Jenkins v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Barry Jenkins
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv00033
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Barry Jenkins (Bush, George)
March 9, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: United States of America answer due 5/6/2020. (maa)
March 9, 2020 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Barry Jenkins. (Bush, George)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 03/05/2020. (Attachments: #1 Blank forms for new civil case filings) (thb)
March 5, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (thb)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Barry Jenkins. (thb)
March 5, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 113J-2796811. (thb)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America, filed by Barry Jenkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Affidavit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(thb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jenkins v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Jenkins
Represented By: George D. Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?