systems, Inc. Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge (Hagler, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/19/2020: #1 Notice - Correct PDF format) (thb).
February 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties by David R. Hagler, Sr, Robert S. Hagler, Sr, Hagler Systems, Inc. (Hagler, Robert)
February 19, 2020 Filing 4 *******Emergency MOTION to Expedite Discovery, Emergency MOTION for Hearing re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on an Expedited Basis by David R. Hagler, Sr, Robert S. Hagler, Sr, Hagler Systems, Inc.. Responses due by 3/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hagler, Robert)
February 19, 2020 Filing 3 *******Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by David R. Hagler, Sr, Robert S. Hagler, Sr, Hagler Systems, Inc.. Responses due by 3/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Robert S. Hagler, Sr., #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Lee Hurt, #3 Affidavit Affidavit of Chase Sprouse, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11)(Hagler, Robert)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 02/19/2020. (maa)
February 19, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 113J-2786282. (maa)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Hagler Systems, Inc., Robert S. Hagler, Sr, David R. Hagler, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(maa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hagler Systems, Inc. et al v. Hagler Group Global, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin L. Hagler, Sr.
Represented By: John B. Long
Represented By: Thomas W. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hagler Group Global, LLC
Represented By: John B. Long
Represented By: Thomas W. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Henry
Represented By: John B. Long
Represented By: Thomas W. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin L. Hagler, Jr.
Represented By: John B. Long
Represented By: Thomas W. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hagler Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Robert C. Hagler
Represented By: Robert J. Caison
Represented By: John Edward Price
Represented By: Samuel Justin Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David R. Hagler, Sr.
Represented By: Robert C. Hagler
Represented By: Robert J. Caison
Represented By: John Edward Price
Represented By: Samuel Justin Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert S. Hagler, Sr.
Represented By: Robert C. Hagler
Represented By: Robert J. Caison
Represented By: John Edward Price
Represented By: Samuel Justin Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Honorable Brian K. Epps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?