Williams v. The United States of America
Plaintiff: Janice Williams
Defendant: The United States of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv00053
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Local Rule 7.1.1 Disclosure Statement, Rule 26 Instruction Order served on The United States of America on 04/13/2020, filed by Janice Williams. (Connor, Christopher)
April 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Heath Statkus on behalf of The United States of America (Statkus, Shannon)
April 9, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Janice Williams. (Connor, C.)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 04/09/2020. (Attachments: #1 Blank Civil Case Forms.) (jlh)
April 9, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to The United States of America. (jlh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/9/2020: #1 Corrected Summons) (jlh).
April 9, 2020 Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number AGASDC-2820557. (jlh)
April 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The United States of America, filed by Janice Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Affidavit, and #3 Civil Cover Sheet.) (jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Williams
Represented By: C. Caleb Connor
Represented By: Christopher Caleb Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?